Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 98 Today
» 1103 Yesterday
» 5735 Week
» 18839 Month
» 18839 Year
» 1240404 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LMS Fowler "2P" Class 4-4-0


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
22/06/1946 Reallocation 585     25C Goole  
22/06/1946 Reallocation 589     25C Goole  
22/06/1946 Reallocation 653     2C Northampton  
22/06/1946 Reallocation 685     25C Goole  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 563     22D Templecombe (S&D)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 564     22D Templecombe (S&D)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 565     20H Lancaster Green Ayre  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 566     28C Carstairs  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 567     20E Manningham  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 568     22C Bath Green Park (S&D)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 569     22C Bath Green Park (S&D)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 570     30B Hurlford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 571     30B Hurlford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 572     30B Hurlford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 573     30B Hurlford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 574     30D Ayr  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 575     30D Ayr  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 576     12G Dumfries  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 577     12G Dumfries  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 578     30C Ardrossan  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 579     30C Ardrossan  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 580     26E Bacup  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 581     23A Bank Hall  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 582     26A Newton Heath  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 583     23A Bank Hall  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 584     26A Newton Heath  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 585 25C Goole 25C Goole  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 586     25C Goole  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 587     26E Bacup  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 588     26A Newton Heath  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 589 25C Goole 25C Goole  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 590     30D Ayr  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 592     28C Carstairs  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 593     30B Hurlford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 594     30A Corkerhill  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 595     30A Corkerhill  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 596     30A Corkerhill  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 597     30B Hurlford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 598     30A Corkerhill  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 599     30A Corkerhill  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 600     12H Stranraer  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 601     22C Bath Green Park (S&D)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 602     12A Carlisle Kingmoor  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 603     30A Corkerhill  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 604     30A Corkerhill  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 605     28C Carstairs  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 606     30C Ardrossan  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 607     30C Ardrossan  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 608     30C Ardrossan  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 609     30C Ardrossan  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 610     30D Ayr  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 611     12H Stranraer  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 612     30B