Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 299 Today
» 815 Yesterday
» 299 Week
» 16278 Month
» 211732 Year
» 1096113 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

D1/3 0-4-0


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
06/03/1956 To Service 11507   NEW 40B Immingham  
28/05/1956 To Service 11508   NEW 40B Immingham  
19/01/1957 Reallocation 11508 40B Immingham 30A Stratford  
16/02/1957 Reallocation 11507 40B Immingham 30A Stratford  
13/08/1966 Reallocation 2957 30A Stratford 50D Goole  
12/03/1967 Condemned 2957 50D Goole   COND  
14/01/1968 Condemned 2958 30A Stratford   COND