105
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
18/02/1957 | To Service | 50371 | NEW | 53C | Hull Springhead | |
21/02/1957 | To Service | 50372 | NEW | 53C | Hull Springhead | |
26/02/1957 | To Service | 50373 | NEW | 53C | Hull Springhead | |
04/03/1957 | To Service | 50374 | NEW | 53C | Hull Springhead | |
11/03/1957 | To Service | 50375 | NEW | 53C | Hull Springhead | |
18/03/1957 | To Service | 50376 | NEW | 53C | Hull Springhead | |
22/03/1957 | To Service | 50377 | NEW | 53C | Hull Springhead | |
11/04/1957 | To Service | 50378 | NEW | 53C | Hull Springhead | |
17/04/1957 | To Service | 50379 | NEW | 53C | Hull Springhead | |
26/04/1957 | To Service | 50380 | NEW | 53C | Hull Springhead | |
01/05/1957 | To Service | 50381 | NEW | 53C | Hull Springhead | |
06/05/1957 | To Service | 50382 | NEW | 53C | Hull Springhead | |
13/05/1957 | To Service | 50383 | NEW | 53C | Hull Springhead | |
21/05/1957 | To Service | 50384 | NEW | 53C | Hull Springhead | |
31/05/1957 | To Service | 50385 | NEW | 53C | Hull Springhead | |
31/05/1957 | To Service | 50386 | NEW | 53C | Hull Springhead | |
27/06/1957 | To Service | 50387 | NEW | 53C | Hull Springhead | |
05/07/1957 | To Service | 50388 | NEW | 53C | Hull Springhead | |
05/07/1957 | To Service | 50389 | NEW | 53C | Hull Springhead | |
31/05/1958 | To Service | 51254 | NEW | 40A | Lincoln | |
31/05/1958 | To Service | 51255 | NEW | 40A | Lincoln | |
06/06/1958 | To Service | 51256 | NEW | 40A | Lincoln | |
06/06/1958 | To Service | 51257 | NEW | 40A | Lincoln | |
12/06/1958 | To Service | 51258 | NEW | 40A | Lincoln | |
19/06/1958 | To Service | 51259 | NEW | 40A | Lincoln | |
19/06/1958 | To Service | 51260 | NEW | 40A | Lincoln | |
26/06/1958 | To Service | 51261 | NEW | 40A | Lincoln | |
26/06/1958 | To Service | 51262 | NEW | 40A | Lincoln | |
01/07/1958 | To Service | 51263 | NEW | 40A | Lincoln | |
17/07/1958 | To Service | 51264 | NEW | 31A | Cambridge | |
23/07/1958 | To Service | 51265 | NEW | 31A | Cambridge | |
29/07/1958 | To Service | 51266 | NEW | 31A | Cambridge | |
29/07/1958 | To Service | 51267 | NEW | 31A | Cambridge | |
29/07/1958 | To Service | 51268 | NEW | 31A | Cambridge | |
01/08/1958 | To Service | 51269 | NEW | 31A | Cambridge | |
01/08/1958 | To Service | 51270 | NEW | 31A | Cambridge | |
08/08/1958 | To Service | 51271 | NEW | 31A | Cambridge | |
03/09/1958 | To Service | 51272 | NEW | 31A | Cambridge | |
03/09/1958 | To Service | 51273 | NEW | 31A | Cambridge | |
09/09/1958 | To Service | 51274 | NEW | 31A | Cambridge | |
12/09/1958 | To Service | 51275 | NEW | 31A | Cambridge | |
19/09/1958 | To Service | 51276 | NEW | 31A | Cambridge | |
24/09/1958 | To Service | 51277 | NEW | 31A | Cambridge | |
26/09/1958 | To Service | 51278 | NEW | 31A | Cambridge | |
03/10/1958 | To Service | 51279 | NEW | 31A | Cambridge | |
03/10/1958 | To Service | 51280 | NEW | 31A | Cambridge | |
10/10/1958 | To Service | 51281 | NEW | 31A | Cambridge | |
17/10/1958 | To Service | 51282 | NEW | 31A | Cambridge | |
17/10/1958 | To Service | 51283 | NEW | 31A | Cambridge | |
29/10/1958 | To Service | 51284 | NEW | 31A | Cambridge | |
29/10/1958 | To Service | 51285 | NEW | 31A | Cambridge | |
05/11/1958 | To Service | 51286 | NEW | 31A | Cambridge | |
05/11/1958 | To Service | 51287 | NEW | 31A | Cambridge | |
12/11/1958 | To Service | 51288 | NEW | 31A | Cambridge | |
23/11/1958 | To Service | 51289 | NEW | 40A | Lincoln | |
23/11/1958 | To Service | 51290 | NEW | 40A | Lincoln | |
29/11/1958 | To Service | 51291 | NEW | 40A | Lincoln | |
06/12/1958 | To Service | 51292 | NEW | 40A | Lincoln | |
06/12/1958 | To Service | 51293 | NEW | 40A | Lincoln | |
13/12/1958 | To Service | 51294 | NEW | 40A | Lincoln | |