Hurlford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 613     12A Carlisle Kingmoor  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 614     12G Dumfries  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 615     12A Carlisle Kingmoor  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 616     12H Stranraer  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 617     30B Hurlford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 618     30B Hurlford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 619     28C Carstairs  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 620     30A Corkerhill  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 621     30A Corkerhill  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 622     30A Corkerhill  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 623     12H Stranraer  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 624     30C Ardrossan  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 625     30C Ardrossan  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 626     30C Ardrossan  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 627     30A Corkerhill  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 628     8A Edge Hill  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 629     7D Rhyl  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 630     16D Mansfield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 631     17B Burton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 632     17A Derby  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 633     17B Burton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 634     22D Templecombe (S&D)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 635     10C Patricroft  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 636     30A Corkerhill  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 637     30A Corkerhill  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 638     30D Ayr  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 640     30D Ayr  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 641     30A Corkerhill  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 642     30A Corkerhill  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 643     30B Hurlford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 644     30B Hurlford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 645     30B Hurlford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 646     7D Rhyl  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 647     30D Ayr  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 648     30D Ayr  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 649     30A Corkerhill  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 650     30A Corkerhill  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 651     30A Corkerhill  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 652     12B Carlisle Upperby  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 653 2C Northampton 2C Northampton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 654     12B Carlisle Upperby  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 655     2A Rugby  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 656     12D Workington  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 657     2C Northampton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 658     7A Llandudno Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 659     5A Crewe North  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 660     5A Crewe North  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 661     30B Hurlford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 662     30B Hurlford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 663     30B Hurlford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 664     30D Ayr  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 665     30B Hurlford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 666     28C Carstairs  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 667     30C Ardrossan  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 668     30C Ardrossan  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 