Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 98 Today
» 1103 Yesterday
» 5735 Week
» 18839 Month
» 18839 Year
» 1240404 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LMS Fowler "2P" Class 4-4-0


LMS BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
563 40563 03/1928 05/1962 Yeovil Pen Mill 34.17 34.36
564 40564 04/1928 02/1962 Yeovil Pen Mill 33.83 33.86
565 40565 04/1928 11/1959 Preston 31.58 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 04/1962 34.02
566 40566 04/1928 09/1961 Corkerhill 33.42 34.52
567 40567 04/1928 08/1959 Kentish Town 31.33 31.86
568 40568 04/1928 11/1959 Bournville 31.58 31.69
569 40569 05/1928 11/1961 Yeovil Pen Mill 33.5 33.61
570 40570 05/1928 08/1961 Hurlford 33.25 33.61
571 40571 05/1928 07/1961 Hurlford 33.17 33.44
572 40572 11/1928 07/1961 Hurlford 32.67 32.85
573 40573 05/1928 05/1959 Hurlford 31 31.36
574 40574 06/1928 04/1961 Hurlford 32.83 32.94
575 40575 10/1929 08/1961 Hurlford 31.83 32.11
576 40576 10/1929 11/1959 Dumfries 30.08 30.27
577 40577 06/1928 07/1961 Dumfries 33.08 33.19
578 40578 07/1928 11/1961 Ardrossan 33.33 35.19
579 40579 07/1928 07/1961 Ardrossan 33 33.36
580 40580 10/1929 02/1961 Kentish Town 31.33 31.85
581 40581 07/1928 10/1960 Royston 32.25 32.27
582 40582 07/1928 12/1959 Kentish Town 31.42 31.77
583 40583 07/1928 09/1960 Stafford 32.17 32.19
584 40584 08/1928 11/1960 Farnley Junction 32.25 32.27
585 40585 08/1928 02/1961 Nottingham 32.5 33.02
586 40586 08/1928 04/1961 Patricroft 32.67 33.44
587 40587 08/1928 08/1959 Wigan Central (L&Y) 31 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 02/1960 31.52
588 40588 08/1928 05/11/1960 Bank Hall 32.25 32.36
589 40589 08/1928 11/1959 Rhyl 31.25 32.77
590 40590 09/1928 05/1959 Ayr 30.67 31.10
592 40592 09/1928 21/12/1961 Hurlford 33.25 34.85
593 40593 09/1928 08/1961 Hurlford 32.92 33.10
594 40594 09/1928 11/1959 Corkerhill 31.17 31.35
595 40595 09/1928 06/1961 Hurlford 32.75 33.19
596 40596 09/1928 09/1961 Corkerhill 33 33.10
597 40597 10/1928 08/1961 Hurlford 32.83 33.11
598 40598 10/1928 11/1959 Corkerhill 31.08 31.36
599 40599 11/1928 05/1959 Corkerhill 30.5 30.77
600 40600 11/1928 04/1959 Keith 30.42 31.35
601 40601 05/1928 12/1959 Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 31.58 32.69
602 40602 11/1928 10/1961 Corkerhill 32.92 34.77
603 40603 11/1928 07/1961 Corkerhill 32.67 32.85
604 40604 11/1928 06/1961 Keith 32.58 32.77
605 40605 11/1928 10/1959 Hurlford 30.92 31.27
606 40606 11/1928 05/1959 Ardrossan 30.5 30.77
607 40607 11/1928 07/1959 Hurlford 30.67 31.68
608 40608 11/1928 09/1959 Hurlford 30.83 31.27
609 40609 11/1928 02/10/1962 Hurlford 33.92 32.94
610 40610 12/1928 05/1959 Ayr 30.42 30.68
611 40611 12/1928 09/1959 Stranraer 30.75 32.35
612 40612 12/1928 10/1961 Hurlford 32.83 33.11
613 40613 10/1929 10/1961 Corkerhill 32 33.69
614 40614 10/1929 10/1961 Dumfries 32 32.69
615 40615 11/1929 10/1961 Corkerhill 31.92 33.85
616 40616 11/1929 07/1959 Stranraer 29.67 Cut Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) 02/1960 30.27
617 40617 11/1929 11/1959 Keith 30 30.27
618 40618 11/1929 09/1961 Aberdeen Ferryhill 31.83 32.02
619 40619 11/1929 10/1961 Hurlford 31.92 32.27
620 40620 11/1929 10/1961 Corkerhill 31.92 33.68
621 40621 11/1929 10/1961 Corkerhill 31.92 33.68
622 40622 11/1929 05/1961 Keith 31.5 31.52
623 40623 12/1929 06/1961 Stranraer 31.5 31.94
624 40624 12/1929 08/1961 Ardrossan 31.67 32.85
625 40625 12/1929 10/1961 Ardrossan 31.83 33.77
626 40626 12/1929 10/1961 Hurlford 31.83 31.94
627 40627 12/1929 01/1961 Corkerhill 31.08 31.44
628 40628 12/1929 01/1961 Carlisle Kingmoor 31.08 32.35
629 40629 01/1930 04/1961 Carlisle Kingmoor 31.25 31.35
630 40630 01/1930 10/1960 Normanton 30.75 30.85
631 40631 01/1930 09/1960 Patricroft 30.67 30.77
632 40632 01/1930 02/1961 Nottingham 31.08 31.27
633 40633 06/1928 11/1959 Burton 31.42 31.94
634 40634 06/1928 05/1962 Yeovil Pen Mill 33.92 34.19
635 40635 07/1928 02/1961 Llandudno Junction 32.58 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 06/1963 34.94
