GCR/LNER Robinson "A5" Class 4-6-2T
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
18/03/1911 | To Service | 165 | NEW | ANN | Annesley | ||
15/04/1911 | To Service | 166 | NEW | NEA | Neasden | ||
06/05/1911 | To Service | 167 | NEW | NEA | Neasden | ||
20/05/1911 | To Service | 168 | NEW | NEA | Neasden | ||
27/05/1911 | To Service | 169 | NEW | NEA | Neasden | ||
10/06/1911 | To Service | 170 | NEW | ANN | Annesley | ||
24/06/1911 | To Service | 23 | NEW | NEA | Neasden | ||
01/07/1911 | To Service | 24 | NEW | NEA | Neasden | ||
15/07/1911 | To Service | 447 | NEW | NEA | Neasden | ||
12/08/1911 | To Service | 448 | NEW | ANN | Annesley | ||
19/10/1912 | To Service | 449 | NEW | ANN | Annesley | ||
02/11/1912 | To Service | 450 | NEW | ANN | Annesley | ||
16/11/1912 | To Service | 451 | NEW | NEA | Neasden | ||
30/11/1912 | To Service | 452 | NEW | NEA | Neasden | ||
21/12/1912 | To Service | 128 | NEW | ANN | Annesley | ||
28/12/1912 | To Service | 129 | NEW | ANN | Annesley | ||
30/06/1917 | To Service | 371 | NEW | NEA | Neasden | ||
28/07/1917 | To Service | 372 | NEW | NEA | Neasden | ||
25/08/1917 | To Service | 373 | NEW | NEA | Neasden | ||
29/09/1917 | To Service | 374 | NEW | NEA | Neasden | ||
27/10/1917 | To Service | 411 | NEW | NEA | Neasden | ||
27/01/1923 | To Service | 3 | NEW | NEA | Neasden | ||
10/02/1923 | To Service | 6 | NEW | NEA | Neasden | ||
24/02/1923 | To Service | 7 | NEW | NEA | Neasden | ||
17/03/1923 | To Service | 30 | NEW | NEA | Neasden | ||
07/04/1923 | To Service | 45 | NEW | NEA | Neasden | ||
28/04/1923 | To Service | 46 | NEW | NEA | Neasden | ||
12/05/1923 | To Service | 88 | NEW | NEA | Neasden | ||
26/05/1923 | To Service | 154 | NEW | NEA | Neasden | ||
16/06/1923 | To Service | 156 | NEW | NEA | Neasden | ||
30/06/1923 | To Service | 158 | NEW | NEA | Neasden | ||
05/01/1924 | Reallocation | 165 | ANN | Annesley | ARD | Ardsley | |
05/01/1924 | Reallocation | 170 | ANN | Annesley | ARD | Ardsley | |
05/01/1924 | Reallocation | 448 | ANN | Annesley | ARD | Ardsley | |
05/01/1924 | Reallocation | 450 | ANN | Annesley | ARD | Ardsley | |
25/03/1924 | Reallocation | 170 | ARD | Ardsley | GOR | Gorton | |
25/03/1924 | Reallocation | 5129 | ANN | Annesley | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street | |
21/04/1924 | Reallocation | 165 | ARD | Ardsley | NEA | Neasden | |
21/04/1924 | Reallocation | 448 | ARD | Ardsley | NEA | Neasden | |
21/04/1924 | Reallocation | 450 | ARD | Ardsley | NEA | Neasden | |
21/04/1924 | Reallocation | 5129 | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street | NEA | Neasden | |
22/04/1924 | Reallocation | 5449 | ANN | Annesley | NEA | Neasden | |
07/07/1924 | Reallocation | 5170 | GOR | Gorton | NEA | Neasden | |
07/07/1924 | Reallocation | 5128 | ANN | Annesley | NEA | Neasden | |
20/09/1924 | Reallocation | 452 | NEA | Neasden | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
23/09/1924 | Reallocation | 452 | WFD | Woodford Halse | NEA | Neasden | |
20/11/1924 | Reallocation | 5167 | NEA | Neasden | ARD | Ardsley | |
20/11/1924 | Reallocation | 5168 | NEA | Neasden | ARD | Ardsley | |
20/11/1924 | Reallocation | 5128 | NEA | Neasden | ARD | Ardsley | |
20/11/1924 | Reallocation | 5129 | NEA | Neasden | ARD | Ardsley | |
