Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 315 Today
» 1270 Yesterday
» 6678 Week
» 9260 Month
» 273893 Year
» 1495458 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LMS Fowler "2P" Class 4-4-0


Class LMS BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
2P 563 40563 03/1928 22D
W
Templecombe (S&D)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/05/1962
17/05/1962
2P 564 40564 04/1928 22D
W
Templecombe (S&D)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/02/1962
15/02/1962
2P 565 40565 04/1928 20H
W
Lancaster Green Ayre
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/11/1959
21/11/1959
2P 566 40566 04/1928 28C
66A
66C
67A
67B
68C
W
Carstairs
Polmadie
Hamilton (West)
Corkerhill
Hurlford
Stranraer
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/11/1952
27/12/1952
13/06/1953
26/12/1953
05/07/1958
13/09/1961
13/09/1961
2P 567 40567 04/1928 20E
35C
35C
5A
14B
W
Manningham
Spital Bridge
Spital Bridge
Crewe North
Kentish Town
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/01/1952
16/02/1952
04/10/1952
28/12/1957
22/08/1959
22/08/1959
2P 568 40568 04/1928 22C
71H
71G
71H
21B
W
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Templecombe (S&D)
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Templecombe (S&D)
Bournville
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/10/1953
08/02/1954
10/10/1955
21/02/1959
28/11/1959
28/11/1959
2P 569 40569 05/1928 22C
71G
71H
71G
71H
W
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Templecombe (S&D)
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Templecombe (S&D)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/06/1950
01/10/1953
08/02/1954
21/06/1955
30/11/1961
08/11/1961
2P 570 40570 05/1928 30B
W
Hurlford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/08/1961
23/08/1961
2P 571 40571 05/1928 30B
W
Hurlford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/07/1961
29/07/1961
2P 572 40572 11/1928 30B
67A
67B
W
Hurlford
Corkerhill
Hurlford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/08/1952
01/11/1952
29/07/1961
29/07/1961
2P 573 40573 05/1928 30B
W
Hurlford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/05/1959
05/05/1959
2P 574 40574 06/1928 30D
67B
W
Ayr
Hurlford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/11/1959
26/04/1961
26/04/1961
2P 575 40575 10/1929 30D
67B
W
Ayr
Hurlford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/11/1959
23/08/1961
23/08/1961
2P 576 40576 10/1929 12G
W
Dumfries
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/11/1959
18/11/1959
2P 577 40577 06/1928 12G
W
Dumfries
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/07/1961
29/07/1961
2P 578 40578 07/1928 30C
W
Ardrossan
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/11/1961
20/11/1961
2P 579 40579 07/1928 30C
W
Ardrossan
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/07/1961
29/07/1961
2P 580 40580 10/1929 26E
7D
6A
6G
14B
W
Bacup
Rhyl
Chester (MR)
Llandudno Junction
Kentish Town
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/05/1951
08/10/1955
10/08/1957
28/12/1957
11/02/1961
11/02/1961
2P 581 40581 07/1928 23A
25G
55D
W
Bank Hall
Farnley Junction
Royston
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/07/1954
09/11/1957
04/10/1960
04/10/1960
2P 582 40582 07/1928 26A
12A
12A
12D
12A
14B
W
Newton Heath
Carlisle Upperby
Carlisle Upperby
Workington
Carlisle Upperby
Kentish Town
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/01/1953
21/02/1953
16/07/1955
23/02/1957
28/12/1957
05/12/1959
05/12/1959
2P 583 40583 07/1928 23A
8E
2B
5A
5C
W
Bank Hall
Brunswick
Nuneaton
Crewe North