18/12/1958 | To Service | 51295 | NEW | 40A | Lincoln | |
31/12/1958 | To Service | 51296 | NEW | 31A | Cambridge | |
05/01/1959 | To Service | 51297 | NEW | 40A | Lincoln | |
05/01/1959 | To Service | 51298 | NEW | 31A | Cambridge | |
15/01/1959 | To Service | 51299 | NEW | 31A | Cambridge | |
21/01/1959 | To Service | 51300 | NEW | 40A | Lincoln | |
29/01/1959 | To Service | 51301 | NEW | 40A | Lincoln | |
09/02/1959 | To Service | 51471 | NEW | 40A | Lincoln | |
09/02/1959 | To Service | 51472 | NEW | 40A | Lincoln | |
14/02/1959 | To Service | 51473 | NEW | 61A | Kittybrewster | |
21/02/1959 | To Service | 51474 | NEW | 61A | Kittybrewster | |
21/02/1959 | To Service | 51475 | NEW | 61A | Kittybrewster | |
16/03/1959 | To Service | 51476 | NEW | 61A | Kittybrewster | |
16/03/1959 | To Service | 51477 | NEW | 61A | Kittybrewster | |
16/03/1959 | To Service | 51478 | NEW | 61A | Kittybrewster | |
16/03/1959 | To Service | 51479 | NEW | 61A | Kittybrewster | |
16/03/1959 | To Service | 51480 | NEW | 61A | Kittybrewster | |
20/03/1959 | To Service | 51481 | NEW | 61A | Kittybrewster | |
01/04/1959 | To Service | 51482 | NEW | 61A | Kittybrewster | |
01/04/1959 | To Service | 51483 | NEW | 61A | Kittybrewster | |
01/04/1959 | To Service | 51484 | NEW | 61A | Kittybrewster | |
08/04/1959 | To Service | 51485 | NEW | 61A | Kittybrewster | |
20/04/1959 | To Service | 51486 | NEW | 61A | Kittybrewster | |
20/04/1959 | To Service | 51487 | NEW | 61A | Kittybrewster | |
20/04/1959 | To Service | 51488 | NEW | 61A | Kittybrewster | |
05/05/1959 | To Service | 51489 | NEW | 61A | Kittybrewster | |
07/10/1961 | Condemned | 50808 | COND | |||
24/02/1962 | Condemned | 50783 | COND | |||
16/04/1967 | Condemned | 51264 | 31A | Cambridge | COND | |
02/12/1967 | Condemned | 51488 | 61A | Kittybrewster | COND | |
22/02/1969 | Condemned | 50774 | COND | |||
22/02/1969 | Condemned | 50799 | COND | |||
19/04/1969 | Condemned | 50811 | COND | |||
25/05/1969 | Condemned | 50775 | COND | |||
25/05/1969 | Condemned | 50780 | COND | |||
25/05/1969 | Condemned | 50813 | COND | |||
25/05/1969 | Condemned | 50816 | COND | |||
31/01/1970 | Condemned | 50817 | COND | |||
31/12/1977 | Reallocation | 51299 | 31A | Cambridge | GF | South Gosforth |
09/04/1978 | Condemned | 50249 | COND | |||
09/04/1978 | Condemned | 51486 | 61A | Kittybrewster | COND | |
09/04/1978 | Condemned | 51487 | 61A | Kittybrewster | COND | |
09/04/1978 | Condemned | 51491 | COND | |||
26/07/1981 | Reallocation | 50386 | 53C | Hull Springhead | NR | Norwich Thorpe |
26/07/1981 | Reallocation | 51478 | 61A | Kittybrewster | NR | Norwich Thorpe |
26/07/1981 | Reallocation | 51482 | 61A | Kittybrewster | NR | Norwich Thorpe |
25/11/1982 | Condemned | 51473 | 61A | Kittybrewster | COND | |
25/11/1982 | Condemned | 51475 | 61A | Kittybrewster | COND | |
25/11/1982 | Condemned | 51476 | 61A | Kittybrewster | COND | |
25/11/1982 | Condemned | 51477 | 61A | Kittybrewster | COND | |
25/11/1982 | Condemned | 51483 | 61A | Kittybrewster | COND | |
19/05/1985 | Condemned | 51277 | 31A | Cambridge | COND | |
19/05/1985 | Condemned | 51279 | 31A | Cambridge | COND | |
28/09/1986 | Condemned | 51263 | 40A | Lincoln | COND | |
28/09/1986 | Condemned | 51271 | 31A | Cambridge | COND | |
28/09/1986 | Condemned | 51298 | 31A | Cambridge | COND | |
28/09/1986 | Condemned | 51472 | 40A | Lincoln | COND | |
21/12/1986 | Condemned | 51268 | 31A | Cambridge | COND | |
21/12/1986 | Condemned | 51294 | 40A | Lincoln | COND | |
12/04/1987 | Condemned | 51478 | NR | Norwich Thorpe | COND | |
10/05/1987 | Condemned | 51284 | 31A | Cambridge | COND | |
10/05/1987 | Condemned | 51299 | GF | South Gosforth | COND |