172
BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
59032 | 24/08/1957 | 91W TS |
To Western Region / GWR (New) Tyseley |
24/08/1957 04/10/1987 |
|
59033 | 31/08/1957 | 91W | To Western Region / GWR (New) | 31/08/1957 | |
59034 | 31/08/1957 | 91W | To Western Region / GWR (New) | 31/08/1957 | |
59035 | 31/08/1957 | 91W | To Western Region / GWR (New) | 31/08/1957 | |
59036 | 07/09/1957 | 91W | To Western Region / GWR (New) | 07/09/1957 | |
59037 | 14/09/1957 | 91W | To Western Region / GWR (New) | 14/09/1957 | |
59038 | 14/09/1957 | 91W | To Western Region / GWR (New) | 14/09/1957 | |
59039 | 14/09/1957 | 91W | To Western Region / GWR (New) | 14/09/1957 | |
59040 | 21/09/1957 | 91W | To Western Region / GWR (New) | 21/09/1957 | |
59041 | 19/10/1957 | 91W | To Western Region / GWR (New) | 19/10/1957 |