LNER Peppercorn "A1" Class 4-6-2
Class | Number | Built | Name | Name Date | Notes | Removed | Date Withdrawn |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
A1 | 60114 | 06/08/1948 | W.P. ALLEN | 26/10/1948 | 26/12/1964 | ||
A1 | 60115 | 03/09/1948 | MEG MERRILIES | 06/1950 | 12/11/1962 | ||
A1 | 60116 | 08/10/1948 | HAL O' THE WYND | 05/1951 | 14/06/1965 | ||
A1 | 60117 | 22/10/1948 | BOIS ROUSSEL | 07/1950 | 21/06/1965 | ||
A1 | 60118 | 12/11/1948 | ARCHIBALD STURROCK | 07/1950 | 04/10/1965 | ||
A1 | 60119 | 26/11/1948 | PATRICK STIRLING | 07/1950 | 31/05/1964 | ||
A1 | 60120 | 10/12/1948 | KITTIWAKE | 05/1950 | 20/01/1964 | ||
A1 | 60121 | 22/12/1948 | SILURIAN | 05/1950 | 04/10/1965 | ||
A1 | 60122 | 24/12/1948 | CURLEW | 07/1950 | 17/12/1962 | ||
A1 | 60123 | 10/02/1949 | H.A. IVATT | 07/1950 | 01/10/1962 | ||
A1 | 60124 | 23/03/1949 | KENILWORTH | 08/1950 | 27/03/1966 | ||
A1 | 60125 | 22/04/1949 | SCOTTISH UNION | 01/1951 | 04/07/1964 | ||
A1 | 60126 | 27/04/1949 | SIR VINCENT RAVEN | 08/1950 | 18/01/1965 | ||
A1 | 60127 | 13/05/1949 | WILSON WORSDELL | 09/1950 | 14/06/1965 | ||
A1 | 60128 | 19/05/1949 | BONGRACE | 11/1950 | 10/01/1965 | ||
A1 | 60129 | 15/06/1949 | GUY MANNERING | 11/1950 | 11/10/1965 | ||
A1 | 60130 | 28/09/1948 | KESTREL | 07/1950 | 04/10/1965 | ||
A1 | 60131 | 05/10/1948 | OSPREY | 06/1950 | 04/10/1965 | ||
A1 | 60132 | 18/10/1948 | MARMION | 12/1950 | 14/06/1965 | ||
A1 | 60133 | 30/10/1948 | POMMERN | 04/1950 | 21/06/1965 | ||
A1 | 60134 | 05/11/1948 | FOXHUNTER | 10/1950 | 04/10/1965 | ||
A1 | 60135 | 18/11/1948 | MADGE WILDFIRE | 10/1950 | 12/11/1962 | ||
A1 | 60136 | 26/11/1948 | ALCAZAR | 12/1950 | 22/05/1963 | ||
A1 | 60137 | 03/12/1948 | REDGAUNTLET | 06/1950 | 29/10/1962 | ||
A1 | 60138 | 10/12/1948 | BOSWELL | 09/1950 | 04/10/1965 | ||
A1 | 60139 | 23/12/1948 | SEA EAGLE | 05/1950 | 07/06/1964 | ||
A1 | 60140 | 24/12/1948 | BALMORAL | 07/1950 | 11/01/1965 | ||
A1 | 60141 | 31/12/1948 | ABBOTSFORD | 05/1950 | 05/10/1964 | ||
A1 | 60142 | 02/02/1949 | EDWARD FLETCHER | 10/1950 | 14/06/1965 | ||
A1 | 60143 | 22/02/1949 | SIR WALTER SCOTT | 09/1950 | 06/05/1964 | ||
A1 | 60144 | 02/03/1949 | KING'S COURIER | 01/1951 | 30/04/1963 | ||
A1 | 60145 | 23/03/1949 | SAINT MUNGO | 08/1950 | 19/06/1966 | ||
A1 | 60146 | 11/04/1949 | PEREGRINE | 12/1950 | 04/10/1965 | ||
A1 | 60147 | 13/04/1949 | NORTH EASTERN | 03/1952 | 28/08/1964 | ||
A1 | 60148 | 25/05/1949 | ABOYEUR | 01/1951 | 21/06/1965 | ||
A1 | 60149 | 31/05/1949 | AMADIS | 12/1950 | 07/06/1964 | ||
A1 | 60150 | 15/06/1949 | WILLBROOK | 01/1951 | 05/10/1964 | ||
A1 | 60151 | 30/06/1949 | MIDLOTHIAN | 03/1951 | 24/11/1965 | ||
A1 | 60152 | 08/07/1949 | HOLYROOD | 06/1951 | 21/06/1965 | ||
A1 | 60153 | 26/08/1949 | FLAMBOYANT | 08/1950 | 02/11/1962 | ||
A1 | 60154 | 23/09/1949 | BON ACCORD | 04/1951 | 04/10/1965 | ||
A1 | 60155 | 29/09/1949 | BORDERER | 03/1951 | 04/10/1965 | ||
A1 | 60156 | 19/10/1949 | GREAT CENTRAL | 07/1952 | 10/05/1965 | ||
A1 | 60157 | 03/11/1949 | GREAT EASTERN | 11/1951 | 10/01/1965 | ||
A1 | 60158 | 17/11/1949 | ABERDONIAN | 03/1951 | 26/12/1964 | ||
A1 | 60159 | 24/11/1949 | BONNIE DUNDEE | 07/1951 | 14/10/1963 | ||
A1 | 60160 | 02/12/1949 | AULD REEKIE | 03/1951 | 12/12/1963 | ||
A1 | 60161 | 19/12/1949 | NORTH BRITISH | 06/1951 | 14/10/1963 | ||
A1 | 60162 | 23/12/1949 | SAINT JOHNSTOUN | 08/1951 | 28/10/1963 | ||
A1 | 60163 | 2005 | TORNADO | 2005 |