05/01/1925 | Reallocation | 5371 | NEA | Neasden | ARD | Ardsley | |
08/01/1925 | Reallocation | 5374 | NEA | Neasden | ARD | Ardsley | |
25/09/1925 | To Service | 1712 | NEW | DAR | Darlington | ||
03/10/1925 | To Service | 1719 | NEW | DAR | Darlington | ||
10/10/1925 | Reallocation | 1719 | DAR | Darlington | NEV | Neville Hill | |
22/10/1925 | Reallocation | 1712 | DAR | Darlington | GHD | Gateshead | |
22/10/1925 | To Service | 1738 | NEW | DAR | Darlington | ||
31/10/1925 | To Service | 1750 | NEW | GHD | Gateshead | ||
14/11/1925 | To Service | 1756 | NEW | BLA | Blaydon | ||
25/11/1925 | To Service | 1760 | NEW | DAR | Darlington | ||
02/12/1925 | Reallocation | 1760 | DAR | Darlington | BLA | Blaydon | |
02/12/1925 | To Service | 1766 | NEW | DAR | Darlington | ||
07/12/1925 | Reallocation | 1738 | DAR | Darlington | HTN | Heaton | |
11/12/1925 | To Service | 1767 | NEW | YK | York (North) | ||
14/12/1925 | Reallocation | 1766 | DAR | Darlington | YK | York (North) | |
23/12/1925 | To Service | 1768 | NEW | HTN | Heaton | ||
08/01/1926 | To Service | 1771 | NEW | DAR | Darlington | ||
14/01/1926 | Reallocation | 1768 | HTN | Heaton | BLA | Blaydon | |
14/01/1926 | Reallocation | 1771 | DAR | Darlington | BLA | Blaydon | |
21/01/1926 | To Service | 1782 | NEW | BLA | Blaydon | ||
02/1926 | Reallocation | 1738 | HTN | Heaton | BLA | Blaydon | |
02/1926 | Reallocation | 1767 | YK | York (North) | NEV | Neville Hill | |
05/02/1926 | Reallocation | 5450 | NEA | Neasden | ARD | Ardsley | |
07/02/1926 | Reallocation | 1766 | YK | York (North) | NEV | Neville Hill | |
10/02/1926 | To Service | 1784 | NEW | GHD | Gateshead | ||
11/02/1926 | Reallocation | 5451 | NEA | Neasden | ARD | Ardsley | |
03/1926 | Reallocation | 1719 | NEV | Neville Hill | DAR | Darlington | |
03/1926 | Reallocation | 1766 | NEV | Neville Hill | DAR | Darlington | |
31/03/1926 | To Service | 1790 | NEW | BLA | Blaydon | ||
20/05/1926 | Reallocation | 1719 | DAR | Darlington | GHD | Gateshead | |
20/05/1926 | Reallocation | 1766 | DAR | Darlington | GHD | Gateshead | |
20/05/1926 | Reallocation | 1767 | NEV | Neville Hill | GHD | Gateshead | |
13/01/1927 | Reallocation | 5451 | ARD | Ardsley | NEA | Neasden | |
29/04/1927 | Reallocation | 5045 | NEA | Neasden | ARD | Ardsley | |
29/04/1927 | Reallocation | 5046 | NEA | Neasden | ARD | Ardsley | |
16/06/1927 | Reallocation | 5045 | ARD | Ardsley | NEA | Neasden | |
18/07/1927 | Reallocation | 5450 | ARD | Ardsley | NEA | Neasden | |
19/07/1927 | Reallocation | 5046 | ARD | Ardsley | NEA | Neasden | |
28/07/1927 | Reallocation | 5168 | ARD | Ardsley | NEA | Neasden | |
15/09/1927 | Reallocation | 5374 | ARD | Ardsley | NEA | Neasden | |
20/09/1927 | Reallocation | 5371 | ARD | Ardsley | NEA | Neasden | |
20/12/1927 | Reallocation | 5373 | NEA | Neasden | GOR | Gorton | |
21/12/1927 | Reallocation | 5452 | NEA | Neasden | GOR | Gorton | |
15/02/1928 | Reallocation | 5167 | ARD | Ardsley | KX | Kings Cross | |
22/02/1928 | Reallocation | 5448 | NEA | Neasden | KX | Kings Cross | |
07/05/1928 | Reallocation | 5129 | ARD | Ardsley | KX | Kings Cross | |
25/05/1928 | Reallocation | 1756 | BLA | Blaydon | SALT | Saltburn | |
25/05/1928 | Reallocation | 1760 | BLA | Blaydon | SALT | Saltburn | |
