Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 66 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1013 Week
» 19795 Month
» 268088 Year
» 1152469 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

06 0-4-0


Date Number (at time) Depot (at time) Code Details Ref Link
Sat 14/10/1967 D2441 Wdn   Slag Reduction Co., Ickles scrapyard: Noted still intact in the scrapyard of the Slag Reduction Co., Ickles (Rotherham) RCTS 1/1968  
Sat 13/04/1968 D2413,
D2434
64H,
67C
  Glasgow Works visit: On works at Glasgow
Glasgow Works visit: On works at Glasgow
RCTS 6/1968  
Tue 27/08/1968 D2412,
D2414,
D2429
Wdn,
62B,
66A
  Dundee depot: Around the area - On the shed
Dundee depot: Around the area - Stabled east of the station
Dundee depot: Around the area - On the shed
RO 12/1968  
Wed 28/08/1968 D2420,
D2421
61B,
61B
  Aberdeen: Around the area - On Ferryhill shed
Aberdeen: Around the area - On Ferryhill shed
RO 11/1968  
Sat 12/07/1969 D2433 66A   Gourock Station: Stabled RO 9/1969  
Sat 12/07/1969 D2424 65F   Grangemouth depot: On shed RO 9/1969  
Sun 13/07/1969 D2431 66A   Polmadie Depot visit: On Polmadie shed. RO 10/1969  
Tue 15/07/1969 D2423 60A   Inverness shed and environs: On shed RO 9/1969  
Fri 20/08/1971 D2433 66A   Polmadie depot.: Around the shed. - Inside the shed - green. Keith Long  
Sat 15/04/1972 D2436 Wdn   Polmadie depot: Dumped - Derelict and cannibalised