Stafford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/10/1950
04/10/1952
27/02/1954
29/01/1955
17/09/1960
17/09/1960
2P 584 40584 08/1928 26A
27A
27A
25G
27D
25G
W
Newton Heath
Bank Hall
Bank Hall
Farnley Junction
Wigan Central (L&Y)
Farnley Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/09/1950
26/01/1952
17/07/1954
24/03/1956
21/04/1956
11/1960
11/1960
2P 585 40585 08/1928 25C
25C
27A
26C
16A
15C
16A
W
Goole
Goole
Bank Hall
Bolton
Nottingham
Leicester Midland
Nottingham
Withdrawn
22/06/1946
01/01/1948
09/09/1950
17/07/1951
08/10/1955
08/09/1956
05/10/1957
11/02/1961
11/02/1961
2P 586 40586 08/1928 25C
24A
26D
26C
24G
27C
27A
26F
W
Goole
Accrington
Bury
Bolton
Skipton
Southport
Bank Hall
Patricroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/07/1952
04/10/1952
01/01/1955
10/08/1957
23/07/1960
29/10/1960
10/12/1960
15/04/1961
15/04/1961
2P 587 40587 08/1928 26E
25G
27D
W
Bacup
Farnley Junction
Wigan Central (L&Y)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/04/1956
16/06/1956
29/08/1959
29/08/1959
2P 588 40588 08/1928 26A
27D
27A
W
Newton Heath
Wigan Central (L&Y)
Bank Hall
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/10/1951
31/10/1953
05/11/1960
05/11/1960
2P 589 40589 08/1928 25C
25C
2B
7D
6A
6K
W
Goole
Goole
Nuneaton
Rhyl
Chester (MR)
Rhyl
Withdrawn
22/06/1946
01/01/1948
26/01/1952
23/02/1952
08/10/1955
16/06/1956
28/11/1959
28/11/1959
2P 590 40590 09/1928 30D
W
Ayr
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/1959
05/1959
2P 592 40592 09/1928 28C
67A
67B
W
Carstairs
Corkerhill
Hurlford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/11/1950
20/01/1951
21/12/1961
21/12/1961
2P 593 40593 09/1928 30B
W
Hurlford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/08/1961
23/08/1961
2P 594 40594 09/1928 30A
W
Corkerhill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/11/1959
12/11/1959
2P 595 40595 09/1928 30A
67C
67B
W
Corkerhill
Ayr
Hurlford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/12/1958
21/11/1959
20/06/1961
20/06/1961
2P 596 40596 09/1928 30A
W
Corkerhill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
13/09/1961
13/09/1961
2P 597 40597 10/1928 30B
W
Hurlford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/08/1961
23/08/1961
2P 598 40598 10/1928 30A
66A
67A
W
Corkerhill
Polmadie
Corkerhill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/11/1952
13/06/1953
12/11/1959
12/11/1959
2P 599 40599 11/1928 30A
W
Corkerhill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/05/1959
05/05/1959
2P 600 40600 11/1928 12H
62B
61A
61C
W
Stranraer
Dundee Tay Bridge
Kittybrewster
Keith
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/12/1952
15/05/1954
27/10/1956
27/04/1959
27/04/1959
2P 601 40601 05/1928 22C
71H
71G
71H
71G
W
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Templecombe (S&D)
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Templecombe (S&D)
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/10/1953
08/02/1954
21/06/1955
10/10/1955
31/12/1959
11/12/1959
2P 602 40602 11/1928 12A
67A
68A
67B
12A
67A
67B
W
Carlisle Kingmoor
Corkerhill
Carlisle Kingmoor
Hurlford
Carlisle Kingmoor
Corkerhill
Hurlford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/08/1954
30/10/1954
29/08/1959
28/11/1959
12/03/1960
02/07/1960
21/10/1961
21/10/1961
2P 603 40603 11/1928 30A
61C
67A
W
Corkerhill
Keith
Corkerhill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/12/1959
01/07/1961
11/07/1961
11/07/1961
2P 604 40604 11/1928 30A
61B
61A
61C
W
Corkerhill
Aberdeen Ferryhill
Kittybrewster
Keith
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/09/1955
01/10/1955
19/12/1959
30/06/1961