669     30C Ardrossan  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 670     30D Ayr  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 671     7A Llandudno Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 672     1C Watford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 673     12B Carlisle Upperby  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 674     9A Longsight  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 675     7A Llandudno Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 676     24A Accrington  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 677     24D Lower Darwen  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 678     23D Wigan Central (L&Y)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 679     23D Wigan Central (L&Y)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 680     23D Wigan Central (L&Y)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 681     26E Bacup  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 682     24A Accrington  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 683     24A Accrington  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 684     24D Lower Darwen  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 685 25C Goole 25C Goole  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 686     30B Hurlford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 687     30B Hurlford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 688     30B Hurlford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 689     30B Hurlford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 690     24D Lower Darwen  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 691     26E Bacup  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 692     2C Northampton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 693     9D Buxton (LNWR)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 694     12D Workington  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 695     12D Workington  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 696     22C Bath Green Park (S&D)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 697     22C Bath Green Park (S&D)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 698     22C Bath Green Park (S&D)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 699     12B Carlisle Upperby  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 700     22C Bath Green Park (S&D)  
11/12/1948 Reallocation 40693 9D Buxton (LNWR) 9A Longsight  
16/07/1949 Reallocation 628 8A Edge Hill TFD Trafford Park (LNER)  
16/07/1949 Reallocation 40658 7A Llandudno Junction 6A Chester (MR)  
16/07/1949 Reallocation 666 28C Carstairs 64D Carstairs  
17/06/1950 Reallocation 569 22C Bath Green Park (S&D) 71G Bath Green Park (S&D)  
09/09/1950 Reallocation 40584 26A Newton Heath 27A Bank Hall  
09/09/1950 Reallocation 40585 25C Goole 27A Bank Hall  
07/10/1950 Reallocation 40583 23A Bank Hall 8E Brunswick  
07/10/1950 Reallocation 40679 23D Wigan Central (L&Y) 8E Brunswick  
07/10/1950 Reallocation 40683 24A Accrington 8E Brunswick  
04/11/1950 Reallocation 592 28C Carstairs 67A Corkerhill  
04/11/1950 Reallocation 682 24A Accrington 26A Newton Heath  
04/11/1950 Reallocation 691 26E Bacup 26A Newton Heath  
02/12/1950 Reallocation 40673 12B Carlisle Upperby 12A Carlisle Upperby  
20/01/1951 Reallocation 40592 67A Corkerhill 67B Hurlford  
21/04/1951 Reallocation 40620 30A Corkerhill 67B Hurlford  
19/05/1951 Reallocation 40580 26E Bacup 7D Rhyl  
16/06/1951 Reallocation 40676 24A Accrington 26A Newton Heath  
17/07/1951 Reallocation 40585 27A Bank Hall 26C Bolton  
17/07/1951 Reallocation 40673 12A Carlisle Upperby 10B Preston  
17/07/1951 Reallocation 40690 24D Lower Darwen 26C Bolton  
11/08/1951 Reallocation 40676 26A Newton Heath 2B Nuneaton  
06/10/1951 Reallocation 40588 26A Newton Heath 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)  
19/01/1952 Reallocation 40567 20E Manningham 35C Spital Bridge  
26/01/1952 Reallocation 40584 27A Bank Hall 27A Bank Hall  
26/01/1952 Reallocation 40589 25C Goole 2B Nuneaton  
26/01/1952 Reallocation 40685 25C Goole 26C Bolton  
16/02/1952 Reallocation 40567 35C Spital Bridge 35C Spital Bridge  
