Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 285 Today
» 752 Yesterday
» 3524 Week
» 16037 Month
» 104229 Year
» 988610 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

176


BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
59484 28/11/1959 Reading (W.R.) 59.43
59485 02/01/1960 Reading (W.R.) 59.33
59486 06/02/1960 Southall 59.24
59487 20/02/1960 Reading (W.R.) 59.20
59488 27/02/1960 Reading (W.R.) 59.18
59489 05/03/1960 Reading (W.R.) 59.16
59490 19/03/1960 Reading (W.R.) 59.12
59491 26/03/1960 Southall 59.10
59492 02/04/1960 Southall 59.08
59493 09/04/1960 Southall 59.07
59494 16/04/1960 Southall 59.05
59495 23/04/1960 Reading (W.R.) 59.03
59496 30/04/1960 Reading (W.R.) 59.01
59497 30/04/1960 Reading (W.R.) 59.01
59498 07/05/1960 Southall 58.99
59499 14/05/1960 Southall 58.97
59500 21/05/1960 Southall 58.95
59501 28/05/1960 Southall 58.93
59502 04/06/1960 Southall 58.91
59503 04/06/1960 Reading (W.R.) 58.91
59504 11/06/1960 Reading (W.R.) 58.89
59505 18/06/1960 Reading (W.R.) 58.87
59506 18/06/1960 Reading (W.R.) 58.87
59507 25/06/1960 Reading (W.R.) 58.85
59508 02/07/1960 Southall 58.84
59509 02/07/1960 Southall 58.84
59510 16/07/1960 Reading (W.R.) 58.80
59511 23/07/1960 Southall 58.78
59512 23/07/1960 Southall 58.78
59513 30/07/1960 Southall 58.76
59514 30/07/1960 Reading (W.R.) 58.76
59515 30/07/1960 Reading (W.R.) 58.76
59516 27/08/1960 Southall 58.68
59517 27/08/1960 Southall 58.68
59518 03/09/1960 Southall 58.66
59519 10/09/1960 Reading (W.R.) 58.64
59520 17/09/1960 Reading (W.R.) 58.62
59521 01/10/1960 Reading (W.R.) 58.59
59522 22/10/1960 Reading (W.R.) 58.53