636 40636 08/1931 11/1959 Corkerhill 28.25 28.52
637 40637 08/1931 09/1961 Corkerhill 30.08 30.27
638 40638 08/1931 21/05/1962 Stranraer 30.75 Cut Arnott Young (Troon) 06/1963 31.85
640 40640 08/1931 09/1961 Ayr 30.08 31.94
641 40641 08/1931 10/1961 Hurlford 30.17 30.44
642 40642 08/1931 10/1961 Hurlford 30.17 31.85
643 40643 08/1931 10/1961 Hurlford 30.17 30.53
644 40644 08/1931 11/1959 Hurlford 28.25 28.35
645 40645 08/1931 10/1961 Hurlford 30.17 30.69
646 40646 09/1931 12/05/1962 Bescot 30.67 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1962 31.02
647 40647 09/1931 10/1961 Hurlford 30.08 30.60
648 40648 09/1931 09/1961 Aberdeen Ferryhill 30 30.19
649 40649 09/1931 11/1959 Corkerhill 28.17 28.44
650 40650 09/1931 09/1961 Aberdeen Ferryhill 30 30.44
651 40651 09/1931 22/11/1961 Hurlford 30.17 31.85
652 40652 09/1931 05/1960 Yeovil Pen Mill 28.67 28.85
653 40653 09/1931 11/1959 Crewe North 28.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/1961 29.85
654 40654 10/1931 12/1959 Workington 28.17 28.36
655 40655 10/1931 11/1959 Crewe North 28.08 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/1961 29.77
656 40656 10/1931 11/1959 Carlisle Kingmoor 28.08 29.11
657 40657 10/1931 20/10/1962 Watford 31 31.19
658 40658 10/1931 11/1959 Chester (MR) 28.08 29.69
659 40659 10/1931 06/1961 Watford 29.67 29.94
660 40660 12/1931 11/1959 Crewe North 27.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/1961 29.60
661 40661 12/1931 27/11/1961 Hurlford 29.92 31.60
662 40662 12/1931 09/1954 Hurlford 22.75
663 40663 12/1931 09/1961 Aberdeen Ferryhill 29.75 30.35
664 40664 12/1931 16/07/1962 Stranraer 30.58 Cut Arnott Young (Troon) 05/1963 31.44
665 40665 12/1931 11/06/1962 Hurlford 30.5 Cut Arnott Young (Troon) 05/1963 31.44
666 40666 01/1932 07/1959 Ardrossan 27.5 Cut Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) 02/1960 28.10
667 40667 01/1932 11/1959 Ardrossan 27.83 27.93
668 40668 01/1932 10/1961 Ardrossan 29.75 31.69
669 40669 01/1932 09/1961 Ardrossan 29.67 31.69
670 40670 01/1932 17/12/1962 Ardrossan 30.92 32.11
671 40671 01/1932 03/12/1960 Patricroft 28.92 29.02
672 40672 02/1932 20/10/1962 Watford 30.67 30.85
673 40673 02/1932 11/1959 Bescot 27.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 04/1960 28.18
674 40674 02/1932 11/1959 Longsight 27.75 29.94
675 40675 02/1932 08/1959 Llandudno Junction 27.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 02/1960 28.02
676 40676 02/1932 08/1957 Patricroft 25.5 25.52
677 40677 02/1932 11/1959 Preston 27.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 04/1962 30.18
678 40678 03/1932 07/1961 Bescot 29.33 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1961 29.52
679 40679 03/1932 11/1959 Crewe North 27.67 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/1961 29.35
680 40680 03/1932 11/1959 Wigan Central (L&Y) 27.67
681 40681 04/1932 04/08/1962 Patricroft 30.33 31.19
682 40682 04/1932 02/1961 Nottingham 28.83 29.35
683 40683 04/1932 03/1961 Watford 28.92 29.44
684 40684 04/1932 07/1961 Bank Hall 29.25 29.52
685 40685 04/1932 07/1961 Hellifield 29.25 30.69
686 40686 10/1932 10/1961 Hurlford 29 29.27
687 40687 10/1932 10/1961 Hurlford 29 30.77
688 40688 10/1932 07/1959 Hurlford 26.75 28.52
689 40689 10/1932 10/1961 Hurlford 29 30.77
690 40690 11/1932 10/1960 Holbeck (MR) 27.92 28.02
691 40691 11/1932 02/1961 Nottingham 28.25 28.60
692 40692 11/1932 08/1961 Bescot 28.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1961 28.85
693 40693 11/1932 07/1959 Longsight 26.67 28.93
694 40694 11/1932 17/11/1962 Bescot 30 30.68
695 40695 11/1932 03/1961 Tebay 28.33 28.60
696 40696 11/1932 06/1962 Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 29.58 29.77
697 40697 11/1932 02/1962 Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 29.25 29.35
698 40698 11/1932 08/1960 Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 27.75 27.93
699 40699 12/1932 12/1959 Llandudno Junction 27 27.68
700 40700 12/1932 09/1962 Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 29.75 30.02