23/02/1952 Reallocation 40589 2B Nuneaton 7D Rhyl  
23/02/1952 Reallocation 40646 7D Rhyl 5C Stafford  
19/04/1952 Reallocation 40632 17A Derby 20G Hellifield  
14/06/1952 Reallocation 40678 23D Wigan Central (L&Y) 5C Stafford  
12/07/1952 Reallocation 40586 25C Goole 24A Accrington  
12/07/1952 Reallocation 40605 28C Carstairs 67A Corkerhill  
12/07/1952 Reallocation 40677 24D Lower Darwen 2B Nuneaton  
12/07/1952 Reallocation 40690 26C Bolton 24A Accrington  
09/08/1952 Reallocation 40572 30B Hurlford 67A Corkerhill  
09/08/1952 Reallocation 682 26A Newton Heath 25G Farnley Junction  
09/08/1952 Reallocation 40691 26A Newton Heath 25G Farnley Junction  
04/10/1952 Reallocation 40567 35C Spital Bridge 5A Crewe North  
04/10/1952 Reallocation 40583 8E Brunswick 2B Nuneaton  
04/10/1952 Reallocation 40586 24A Accrington 26D Bury  
04/10/1952 Reallocation 40680 23D Wigan Central (L&Y) 26A Newton Heath  
04/10/1952 Reallocation 682 25G Farnley Junction 26A Newton Heath  
04/10/1952 Reallocation 40683 8E Brunswick 2B Nuneaton  
04/10/1952 Reallocation 40690 24A Accrington 26D Bury  
01/11/1952 Reallocation 40572 67A Corkerhill 67B Hurlford  
01/11/1952 Reallocation 40605 67A Corkerhill 67B Hurlford  
01/11/1952 Reallocation 40620 67B Hurlford 66A Polmadie  
01/11/1952 Reallocation 40651 30A Corkerhill 66B Motherwell  
29/11/1952 Reallocation 40566 28C Carstairs 66A Polmadie  
29/11/1952 Reallocation 40598 30A Corkerhill 66A Polmadie  
29/11/1952 Reallocation 40607 30C Ardrossan 66A Polmadie  
29/11/1952 Reallocation 40666 64D Carstairs 66A Polmadie  
29/11/1952 Reallocation 40673 10B Preston 11B Barrow in Furness  
27/12/1952 Reallocation 40566 66A Polmadie 66C Hamilton (West)  
27/12/1952 Reallocation 40600 12H Stranraer 62B Dundee Tay Bridge  
03/01/1953 Reallocation 40582 26A Newton Heath 12A Carlisle Upperby  
24/01/1953 Reallocation 40673 11B Barrow in Furness 10B Preston  
21/02/1953 Reallocation 40582 12A Carlisle Upperby 12A Carlisle Upperby  
21/02/1953 Reallocation 40683 2B Nuneaton 2E Northampton  
18/04/1953 Reallocation 40681 26E Bacup 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)  
18/04/1953 Reallocation 40691 25G Farnley Junction 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)  
13/06/1953 Reallocation 40566 66C Hamilton (West) 67A Corkerhill  
13/06/1953 Reallocation 40598 66A Polmadie 67A Corkerhill  
13/06/1953 Reallocation 40607 66A Polmadie 67A Corkerhill  
13/06/1953 Reallocation 40651 66B Motherwell 67A Corkerhill  
11/07/1953 Reallocation 40620 66A Polmadie 67A Corkerhill  
11/07/1953 Reallocation 40666 66A Polmadie 67A Corkerhill  
11/07/1953 Reallocation 40691 27D Wigan Central (L&Y) 25G Farnley Junction  
08/08/1953 Reallocation 40680 26A Newton Heath 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)  
08/08/1953 Reallocation 40681 27D Wigan Central (L&Y) 24D Lower Darwen  
08/08/1953 Reallocation 682 26A Newton Heath 26C Bolton  
08/08/1953 Reallocation 40684 24D Lower Darwen 27A Bank Hall  
01/10/1953 Reallocation 40568 22C Bath Green Park (S&D) 71H Templecombe (S&D)  
01/10/1953 Reallocation 40569 71G Bath Green Park (S&D) 71H Templecombe (S&D)  
01/10/1953 Reallocation 40601 22C Bath Green Park (S&D) 71H Templecombe (S&D)  
31/10/1953 Reallocation 40588 27D Wigan Central (L&Y) 27A Bank Hall  
26/12/1953 Reallocation 40566 67A Corkerhill 67B Hurlford  
26/12/1953 Reallocation 40607 67A Corkerhill 67D Ardrossan  
26/12/1953 Reallocation 40666 67A Corkerhill 67B Hurlford  
08/02/1954 Reallocation 40568 71H Templecombe (S&D) 71G Bath Green Park (S&D)  
08/02/1954 Reallocation 40569 71H Templecombe (S&D) 71G Bath Green Park (S&D)  
08/02/1954 Reallocation 40601 71H Templecombe (S&D) 71G Bath Green Park (S&D)  
20/02/1954 Reallocation 40666 67B Hurlford 67D Ardrossan  
27/02/1954 Reallocation 40583 2B Nuneaton 5A Crewe North  
27/02/1954 Reallocation 40676 2B Nuneaton 10C Patricroft  
27/02/1954 Reallocation 40677 2B Nuneaton 2E Northampton  
17/04/1954 Reallocation 40638 30D Ayr 67D Ardrossan  
24/04/1954 Reallocation 40691 25G Farnley Junction 27A Bank Hall  
15/05/1954 Reallocation 40600 62B Dundee Tay Bridge 61A Kittybrewster  
15/05/1954 Reallocation 40648 30D Ayr 61A Kittybrewster  
15/05/1954 Reallocation 40663 30B Hurlford 61A Kittybrewster  