30/06/1961
2P 605 40605 11/1928 28C
67A
67B
W
Carstairs
Corkerhill
Hurlford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/07/1952
01/11/1952
19/10/1959
19/10/1959
2P 606 40606 11/1928 30C
64D
67D
W
Ardrossan
Carstairs
Ardrossan
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
25/10/1958
22/11/1958
25/05/1959
25/05/1959
2P 607 40607 11/1928 30C
66A
67A
67D
67B
W
Ardrossan
Polmadie
Corkerhill
Ardrossan
Hurlford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/11/1952
13/06/1953
26/12/1953
06/06/1959
31/07/1959
31/07/1959
2P 608 40608 11/1928 30C
67B
W
Ardrossan
Hurlford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/04/1959
29/09/1959
29/09/1959
2P 609 40609 11/1928 30C
67B
W
Ardrossan
Hurlford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/04/1959
02/10/1962
02/10/1962
2P 610 40610 12/1928 30D
W
Ayr
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/05/1959
05/05/1959
2P 611 40611 12/1928 12H
W
Stranraer
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/09/1959
29/09/1959
2P 612 40612 12/1928 30B
W
Hurlford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/10/1961
02/10/1961
2P 613 40613 10/1929 12A
68C
12A
67A
W
Carlisle Kingmoor
Stranraer
Carlisle Kingmoor
Corkerhill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/07/1959
28/11/1959
12/03/1960
21/10/1961
21/10/1961
2P 614 40614 10/1929 12G
W
Dumfries
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/10/1961
02/10/1961
2P 615 40615 11/1929 12A
68C
12A
67A
W
Carlisle Kingmoor
Stranraer
Carlisle Kingmoor
Corkerhill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/07/1959
28/11/1959
12/03/1960
21/10/1961
21/10/1961
2P 616 40616 11/1929 12H
W
Stranraer
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/07/1959
09/07/1959
2P 617 40617 11/1929 30B
61B
61C
W
Hurlford
Aberdeen Ferryhill
Keith
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/03/1957
13/04/1957
05/11/1959
05/11/1959
2P 618 40618 11/1929 30B
61B
61C
61B
W
Hurlford
Aberdeen Ferryhill
Keith
Aberdeen Ferryhill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/03/1957
13/04/1957
01/07/1961
27/09/1961
27/09/1961
2P 619 40619 11/1929 28C
W
Carstairs
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/10/1961
02/10/1961
2P 620 40620 11/1929 30A
67B
66A
67A
W
Corkerhill
Hurlford
Polmadie
Corkerhill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/04/1951
01/11/1952
11/07/1953
23/10/1961
23/10/1961
2P 621 40621 11/1929 30A
W
Corkerhill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/10/1961
02/10/1961
2P 622 40622 11/1929 30A
61C
W
Corkerhill
Keith
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/10/1956
11/05/1961
11/05/1961
2P 623 40623 12/1929 12H
W
Stranraer
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/1961
06/1961
2P 624 40624 12/1929 30C
W
Ardrossan
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/08/1961
11/08/1961
2P 625 40625 12/1929 30C
W
Ardrossan
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/10/1961
02/10/1961
2P 626 40626 12/1929 30C
67B
W
Ardrossan
Hurlford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/06/1959
02/10/1961
02/10/1961
2P 627 40627 12/1929 30A
W
Corkerhill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/1961
01/1961
2P 628 40628 12/1929 8A
TFD
12A
W
Edge Hill
Trafford Park (LNER)
Carlisle Upperby
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/07/1949
16/07/1955
28/01/1961
28/01/1961
2P 629 40629 01/1930 7D
6A
12A
68C
67B
12B
67A
W
Rhyl
Chester (MR)
Carlisle Upperby
Stranraer
Hurlford
Carlisle Upperby
Corkerhill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/12/1954
16/07/1955
15/08/1959
26/09/1959
