LNER Gresley "A4" Class 4-6-2
Class | Number | Built | Name | Name Date | Notes | Removed | Date Withdrawn |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
A4 | 2509 | 07/09/1935 | SILVER LINK | 06/12/1937 | 29/12/1962 | ||
A4 | 2510 | 21/09/1935 | QUICKSILVER | 28/05/1938 | 25/04/1963 | ||
A4 | 2511 | 05/11/1935 | SILVER KING | 09/08/1938 | 19/03/1965 | ||
A4 | 2512 | 18/12/1935 | SILVER FOX | 06/11/1937 | 20/10/1963 | ||
A4 | 4482 | 22/12/1936 | GOLDEN EAGLE | 22/12/1936 | 30/10/1964 | ||
A4 | 4483 | 26/12/1936 | KINGFISHER | 26/12/1936 | 05/09/1966 | ||
A4 | 4484 | 23/01/1937 | FALCON | 23/01/1937 | 20/10/1963 | ||
A4 | 4485 | 20/02/1937 | KESTREL | 20/02/1937 | 19/09/1947 | 21/12/1965 | |
A4 | 26 | 20/02/1937 | MILES BEEVOR | 11/11/1947 | 21/12/1965 | ||
A4 | 4486 | 13/03/1937 | MERLIN | 13/03/1937 | 03/09/1965 | ||
A4 | 4487 | 20/03/1937 | SEA EAGLE | 20/03/1937 | 09/08/1947 | 29/12/1962 | |
A4 | 28 | 20/03/1937 | WALTER K WHIGHAM | 01/10/1947 | 29/12/1962 | ||
A4 | 4488 | 29/06/1937 | OSPREY | 17/04/1937 | 20/06/1937 | 01/06/1966 | |
A4 | 4488 | 29/06/1937 | UNION OF SOUTH AFRICA | 28/06/1937 | 01/06/1966 | ||
A4 | 4489 | 04/05/1937 | WOODCOCK | 04/05/1937 | 17/05/1937 | 29/05/1965 | |
A4 | 4489 | 04/05/1937 | DOMINION OF CANADA | 15/06/1937 | 29/05/1965 | ||
A4 | 4490 | 25/06/1937 | EMPIRE OF INDIA | 25/06/1937 | 11/05/1964 | ||
A4 | 4491 | 22/06/1937 | COMMONWEALTH OF AUSTRALIA | 22/06/1937 | 20/08/1964 | ||
A4 | 4492 | 27/06/1937 | DOMINION OF NEW ZEALAND | 27/06/1937 | 18/04/1963 | ||
A4 | 4493 | 26/07/1937 | WOODCOCK | 26/07/1937 | 20/10/1963 | ||
A4 | 4494 | 12/08/1937 | OSPREY | 12/08/1937 | 11/07/1942 | 29/12/1962 | |
A4 | 4494 | 12/08/1937 | ANDREW K McCOSH | 21/08/1942 | 29/12/1962 | ||
A4 | 4495 | 30/08/1937 | GREAT SNIPE | 30/08/1937 | 11/09/1937 | 29/12/1962 | |
A4 | 4495 | 30/08/1937 | GOLDEN FLEECE | 25/09/1937 | 29/12/1962 | ||
A4 | 4496 | 04/09/1937 | GOLDEN SHUTTLE | 04/09/1937 | 04/07/1945 | 20/07/1963 | |
A4 | 4496 | 04/09/1937 | DWIGHT D EISENHOWER | 25/09/1945 | 20/07/1963 | ||
A4 | 4497 | 02/10/1937 | GOLDEN PLOVER | 02/10/1937 | 29/10/1965 | ||
A4 | 4498 | 30/10/1937 | SIR NIGEL GRESLEY | 30/10/1937 | 01/02/1966 | ||
A4 | 4462 | 10/12/1937 | GREAT SNIPE | 10/12/1937 | 05/06/1941 | 17/07/1966 | |
A4 | 4462 | 10/12/1937 | WILLIAM WHITELAW | 23/07/1941 | 17/07/1966 | ||
A4 | 4463 | 27/11/1937 | SPARROWHAWK | 27/11/1937 | 19/06/1963 | ||
A4 | 4464 | 18/12/1937 | BITTERN | 18/12/1937 | 05/09/1966 | ||
A4 | 4465 | 08/01/1938 | GUILLEMOT | 08/01/1938 | 20/03/1964 | ||
A4 | 4466 | 26/01/1938 | HERRING GULL | 26/01/1938 | 01/12/1943 | 03/09/1965 | |
A4 | 4466 | 26/01/1938 | SIR RALPH WEDGWOOD | 06/01/1944 | 03/09/1965 | ||
A4 | 4467 | 19/02/1938 | WILD SWAN | 19/02/1938 | 20/10/1963 | ||
A4 | 4468 | 03/03/1938 | MALLARD | 03/03/1938 | 25/04/1963 | ||
A4 | 4469 | 30/03/1938 | GADWALL | 30/03/1938 | 21/06/1939 | 06/06/1942 | |
A4 | 4469 | 30/03/1938 | SIR RALPH WEDGWOOD | 01/03/1939 | 06/06/1942 | ||
A4 | 4499 | 12/04/1938 | POCHARD | 12/04/1938 | 20/02/1939 | 04/05/1964 | |
A4 | 4499 | 12/04/1938 | SIR MURROUGH WILSON | 08/04/1939 | 04/05/1964 | ||
A4 | 4500 | 26/04/1938 | GARGANEY | 26/04/1938 | 27/01/1939 | 12/10/1964 | |
A4 | 4500 | 26/04/1938 | SIR RONALD MATTHEWS | 11/03/1939 | 12/10/1964 | ||
A4 | 4900 | 17/05/1938 | GANNET | 17/05/1938 | 20/10/1963 | ||
A4 | 4901 | 08/06/1938 | CAPERCAILLIE | 08/06/1938 | 14/07/1942 | 12/03/1964 | |
A4 | 4901 | 08/06/1938 | CHARLES H NEWTON | 19/08/1942 | 04/06/1943 | 12/03/1964 | |
A4 | 4901 | 08/06/1938 | SIR CHARLES NEWTON | 04/06/1943 | 12/03/1964 | ||
A4 | 4902 | 28/06/1938 | SEAGULL | 28/06/1938 | 29/12/1962 | ||
A4 | 4903 | 01/07/1938 | PEREGRINE | 01/07/1938 | 21/03/1948 | 24/08/1966 | |
A4 | 60034 | 01/07/1938 | LORD FARINGDON | 24/03/1948 | 24/08/1966 |