17/07/1954 Reallocation 40581 23A Bank Hall 25G Farnley Junction  
17/07/1954 Reallocation 40584 27A Bank Hall 25G Farnley Junction  
07/08/1954 Reallocation 40602 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 67A Corkerhill  
09/1954 Condemned 40662 30B Hurlford   COND  
09/10/1954 Reallocation 40655 2A Rugby 12A Carlisle Upperby  
09/10/1954 Reallocation 40692 2C Northampton 12A Carlisle Upperby  
30/10/1954 Reallocation 40602 67A Corkerhill 68A Carlisle Kingmoor  
30/10/1954 Reallocation 40651 67A Corkerhill 68A Carlisle Kingmoor  
04/12/1954 Reallocation 40629 7D Rhyl 6A Chester (MR)  
01/01/1955 Reallocation 40586 26D Bury 26C Bolton  
01/01/1955 Reallocation 40690 26D Bury 25G Farnley Junction  
29/01/1955 Reallocation 40583 5A Crewe North 5C Stafford  
21/05/1955 Reallocation 40694 12D Workington 10B Preston  
21/06/1955 Reallocation 40569 71G Bath Green Park (S&D) 71H Templecombe (S&D)  
21/06/1955 Reallocation 40601 71G Bath Green Park (S&D) 71H Templecombe (S&D)  
16/07/1955 Reallocation 40582 12A Carlisle Upperby 12D Workington  
16/07/1955 Reallocation 40628 TFD Trafford Park (LNER) 12A Carlisle Upperby  
16/07/1955 Reallocation 40629 6A Chester (MR) 12A Carlisle Upperby  
16/07/1955 Reallocation 40656 12D Workington 12A Carlisle Upperby  
16/07/1955 Reallocation 40657 2C Northampton 12A Carlisle Upperby  
16/07/1955 Reallocation 40695 12D Workington 12A Carlisle Upperby  
02/09/1955 Reallocation 40604 30A Corkerhill 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill  
01/10/1955 Reallocation 40604 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 61A Kittybrewster  
08/10/1955 Reallocation 40580 7D Rhyl 6A Chester (MR)  
08/10/1955 Reallocation 40585 26C Bolton 16A Nottingham  
08/10/1955 Reallocation 40589 7D Rhyl 6A Chester (MR)  
08/10/1955 Reallocation 40682 26C Bolton 17A Derby  
08/10/1955 Reallocation 40685 26C Bolton 16A Nottingham  
08/10/1955 Reallocation 40690 25G Farnley Junction 20A Holbeck (MR)  
08/10/1955 Reallocation 40691 27A Bank Hall 18C Hasland  
10/10/1955 Reallocation 40568 71G Bath Green Park (S&D) 71H Templecombe (S&D)  
10/10/1955 Reallocation 40601 71H Templecombe (S&D) 71G Bath Green Park (S&D)  
05/11/1955 Reallocation 40675 7A Llandudno Junction 6A Chester (MR)  
31/12/1955 Reallocation 40679 8E Brunswick 6A Chester (MR)  
24/03/1956 Reallocation 40584 25G Farnley Junction 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)  
24/03/1956 Reallocation 40681 24D Lower Darwen 26C Bolton  
21/04/1956 Reallocation 40584 27D Wigan Central (L&Y) 25G Farnley Junction  
21/04/1956 Reallocation 40587 26E Bacup 25G Farnley Junction  
21/04/1956 Reallocation 40680 27D Wigan Central (L&Y) 25G Farnley Junction  
16/06/1956 Reallocation 40587 25G Farnley Junction 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)  
16/06/1956 Reallocation 40589 6A Chester (MR) 6K Rhyl  
16/06/1956 Reallocation 40680 25G Farnley Junction 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)  
08/09/1956 Reallocation 40585 16A Nottingham 15C Leicester Midland  
08/09/1956 Reallocation 40632 20G Hellifield 16A Nottingham  
08/09/1956 Reallocation 40685 16A Nottingham 20G Hellifield  
27/10/1956 Reallocation 40600 61A Kittybrewster 61C Keith  
27/10/1956 Reallocation 40622 30A Corkerhill 61C Keith  
27/10/1956 Reallocation 40647 30D Ayr 67A Corkerhill  
03/11/1956 Reallocation 40671 7A Llandudno Junction 10B Preston  
23/02/1957 Reallocation 40582 12D Workington 12A Carlisle Upperby  
16/03/1957 Reallocation 40617 30B Hurlford 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill  
16/03/1957 Reallocation 40618 30B Hurlford 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill  
23/03/1957 Reallocation 40631 17B Burton 10C Patricroft  
23/03/1957 Reallocation 40652 12B Carlisle Upperby 5A Crewe North  
23/03/1957 Reallocation 40653 2C Northampton 5A Crewe North  
23/03/1957 Reallocation 40655 12A Carlisle Upperby 5A Crewe North  
23/03/1957 Reallocation 40671 10B Preston 10C Patricroft  
23/03/1957 Reallocation 40673 10B Preston 5A Crewe North  
23/03/1957 Reallocation 40692 12A Carlisle Upperby 5A Crewe North  
13/04/1957 Reallocation 40617 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 61C Keith  