28/11/1959
12/03/1960
22/04/1961
22/04/1961
2P 630 40630 01/1930 16D
W
Mansfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/10/1960
04/10/1960
2P 631 40631 01/1930 17B
10C
W
Burton
Patricroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/03/1957
09/1960
09/1960
2P 632 40632 01/1930 17A
20G
16A
W
Derby
Hellifield
Nottingham
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/04/1952
08/09/1956
18/02/1961
18/02/1961
2P 633 40633 06/1928 17B
W
Burton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/11/1959
28/11/1959
2P 634 40634 06/1928 22D
W
Templecombe (S&D)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/05/1962
14/05/1962
2P 635 40635 07/1928 10C
6G
W
Patricroft
Llandudno Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/10/1958
11/02/1961
11/02/1961
2P 636 40636 08/1931 30A
W
Corkerhill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/11/1959
12/11/1959
2P 637 40637 08/1931 30A
W
Corkerhill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
13/09/1961
13/09/1961
2P 638 40638 08/1931 30D
67D
68C
W
Ayr
Ardrossan
Stranraer
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/04/1954
26/08/1961
21/05/1962
21/05/1962
2P 640 40640 08/1931 30D
W
Ayr
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
13/09/1961
13/09/1961
2P 641 40641 08/1931 30A
68C
67B
W
Corkerhill
Stranraer
Hurlford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/12/1959
16/01/1960
02/10/1961
02/10/1961
2P 642 40642 08/1931 30A
68C
67B
W
Corkerhill
Stranraer
Hurlford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/12/1959
16/01/1960
31/10/1961
31/10/1961
2P 643 40643 08/1931 30B
W
Hurlford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/10/1961
31/10/1961
2P 644 40644 08/1931 30B
W
Hurlford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/11/1959
12/11/1959
2P 645 40645 08/1931 30B
W
Hurlford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/10/1961
31/10/1961
2P 646 40646 09/1931 7D
5C
21B
W
Rhyl
Stafford
Bescot
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/02/1952
07/05/1960
12/05/1962
12/05/1962
2P 647 40647 09/1931 30D
67A
67C
67B
W
Ayr
Corkerhill
Ayr
Hurlford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/10/1956
26/10/1957
21/11/1959
31/10/1961
31/10/1961
2P 648 40648 09/1931 30D
61A
61B
W
Ayr
Kittybrewster
Aberdeen Ferryhill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/05/1954
26/08/1961
27/09/1961
27/09/1961
2P 649 40649 09/1931 30A
W
Corkerhill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/11/1959
18/11/1959
2P 650 40650 09/1931 30A
61B
W
Corkerhill
Aberdeen Ferryhill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/08/1961
27/09/1961
27/09/1961
2P 651 40651 09/1931 30A
66B
67A
68A
67B
12A
67A
67B
W
Corkerhill
Motherwell
Corkerhill
Carlisle Kingmoor
Hurlford
Carlisle Kingmoor
Corkerhill
Hurlford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/11/1952
13/06/1953
30/10/1954
29/08/1959
28/11/1959
12/03/1960
02/07/1960
22/11/1961
22/11/1961
2P 652 40652 09/1931 12B
5A
82G
W
Carlisle Upperby
Crewe North
Templecombe (S&D)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/03/1957
02/05/1959
09/05/1960
09/05/1960
2P 653 40653 09/1931 2C
2C
5A
W
Northampton
Northampton
Crewe North
Withdrawn
22/06/1946
01/01/1948
23/03/1957
28/11/1959
28/11/1959
2P 654 40654 10/1931 12B
W
Carlisle Upperby
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/12/1959
26/12/1959
2P 655 40655 10/1931 2A
12A
5A
W
Rugby
Carlisle Upperby
Crewe North
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/10/1954
23/03/1957
21/11/1959
21/11/1959
2P 656 40656 10/1931 12D
12A
W
Workington
Carlisle Upperby