25/05/1928 | Reallocation | 1790 | BLA | Blaydon | SALT | Saltburn | |
28/05/1928 | Reallocation | 1738 | BLA | Blaydon | SALT | Saltburn | |
28/05/1928 | Reallocation | 1766 | GHD | Gateshead | SALT | Saltburn | |
28/05/1928 | Reallocation | 1767 | GHD | Gateshead | SALT | Saltburn | |
28/05/1928 | Reallocation | 1784 | GHD | Gateshead | SALT | Saltburn | |
27/06/1928 | Reallocation | 1768 | BLA | Blaydon | HTN | Heaton | |
27/06/1928 | Reallocation | 1771 | BLA | Blaydon | HTN | Heaton | |
27/06/1928 | Reallocation | 1782 | BLA | Blaydon | HTN | Heaton | |
30/06/1928 | Reallocation | 5452 | GOR | Gorton | KX | Kings Cross | |
30/06/1928 | Reallocation | 5373 | GOR | Gorton | NEA | Neasden | |
12/09/1928 | Reallocation | 5167 | KX | Kings Cross | NEA | Neasden | |
01/10/1928 | Reallocation | 5128 | ARD | Ardsley | NEA | Neasden | |
21/08/1929 | Reallocation | 1712 | GHD | Gateshead | HTN | Heaton | |
21/08/1929 | Reallocation | 1719 | GHD | Gateshead | HTN | Heaton | |
21/08/1929 | Reallocation | 1750 | GHD | Gateshead | HTN | Heaton | |
18/11/1929 | Reallocation | 5129 | KX | Kings Cross | NEA | Neasden | |
05/12/1929 | Reallocation | 5007 | NEA | Neasden | KX | Kings Cross | |
08/01/1930 | Reallocation | 5448 | KX | Kings Cross | NEA | Neasden | |
26/06/1930 | Reallocation | 1719 | HTN | Heaton | SALT | Saltburn | |
26/06/1930 | Reallocation | 1768 | HTN | Heaton | MID | Middlesbrough | |
26/06/1930 | Reallocation | 1771 | HTN | Heaton | MID | Middlesbrough | |
10/05/1934 | Reallocation | 1756 | SALT | Saltburn | MID | Middlesbrough | |
28/05/1935 | Reallocation | 1756 | MID | Middlesbrough | SALT | Saltburn | |
29/11/1935 | Reallocation | 5452 | KX | Kings Cross | HITL | Hitchin (GNR) | |
29/11/1935 | Reallocation | 5007 | KX | Kings Cross | HITL | Hitchin (GNR) | |
06/05/1937 | Reallocation | 5452 | HITL | Hitchin (GNR) | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street | |
07/05/1937 | Reallocation | 5007 | HITL | Hitchin (GNR) | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street | |
20/05/1937 | Reallocation | 5411 | NEA | Neasden | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street | |
10/07/1937 | Reallocation | 5373 | NEA | Neasden | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street | |
16/10/1937 | Reallocation | 5452 | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street | NEA | Neasden | |
28/10/1937 | Reallocation | 5373 | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street | NEA | Neasden | |
12/11/1937 | Reallocation | 5411 | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street | NEA | Neasden | |
27/11/1937 | Reallocation | 5007 | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street | NEA | Neasden | |
17/04/1938 | Reallocation | 5374 | LTPB | NEA | Neasden | ||
17/04/1938 | Reallocation | 5411 | LTPB | NEA | Neasden | ||
19/05/1938 | Reallocation | 5373 | NEA | Neasden | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street | |
19/05/1938 | Reallocation | 5007 | NEA | Neasden | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street | |
29/07/1938 | Reallocation | 5373 | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |
29/07/1938 | Reallocation | 5007 | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |
24/08/1938 | Reallocation | 1750 | HTN | Heaton | MID | Middlesbrough | |