13/04/1957 Reallocation 40618 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 61C Keith  
08/1957 Condemned 40676 10C Patricroft   COND  
10/08/1957 Reallocation 40580 6A Chester (MR) 6G Llandudno Junction  
10/08/1957 Reallocation 40586 26C Bolton 24G Skipton  
10/08/1957 Reallocation 40675 6A Chester (MR) 6G Llandudno Junction  
10/08/1957 Reallocation 40679 6A Chester (MR) 5A Crewe North  
10/08/1957 Reallocation 40695 12A Carlisle Upperby 10B Preston  
10/08/1957 Reallocation 40699 12B Carlisle Upperby 10B Preston  
05/10/1957 Reallocation 40585 15C Leicester Midland 16A Nottingham  
05/10/1957 Reallocation 40695 10B Preston 11B Barrow in Furness  
05/10/1957 Reallocation 40699 10B Preston 10C Patricroft  
26/10/1957 Reallocation 40647 67A Corkerhill 67C Ayr  
09/11/1957 Reallocation 40581 25G Farnley Junction 55D Royston  
30/11/1957 Reallocation 40657 12A Carlisle Upperby 10B Preston  
28/12/1957 Reallocation 40567 5A Crewe North 14B Kentish Town  
28/12/1957 Reallocation 40580 6G Llandudno Junction 14B Kentish Town  
28/12/1957 Reallocation 40582 12A Carlisle Upperby 14B Kentish Town  
28/12/1957 Reallocation 40673 5A Crewe North 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)  
28/12/1957 Reallocation 40675 6G Llandudno Junction 5C Stafford  
25/01/1958 Reallocation 40692 5A Crewe North 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)  
14/06/1958 Reallocation 40673 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 3A Bescot  
14/06/1958 Reallocation 40677 2E Northampton 24K Preston  
14/06/1958 Reallocation 40681 26C Bolton 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)  
14/06/1958 Reallocation 40683 2E Northampton 24K Preston  
14/06/1958 Reallocation 40692 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 3A Bescot  
05/07/1958 Reallocation 40566 67B Hurlford 68C Stranraer  
04/10/1958 Reallocation 40635 10C Patricroft 6G Llandudno Junction  
04/10/1958 Reallocation 40699 10C Patricroft 6G Llandudno Junction  
25/10/1958 Reallocation 40606 30C Ardrossan 64D Carstairs  
22/11/1958 Reallocation 40606 64D Carstairs 67D Ardrossan  
20/12/1958 Reallocation 40595 30A Corkerhill 67C Ayr  
20/12/1958 Reallocation 40679 5A Crewe North 99C Crewe Works  
27/12/1958 Reallocation 40679 99C Crewe Works 5A Crewe North  
21/02/1959 Reallocation 40568 71H Templecombe (S&D) 21B Bournville  
04/1959 Condemned 40600 61C Keith   COND  
11/04/1959 Reallocation 40608 30C Ardrossan 67B Hurlford  
11/04/1959 Reallocation 40609 30C Ardrossan 67B Hurlford  
05/1959 Condemned 40573 30B Hurlford   COND  
05/1959 Condemned 40590 30D Ayr   COND  
05/1959 Condemned 40599 30A Corkerhill   COND  
05/1959 Condemned 40606 67D Ardrossan   COND  
05/1959 Condemned 40610 30D Ayr   COND  
02/05/1959 Reallocation 40652 5A Crewe North 82G Templecombe (S&D)  
06/06/1959 Reallocation 40607 67D Ardrossan 67B Hurlford  
06/06/1959 Reallocation 40626 30C Ardrossan 67B Hurlford  
07/1959 Condemned 40607 67B Hurlford   COND  
07/1959 Condemned 40616 12H Stranraer   COND  
07/1959 Condemned 40666 67D Ardrossan   COND  
07/1959 Condemned 40688 30B Hurlford   COND  
07/1959 Condemned 40693 9A Longsight   COND  
04/07/1959 Reallocation 40682 17A Derby 16A Nottingham  
18/07/1959 Reallocation 40613 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 68C Stranraer  
18/07/1959 Reallocation 40615 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 68C Stranraer  
08/1959 Condemned 40567 14B Kentish Town   COND  
08/1959 Condemned 40587 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)   COND  
08/1959 Condemned 40675 5C Stafford   COND  
15/08/1959 Reallocation 40629 12A Carlisle Upperby 68C Stranraer  
29/08/1959 Reallocation 40602 68A Carlisle Kingmoor 67B Hurlford  
29/08/1959 Reallocation 40651 68A Carlisle Kingmoor 67B Hurlford  
09/1959 Condemned 40608 67B Hurlford   COND  
09/1959 Condemned 40611 12H Stranraer   COND  
26/09/1959 Reallocation 40629 68C Stranraer 67B Hurlford  
10/1959 Condemned 40605 67B Hurlford   COND  
24/10/1959 Reallocation 40691 18C Hasland 16A Nottingham  
11/1959 Condemned 40565 20H Lancaster Green Ayre   COND  
11/1959 Condemned 40568 21B Bournville   COND  
11/1959 Condemned 40576 12G Dumfries   COND  
11/1959 Condemned 40589 6K Rhyl   COND  