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/07/1955
21/11/1959
21/11/1959
2P 657 40657 10/1931 2C
12A
10B
1C
W
Northampton
Carlisle Upperby
Preston
Watford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/07/1955
30/11/1957
10/12/1960
20/10/1962
20/10/1962
2P 658 40658 10/1931 7A
6A
W
Llandudno Junction
Chester (MR)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/07/1949
21/11/1959
21/11/1959
2P 659 40659 10/1931 5A
1C
W
Crewe North
Watford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/11/1959
06/1961
06/1961
2P 660 40660 12/1931 5A
W
Crewe North
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/11/1959
28/11/1959
2P 661 40661 12/1931 30B
W
Hurlford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/11/1961
27/11/1961
2P 662 40662 12/1931 30B
W
Hurlford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/09/1954
18/09/1954
2P 663 40663 12/1931 30B
61A
61B
W
Hurlford
Kittybrewster
Aberdeen Ferryhill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/05/1954
26/08/1961
27/09/1961
27/09/1961
2P 664 40664 12/1931 30D
67B
W
Ayr
Hurlford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/07/1960
16/07/1962
16/07/1962
2P 665 40665 12/1931 30B
W
Hurlford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/06/1962
11/06/1962
2P 666 40666 01/1932 28C
64D
66A
67A
67B
67D
W
Carstairs
Carstairs
Polmadie
Corkerhill
Hurlford
Ardrossan
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/07/1949
29/11/1952
11/07/1953
26/12/1953
20/02/1954
31/07/1959
31/07/1959
2P 667 40667 01/1932 30C
W
Ardrossan
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/11/1959
20/11/1959
2P 668 40668 01/1932 30C
W
Ardrossan
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/10/1961
31/10/1961
2P 669 40669 01/1932 30C
W
Ardrossan
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
13/09/1961
13/09/1961
2P 670 40670 01/1932 30D
68B
W
Ayr
Dumfries
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/11/1959
17/12/1962
17/12/1962
2P 671 40671 01/1932 7A
10B
10C
W
Llandudno Junction
Preston
Patricroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/11/1956
23/03/1957
03/12/1960
03/12/1960
2P 672 40672 02/1932 1C
W
Watford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/10/1962
20/10/1962
2P 673 40673 02/1932 12B
12A
10B
11B
10B
5A
3C
3A
W
Carlisle Upperby
Carlisle Upperby
Preston
Barrow in Furness
Preston
Crewe North
Ryecroft (Walsall)
Bescot
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/12/1950
17/07/1951
29/11/1952
24/01/1953
23/03/1957
28/12/1957
14/06/1958
28/11/1959
28/11/1959
2P 674 40674 02/1932 9A
W
Longsight
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/11/1959
28/11/1959
2P 675 40675 02/1932 7A
6A
6G
5C
W
Llandudno Junction
Chester (MR)
Llandudno Junction
Stafford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/11/1955
10/08/1957
28/12/1957
22/08/1959
22/08/1959
2P 676 40676 02/1932 24A
26A
2B
10C
W
Accrington
Newton Heath
Nuneaton
Patricroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/06/1951
11/08/1951
27/02/1954
17/08/1957
17/08/1957
2P 677 40677 02/1932 24D
2B
2E
24K
W
Lower Darwen
Nuneaton
Northampton
Preston
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/07/1952
27/02/1954
14/06/1958
28/11/1959
28/11/1959
2P 678 40678 03/1932 23D
5C
3A
W
Wigan Central (L&Y)
Stafford
Bescot
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/06/1952
07/11/1959
08/07/1961
08/07/1961
2P 679 40679 03/1932 23D
8E
6A
5A
99C
5A
W
Wigan Central (L&Y)
Brunswick
Chester (MR)
Crewe North
Crewe Works
Crewe North
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/10/1950
31/12/1955
10/08/1957
20/12/1958
27/12/1958
28/11/1959
28/11/1959