24/08/1938 | Reallocation | 1782 | HTN | Heaton | MID | Middlesbrough | |
31/08/1938 | Reallocation | 1712 | HTN | Heaton | MID | Middlesbrough | |
02/10/1938 | Reallocation | 5452 | LTPB | NEA | Neasden | ||
02/10/1938 | Reallocation | 5003 | LTPB | NEA | Neasden | ||
03/10/1938 | Reallocation | 5449 | NEA | Neasden | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
04/10/1938 | Reallocation | 5165 | NEA | Neasden | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
24/11/1938 | Reallocation | 5373 | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | NEA | Neasden | |
03/12/1938 | Reallocation | 5449 | WFD | Woodford Halse | NEA | Neasden | |
26/02/1939 | Reallocation | 5007 | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | KX | Kings Cross | |
20/03/1939 | Reallocation | 1712 | MID | Middlesbrough | DAR | Darlington | |
20/03/1939 | Reallocation | 1750 | MID | Middlesbrough | DAR | Darlington | |
20/03/1939 | Reallocation | 1756 | SALT | Saltburn | DAR | Darlington | |
20/03/1939 | Reallocation | 1768 | MID | Middlesbrough | DAR | Darlington | |
20/03/1939 | Reallocation | 1771 | MID | Middlesbrough | DAR | Darlington | |
21/03/1939 | Reallocation | 1719 | SALT | Saltburn | DAR | Darlington | |
22/03/1939 | Reallocation | 1766 | SALT | Saltburn | DAR | Darlington | |
10/04/1939 | Reallocation | 1760 | SALT | Saltburn | DAR | Darlington | |
10/04/1939 | Reallocation | 1767 | SALT | Saltburn | DAR | Darlington | |
10/04/1939 | Reallocation | 1782 | MID | Middlesbrough | DAR | Darlington | |
10/04/1939 | Reallocation | 1790 | SALT | Saltburn | DAR | Darlington | |
17/04/1939 | Reallocation | 1738 | SALT | Saltburn | DAR | Darlington | |
17/04/1939 | Reallocation | 1784 | SALT | Saltburn | DAR | Darlington | |
20/05/1939 | Reallocation | 1766 | DAR | Darlington | DAR.1 | Middleton in Teesdale | |
25/06/1939 | Reallocation | 5449 | NEA | Neasden | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
31/07/1939 | Reallocation | 5449 | WFD | Woodford Halse | CLK | Colwick | |
17/08/1939 | Reallocation | 5165 | WFD | Woodford Halse | CLK | Colwick | |
11/09/1939 | Reallocation | 1766 | DAR.1 | Middleton in Teesdale | DAR | Darlington | |
20/09/1939 | Reallocation | 5373 | NEA | Neasden | KX | Kings Cross | |
06/12/1939 | Reallocation | 5169 | NEA | Neasden | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
06/12/1939 | Reallocation | 5450 | NEA | Neasden | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
30/12/1939 | Reallocation | 5169 | WFD | Woodford Halse | NEA | Neasden | |
30/12/1939 | Reallocation | 5450 | WFD | Woodford Halse | NEA | Neasden | |
25/05/1940 | Reallocation | 5373 | KX | Kings Cross | CLK | Colwick | |
25/05/1940 | Reallocation | 5007 | KX | Kings Cross | CLK | Colwick | |
27/06/1940 | Reallocation | 5007 | CLK | Colwick | NEA | Neasden | |
07/11/1940 | Reallocation | 5373 | CLK | Colwick | NEA | Neasden | |
08/11/1940 | Reallocation | 5165 | CLK | Colwick | NEA | Neasden | |
05/09/1941 | Reallocation | 5373 | NEA | Neasden | ARD | Ardsley | |
09/09/1941 | Reallocation | 5449 | CLK | Colwick | NEA | Neasden | |
16/10/1941 | Reallocation | 5448 | NEA | Neasden | ARD | Ardsley | |
16/10/1941 | Reallocation | 5006 | NEA | Neasden | ARD | Ardsley | |