11/1959 Condemned 40594 30A Corkerhill   COND  
11/1959 Condemned 40598 67A Corkerhill   COND  
11/1959 Condemned 40617 61C Keith   COND  
11/1959 Condemned 40633 17B Burton   COND  
11/1959 Condemned 40636 30A Corkerhill   COND  
11/1959 Condemned 40644 30B Hurlford   COND  
11/1959 Condemned 40649 30A Corkerhill   COND  
11/1959 Condemned 40653 5A Crewe North   COND  
11/1959 Condemned 40655 5A Crewe North   COND  
11/1959 Condemned 40656 12A Carlisle Upperby   COND  
11/1959 Condemned 40658 6A Chester (MR)   COND  
11/1959 Condemned 40660 5A Crewe North   COND  
11/1959 Condemned 40667 30C Ardrossan   COND  
11/1959 Condemned 40673 3A Bescot   COND  
11/1959 Condemned 40674 9A Longsight   COND  
11/1959 Condemned 40677 24K Preston   COND  
11/1959 Condemned 40679 5A Crewe North   COND  
11/1959 Condemned 40680 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)   COND  
07/11/1959 Reallocation 40659 5A Crewe North 1C Watford  
07/11/1959 Reallocation 40678 5C Stafford 3A Bescot  
21/11/1959 Reallocation 40574 30D Ayr 67B Hurlford  
21/11/1959 Reallocation 40575 30D Ayr 67B Hurlford  
21/11/1959 Reallocation 40595 67C Ayr 67B Hurlford  
21/11/1959 Reallocation 40647 67C Ayr 67B Hurlford  
21/11/1959 Reallocation 40670 30D Ayr 68B Dumfries  
28/11/1959 Reallocation 40602 67B Hurlford 12A Carlisle Kingmoor  
28/11/1959 Reallocation 40613 68C Stranraer 12A Carlisle Kingmoor  
28/11/1959 Reallocation 40615 68C Stranraer 12A Carlisle Kingmoor  
28/11/1959 Reallocation 40629 67B Hurlford 12B Carlisle Upperby  
28/11/1959 Reallocation 40651 67B Hurlford 12A Carlisle Kingmoor  
12/1959 Condemned 40582 14B Kentish Town   COND  
12/1959 Condemned 40601 71G Bath Green Park (S&D)   COND  
12/1959 Condemned 40654 12B Carlisle Upperby   COND  
12/1959 Condemned 40699 6G Llandudno Junction   COND  
19/12/1959 Reallocation 40603 30A Corkerhill 61C Keith  
19/12/1959 Reallocation 40604 61A Kittybrewster 61C Keith  
19/12/1959 Reallocation 40641 30A Corkerhill 68C Stranraer  
19/12/1959 Reallocation 40642 30A Corkerhill 68C Stranraer  
16/01/1960 Reallocation 40641 68C Stranraer 67B Hurlford  
16/01/1960 Reallocation 40642 68C Stranraer 67B Hurlford  
12/03/1960 Reallocation 40602 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 67A Corkerhill  
12/03/1960 Reallocation 40613 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 67A Corkerhill  
12/03/1960 Reallocation 40615 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 67A Corkerhill  
12/03/1960 Reallocation 40629 12B Carlisle Upperby 67A Corkerhill  
12/03/1960 Reallocation 40651 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 67A Corkerhill  
12/03/1960 Reallocation 40695 11B Barrow in Furness 67A Corkerhill  
05/1960 Condemned 40652 82G Templecombe (S&D)   COND  
07/05/1960 Reallocation 40646 5C Stafford 21B Bescot  
07/05/1960 Reallocation 40694 10B Preston 21B Bescot  
02/07/1960 Reallocation 40602 67A Corkerhill 67B Hurlford  
02/07/1960 Reallocation 40651 67A Corkerhill 67B Hurlford  
02/07/1960 Reallocation 40695 67A Corkerhill 67B Hurlford  
23/07/1960 Reallocation 40586 24G Skipton 27C Southport  
30/07/1960 Reallocation 40664 30D Ayr 67B Hurlford  
08/1960 Condemned 40698 22C Bath Green Park (S&D)   COND  
27/08/1960 Reallocation 40681 27D Wigan Central (L&Y) 26F Patricroft  
09/1960 Condemned 40583 5C Stafford   COND  
09/1960 Condemned 40631 10C Patricroft   COND  
10/1960 Condemned 40581 55D Royston   COND  
10/1960 Condemned 40630 16D Mansfield   COND  
10/1960 Condemned 40690 20A Holbeck (MR)   COND  
29/10/1960 Reallocation 40586 27C Southport 27A Bank Hall  
11/1960 Condemned 40584 25G Farnley Junction   COND  
05/11/1960 Condemned 40588 27A Bank Hall   COND  
03/12/1960 Condemned 40671 10C Patricroft   COND  
10/12/1960 Reallocation 40586 27A Bank Hall 26F Patricroft  
10/12/1960 Reallocation 40657 10B Preston 1C Watford  
10/12/1960 Reallocation 40683 24K Preston 1C Watford  
01/1961 Condemned 40627 30A Corkerhill   COND  
01/1961 Condemned 40628 12A Carlisle Upperby   COND  
02/1961 Condemned 40580 14B Kentish Town   COND  
02/1961 Condemned 40585 16A Nottingham   COND  
02/1961 Condemned 40632 16A Nottingham   COND  
02/1961 Condemned 40635 6G Llandudno Junction   COND  
