Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 63 Today
» 1154 Yesterday
» 4585 Week
» 25487 Month
» 25487 Year
» 1247052 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LMS Fowler "2P" Class 4-4-0


Date Number (at time) Depot (at time) Code Details Ref Link
Sun 26/11/1961 40569 82G   Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Scrap road - intact. SLS 1/1962  
Sat 10/03/1962 40574,
40594,
40603,
40618,
40619,
40650,
40663
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn
  Inverurie Works visit.: Around the works. - Cemetery - boiler and/or firebox only.
Inverurie Works visit.: Around the works. - Cemetery - boiler and/or firebox only.
Inverurie Works visit.: Around the works. - Cemetery - boiler and/or firebox only.
Inverurie Works visit.: Around the works. - Cemetery - boiler and/or firebox only.
Inverurie Works visit.: Around the works. - Cemetery - boiler and/or firebox only.
Inverurie Works visit.: Around the works. - Cemetery - boiler and/or firebox only.
Inverurie Works visit.: Around the works. - Cemetery - boiler and/or firebox only.
   
Sun 18/03/1962 40681 26F   On Patricroft shed.    
Wed 18/04/1962 40645,
40647
Wdn,
Wdn
  Inverurie Works visit: Around the works - Being cut up.
Inverurie Works visit: Around the works - Being cut up.
SLS 5/1962  
Sat 02/06/1962 40594,
40618,
40619,
40645,
40647
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn
  Inverurie Works visit: Around the works - In the "Cemetery" SLS 7/1962