27/10/1941 | Reallocation | 5165 | NEA | Neasden | ARD | Ardsley | |
27/10/1941 | Reallocation | 5411 | NEA | Neasden | ARD | Ardsley | |
13/12/1941 | Reallocation | 5006 | ARD | Ardsley | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street | |
15/03/1942 | Reallocation | 5006 | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street | ARD | Ardsley | |
21/12/1942 | Condemned | 5447 | NEA | Neasden | COND | ||
15/02/1943 | Reallocation | 5448 | ARD | Ardsley | NEA | Neasden | |
15/02/1943 | Reallocation | 5373 | ARD | Ardsley | NEA | Neasden | |
15/02/1943 | Reallocation | 5411 | ARD | Ardsley | NEA | Neasden | |
15/02/1943 | Reallocation | 5006 | ARD | Ardsley | NEA | Neasden | |
30/05/1943 | Reallocation | 5165 | ARD | Ardsley | NEA | Neasden | |
29/10/1943 | Reallocation | 1766 | DAR | Darlington | NEA | Neasden | |
07/11/1943 | Reallocation | 1760 | DAR | Darlington | NEA | Neasden | |
13/02/1945 | Reallocation | 1766 | NEA | Neasden | DAR | Darlington | |
27/03/1945 | Reallocation | 1760 | NEA | Neasden | DAR | Darlington | |
09/05/1948 | Reallocation | 9817 | NEA | Neasden | GRA | Grantham | |
14/05/1948 | Reallocation | 9812 | NEA | Neasden | GRA | Grantham | |
15/05/1948 | Reallocation | 9812 | GRA | Grantham | GRA | Grantham | |
15/05/1948 | Reallocation | 9817 | GRA | Grantham | GRA | Grantham | |
11/07/1948 | Reallocation | 9803 | NEA | Neasden | LIN | Lincoln | |
11/07/1948 | Reallocation | 9816 | NEA | Neasden | LIN | Lincoln | |
17/07/1948 | Reallocation | 9803 | LIN | Lincoln | LIN | Lincoln | |
17/07/1948 | Reallocation | 9816 | LIN | Lincoln | LIN | Lincoln | |
02/01/1949 | Reallocation | 69842 | DAR | Darlington | SALT | Saltburn | |
06/01/1949 | Reallocation | 69815 | NEA | Neasden | BOS | Boston | |
07/01/1949 | Reallocation | 69818 | NEA | Neasden | BOS | Boston | |
08/01/1949 | Reallocation | 69815 | BOS | Boston | BOS | Boston | |
08/01/1949 | Reallocation | 69818 | BOS | Boston | BOS | Boston | |
08/01/1949 | Reallocation | 69842 | SALT | Saltburn | SAL | Salisbury | |
16/01/1949 | Reallocation | 69815 | BOS | Boston | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
16/01/1949 | Reallocation | 69818 | BOS | Boston | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
22/01/1949 | Reallocation | 69815 | LNG | Langwith Junction | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
22/01/1949 | Reallocation | 69818 | LNG | Langwith Junction | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
23/01/1949 | Reallocation | 9812 | GRA | Grantham | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
23/01/1949 | Reallocation | 9817 | GRA | Grantham | BOS | Boston | |
29/01/1949 | Reallocation | 9812 | LNG | Langwith Junction | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
29/01/1949 | Reallocation | 9817 | BOS | Boston | BOS | Boston | |
30/01/1949 | Reallocation | 69809 | NEA | Neasden | BOS | Boston | |
30/01/1949 | Reallocation | 69810 | NEA | Neasden | BOS | Boston | |
30/01/1949 | Reallocation | 69824 | NEA | Neasden | BOS | Boston | |
05/02/1949 | Reallocation | 69809 | BOS | Boston | BOS | Boston | |
05/02/1949 | Reallocation | 69810 | BOS | Boston | BOS | Boston | |
05/02/1949 | Reallocation | 69824 | BOS | Boston | BOS | Boston | |
13/02/1949 | Reallocation | 69824 | BOS | Boston | LIN | Lincoln | |
