Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 30 Today
» 866 Yesterday
» 1702 Week
» 20023 Month
» 108215 Year
» 992596 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

D1/3 0-4-0


BR (1955 Num) BR (Pre Tops) Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
11507 D2957 06/03/1956 40B
30A
50D
W
Immingham (New)
Stratford
Goole
Withdrawn
06/03/1956
16/02/1957
13/08/1966
12/03/1967
12/03/1967
11508 D2958 28/05/1956 40B
30A
W
Immingham (New)
Stratford
Withdrawn
28/05/1956
19/01/1957
14/01/1968
14/01/1968