77 Co-Co
Class | NS (Dutch) | BR (Pre Tops) | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EM2 | 1502 | 27000 | 28/12/1953 | 36b 39a W |
Wath Reddish Withdrawn |
28/12/1953 01/06/1954 05/10/1968 |
05/10/1968 |
EM2 | 1505 | 27001 | 22/03/1954 | 36b W |
Wath Withdrawn |
22/03/1954 05/10/1968 |
05/10/1968 |
EM2 | 1506 | 27002 | 18/05/1954 | 36b W |
Wath Withdrawn |
18/05/1954 05/10/1968 |
05/10/1968 |
EM2 | 1501 | 27003 | 05/08/1954 | 39a W |
Reddish Withdrawn |
05/08/1954 05/10/1968 |
05/10/1968 |
EM2 | 1503 | 27004 | 18/09/1954 | 39a W |
Reddish Withdrawn |
18/09/1954 05/10/1968 |
05/10/1968 |
EM2 | 27005 | 11/12/1954 | 39a W |
Reddish Withdrawn |
11/12/1954 05/10/1968 |
05/10/1968 | |
EM2 | 1504 | 27006 | 31/12/1954 | 39a W |
Reddish Withdrawn |
31/12/1954 05/10/1968 |
05/10/1968 |