13/02/1949 | Reallocation | 69834 | DAR | Darlington | SALT | Saltburn | |
13/02/1949 | Reallocation | 69836 | DAR | Darlington | SALT | Saltburn | |
19/02/1949 | Reallocation | 69824 | LIN | Lincoln | LIN | Lincoln | |
19/02/1949 | Reallocation | 69834 | SALT | Saltburn | SAL | Salisbury | |
19/02/1949 | Reallocation | 69836 | SALT | Saltburn | SAL | Salisbury | |
29/05/1949 | Reallocation | 9816 | LIN | Lincoln | GRA | Grantham | |
04/06/1949 | Reallocation | 9816 | GRA | Grantham | GRA | Grantham | |
10/07/1949 | Reallocation | 69803 | LIN | Lincoln | GRA | Grantham | |
16/07/1949 | Reallocation | 69803 | GRA | Grantham | GRA | Grantham | |
17/07/1949 | Reallocation | 69831 | DAR | Darlington | SALT | Saltburn | |
23/07/1949 | Reallocation | 69831 | SALT | Saltburn | SAL | Salisbury | |
11/09/1949 | Reallocation | 69824 | LIN | Lincoln | GRA | Grantham | |
17/09/1949 | Reallocation | 69824 | GRA | Grantham | GRA | Grantham | |
11/12/1949 | Reallocation | 69809 | BOS | Boston | CLK | Colwick | |
11/12/1949 | Reallocation | 69810 | BOS | Boston | CLK | Colwick | |
11/12/1949 | Reallocation | 9817 | BOS | Boston | CLK | Colwick | |
17/12/1949 | Reallocation | 69809 | CLK | Colwick | CLK | Colwick | |
17/12/1949 | Reallocation | 69810 | CLK | Colwick | CLK | Colwick | |
17/12/1949 | Reallocation | 9817 | CLK | Colwick | CLK | Colwick | |
30/12/1949 | Reallocation | 69801 | NEA | Neasden | CLK | Colwick | |
30/12/1949 | Reallocation | 69814 | NEA | Neasden | CLK | Colwick | |
31/12/1949 | Reallocation | 69801 | CLK | Colwick | CLK | Colwick | |
31/12/1949 | Reallocation | 69814 | CLK | Colwick | CLK | Colwick | |
05/01/1950 | Reallocation | 69825 | NEA | Neasden | CLK | Colwick | |
13/01/1950 | Reallocation | 69823 | NEA | Neasden | CLK | Colwick | |
29/01/1950 | Reallocation | 69805 | NEA | Neasden | CLK | Colwick | |
29/01/1950 | Reallocation | 69807 | NEA | Neasden | CLK | Colwick | |
29/01/1950 | Reallocation | 69836 | SAL | Salisbury | DAR | Darlington | |
04/02/1950 | Reallocation | 69805 | CLK | Colwick | CLK | Colwick | |
04/02/1950 | Reallocation | 69807 | CLK | Colwick | CLK | Colwick | |
04/02/1950 | Reallocation | 69836 | DAR | Darlington | DAR | Darlington | |
12/02/1950 | Reallocation | 69806 | NEA | Neasden | 38A | Colwick | |
18/02/1950 | Reallocation | 69806 | 38A | Colwick | 38A | Colwick | |
05/03/1950 | Reallocation | 69822 | NEA | Neasden | 38A | Colwick | |
19/03/1950 | Reallocation | 69826 | NEA | Neasden | 38A | Colwick | |
26/03/1950 | Reallocation | 69800 | NEA | Neasden | 40B | Immingham | |
26/03/1950 | Reallocation | 69808 | NEA | Neasden | 40B | Immingham | |
26/03/1950 | Reallocation | 69819 | NEA | Neasden | 40B | Immingham | |
26/03/1950 | Reallocation | 69821 | NEA | Neasden | 38A | Colwick | |
23/04/1950 | Reallocation | 69804 | NEA | Neasden | 40A | Lincoln | |
23/04/1950 | Reallocation | 69813 | NEA | Neasden | 40A | Lincoln | |
23/04/1950 | Reallocation | 69820 | NEA | Neasden | 40A | Lincoln | |
04/06/1950 | Reallocation | 69802 | NEA | Neasden | 51K | Saltburn | |
04/06/1950 | Reallocation | 69811 | NEA | Neasden | 51K | Saltburn | |
30/06/1950 | Reallocation | 69802 | 51K | Saltburn | 51K | Saltburn | |
30/06/1950 | Reallocation | 69811 | 51K | Saltburn | 51K | Saltburn | |