02/1961 Condemned 40682 16A Nottingham   COND  
02/1961 Condemned 40691 16A Nottingham   COND  
03/1961 Condemned 40683 1C Watford   COND  
03/1961 Condemned 40695 67B Hurlford   COND  
04/1961 Condemned 40574 67B Hurlford   COND  
04/1961 Condemned 40586 26F Patricroft   COND  
04/1961 Condemned 40629 67A Corkerhill   COND  
05/1961 Condemned 40622 61C Keith   COND  
06/1961 Condemned 40595 67B Hurlford   COND  
06/1961 Condemned 40604 61C Keith   COND  
06/1961 Condemned 40623 12H Stranraer   COND  
06/1961 Condemned 40659 1C Watford   COND  
07/1961 Condemned 40571 30B Hurlford   COND  
07/1961 Condemned 40572 67B Hurlford   COND  
07/1961 Condemned 40577 12G Dumfries   COND  
07/1961 Condemned 40579 30C Ardrossan   COND  
07/1961 Condemned 40603 61C Keith   COND  
07/1961 Condemned 40678 3A Bescot   COND  
07/1961 Condemned 40684 27A Bank Hall   COND  
07/1961 Condemned 40685 20G Hellifield   COND  
01/07/1961 Reallocation 40603 98W   67A Corkerhill  
01/07/1961 Reallocation 40618 61C Keith 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill  
08/1961 Condemned 40570 30B Hurlford   COND  
08/1961 Condemned 40575 67B Hurlford   COND  
08/1961 Condemned 40593 30B Hurlford   COND  
08/1961 Condemned 40597 30B Hurlford   COND  
08/1961 Condemned 40624 30C Ardrossan   COND  
08/1961 Condemned 40692 3A Bescot   COND  
26/08/1961 Reallocation 40638 67D Ardrossan 68C Stranraer  
26/08/1961 Reallocation 40648 61A Kittybrewster 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill  
26/08/1961 Reallocation 40650 30A Corkerhill 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill  
26/08/1961 Reallocation 40663 61A Kittybrewster 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill  
09/1961 Condemned 40566 68C Stranraer   COND  
09/1961 Condemned 40596 30A Corkerhill   COND  
09/1961 Condemned 40618 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill   COND  
09/1961 Condemned 40637 30A Corkerhill   COND  
09/1961 Condemned 40640 30D Ayr   COND  
09/1961 Condemned 40648 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill   COND  
09/1961 Condemned 40650 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill   COND  
09/1961 Condemned 40663 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill   COND  
09/1961 Condemned 40669 30C Ardrossan   COND  
10/1961 Condemned 40602 67B Hurlford   COND  
10/1961 Condemned 40612 30B Hurlford   COND  
10/1961 Condemned 40613 67A Corkerhill   COND  
10/1961 Condemned 40614 12G Dumfries   COND  
10/1961 Condemned 40615 67A Corkerhill   COND  
10/1961 Condemned 40619 28C Carstairs   COND  
10/1961 Condemned 40620 67A Corkerhill   COND  
10/1961 Condemned 40621 30A Corkerhill   COND  
10/1961 Condemned 40625 30C Ardrossan   COND  
10/1961 Condemned 40626 67B Hurlford   COND  
10/1961 Condemned 40641 67B Hurlford   COND  
10/1961 Condemned 40642 67B Hurlford   COND  
10/1961 Condemned 40643 30B Hurlford   COND  
10/1961 Condemned 40645 30B Hurlford   COND  
10/1961 Condemned 40647 67B Hurlford   COND  
10/1961 Condemned 40668 30C Ardrossan   COND  
10/1961 Condemned 40686 30B Hurlford   COND  
10/1961 Condemned 40687 30B Hurlford   COND  
10/1961 Condemned 40689 30B Hurlford   COND  
11/1961 Condemned 40569 71H Templecombe (S&D)   COND  
11/1961 Condemned 40578 30C Ardrossan   COND  
22/11/1961 Condemned 40651 67B Hurlford   COND  
27/11/1961 Condemned 40661 30B Hurlford   COND  
21/12/1961 Condemned 40592 67B Hurlford   COND  
02/1962 Condemned 40564 22D Templecombe (S&D)   COND  
02/1962 Condemned 40697 22C Bath Green Park (S&D)   COND  
05/1962 Condemned 40563 22D Templecombe (S&D)   COND  
05/1962 Condemned 40634 22D Templecombe (S&D)   COND  
12/05/1962 Condemned 40646 21B Bescot   COND  
21/05/1962 Condemned 40638 68C Stranraer   COND  
06/1962 Condemned 40696 22C Bath Green Park (S&D)   COND  
11/06/1962 Condemned 40665 30B Hurlford   COND  
16/07/1962 Condemned 40664 67B Hurlford   COND  
04/08/1962 Condemned 40681 26F Patricroft   COND  
09/1962 Condemned 40700 22C Bath Green Park (S&D)   COND  
02/10/1962 Condemned 40609 67B Hurlford   COND  
20/10/1962 Condemned 40657 1C Watford   COND  
20/10/1962 Condemned 40672 1C Watford   COND  
17/11/1962 Condemned 40694 21B Bescot   COND  
17/12/1962 Condemned 40670 68B Dumfries   COND