Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 177 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1085 Week
» 22067 Month
» 164021 Year
» 1048402 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

175


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To
30/12/1968 Condemned 59327       COND
30/12/1968 Condemned 59370       COND
16/12/1986 Condemned 59356       COND
16/12/1986 Condemned 59373       COND
19/06/1988 Condemned 59375       COND
09/09/1988 Condemned 59344       COND