2P 680 40680 03/1932 23D
26A
27D
25G
27D
W
Wigan Central (L&Y)
Newton Heath
Wigan Central (L&Y)
Farnley Junction
Wigan Central (L&Y)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/10/1952
08/08/1953
21/04/1956
16/06/1956
07/11/1959
07/11/1959
2P 681 40681 04/1932 26E
27D
24D
26C
27D
26F
W
Bacup
Wigan Central (L&Y)
Lower Darwen
Bolton
Wigan Central (L&Y)
Patricroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/04/1953
08/08/1953
24/03/1956
14/06/1958
27/08/1960
04/08/1962
04/08/1962
2P 682 40682 04/1932 24A
26A
25G
26A
26C
17A
16A
W
Accrington
Newton Heath
Farnley Junction
Newton Heath
Bolton
Derby
Nottingham
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/11/1950
09/08/1952
04/10/1952
08/08/1953
08/10/1955
04/07/1959
11/02/1961
11/02/1961
2P 683 40683 04/1932 24A
8E
2B
2E
24K
1C
W
Accrington
Brunswick
Nuneaton
Northampton
Preston
Watford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/10/1950
04/10/1952
21/02/1953
14/06/1958
10/12/1960
18/03/1961
18/03/1961
2P 684 40684 04/1932 24D
27A
W
Lower Darwen
Bank Hall
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/08/1953
08/07/1961
08/07/1961
2P 685 40685 04/1932 25C
25C
26C
16A
20G
W
Goole
Goole
Bolton
Nottingham
Hellifield
Withdrawn
22/06/1946
01/01/1948
26/01/1952
08/10/1955
08/09/1956
08/07/1961
08/07/1961
2P 686 40686 10/1932 30B
W
Hurlford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/10/1961
12/10/1961
2P 687 40687 10/1932 30B
W
Hurlford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/10/1961
31/10/1961
2P 688 40688 10/1932 30B
W
Hurlford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/07/1959
31/07/1959
2P 689 40689 10/1932 30B
W
Hurlford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/10/1961
31/10/1961
2P 690 40690 11/1932 24D
26C
24A
26D
25G
20A
W
Lower Darwen
Bolton
Accrington
Bury
Farnley Junction
Holbeck (MR)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/07/1951
12/07/1952
04/10/1952
01/01/1955
08/10/1955
04/10/1960
04/10/1960
2P 691 40691 11/1932 26E
26A
25G
27D
25G
27A
18C
16A
W
Bacup
Newton Heath
Farnley Junction
Wigan Central (L&Y)
Farnley Junction
Bank Hall
Hasland
Nottingham
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/11/1950
09/08/1952
18/04/1953
11/07/1953
24/04/1954
08/10/1955
24/10/1959
11/02/1961
11/02/1961
2P 692 40692 11/1932 2C
12A
5A
3C
3A
W
Northampton
Carlisle Upperby
Crewe North
Ryecroft (Walsall)
Bescot
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/10/1954
23/03/1957
25/01/1958
14/06/1958
08/1961
08/1961
2P 693 40693 11/1932 9D
9A
W
Buxton (LNWR)
Longsight
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/12/1948
11/07/1959
11/07/1959
2P 694 40694 11/1932 12D
10B
21B
W
Workington
Preston
Bescot
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/05/1955
07/05/1960
17/11/1962
17/11/1962
2P 695 40695 11/1932 12D
12A
10B
11B
67A
67B
W
Workington
Carlisle Upperby
Preston
Barrow in Furness
Corkerhill
Hurlford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/07/1955
10/08/1957
05/10/1957
12/03/1960
02/07/1960
04/03/1961
04/03/1961
2P 696 40696 11/1932 22C
W
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/1962
24/05/1962
2P 697 40697 11/1932 22C
W
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/02/1962
13/02/1962
2P 698 40698 11/1932 22C
W
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/1960
27/07/1960
2P 699 40699 12/1932 12B
10B
10C
6G
W
Carlisle Upperby
Preston
Patricroft
Llandudno Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/08/1957
05/10/1957
04/10/1958
19/12/1959
19/12/1959
2P 700 40700 12/1932 22C
W
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/1962
28/08/1962