30/07/1950 | Reallocation | 69805 | CLK | Colwick | 34E | Neasden | |
30/07/1950 | Reallocation | 69822 | 38A | Colwick | 34E | Neasden | |
06/08/1950 | Reallocation | 69808 | 40B | Immingham | 40F | Boston | |
06/08/1950 | Reallocation | 69811 | 51K | Saltburn | 40F | Boston | |
06/08/1950 | Reallocation | 69819 | 40B | Immingham | 40F | Boston | |
15/10/1950 | Reallocation | 9816 | GRA | Grantham | 40A | Lincoln | |
15/10/1950 | Reallocation | 69824 | GRA | Grantham | 40F | Boston | |
16/10/1950 | Reallocation | 9816 | 40A | Lincoln | 40A | Lincoln | |
16/10/1950 | Reallocation | 69824 | 40F | Boston | 40F | Boston | |
29/10/1950 | Reallocation | 69803 | GRA | Grantham | 40F | Boston | |
29/10/1950 | Reallocation | 9816 | 40A | Lincoln | 40F | Boston | |
28/01/1951 | Reallocation | 69818 | LNG | Langwith Junction | 51A | Darlington | |
28/01/1951 | Reallocation | 69835 | DAR | Darlington | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
31/01/1951 | Reallocation | 69818 | 51A | Darlington | 51A | Darlington | |
31/01/1951 | Reallocation | 69835 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
04/02/1951 | Reallocation | 69810 | CLK | Colwick | 51A | Darlington | |
04/02/1951 | Reallocation | 69821 | 38A | Colwick | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
04/02/1951 | Reallocation | 69826 | 38A | Colwick | 51A | Darlington | |
11/02/1951 | Reallocation | 69836 | DAR | Darlington | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
11/02/1951 | Reallocation | 69840 | DAR | Darlington | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
18/02/1951 | Reallocation | 69801 | CLK | Colwick | 51A | Darlington | |
18/02/1951 | Reallocation | 69837 | DAR | Darlington | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
25/02/1951 | Reallocation | 69842 | SAL | Salisbury | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
03/03/1951 | Reallocation | 69842 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 34E | Neasden | |
11/03/1951 | Reallocation | 69842 | 34E | Neasden | 34E | Neasden | |
31/03/1951 | Reallocation | 69842 | 34E | Neasden | 34E | Neasden | |
08/04/1951 | Reallocation | 69830 | DAR | Darlington | 30A | Stratford | |
08/04/1951 | Reallocation | 69832 | DAR | Darlington | 30A | Stratford | |
08/04/1951 | Reallocation | 69833 | DAR | Darlington | 30A | Stratford | |
08/04/1951 | Reallocation | 69835 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 30A | Stratford | |
08/04/1951 | Reallocation | 69837 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 30A | Stratford | |
08/04/1951 | Reallocation | 69839 | DAR | Darlington | 30A | Stratford | |
08/04/1951 | Reallocation | 69840 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 30A | Stratford | |
08/04/1951 | Reallocation | 69842 | 34E | Neasden | 30A | Stratford | |
14/04/1951 | Reallocation | 69830 | 30A | Stratford | 30A | Stratford | |
14/04/1951 | Reallocation | 69832 | 30A | Stratford | 30A | Stratford | |
14/04/1951 | Reallocation | 69833 | 30A | Stratford | 30A | Stratford | |
14/04/1951 | Reallocation | 69835 | 30A | Stratford | 30A | Stratford | |
14/04/1951 | Reallocation | 69837 | 30A | Stratford | 30A | Stratford | |
14/04/1951 | Reallocation | 69839 | 30A | Stratford | 30A | Stratford | |
14/04/1951 | Reallocation | 69840 | 30A | Stratford | 30A | Stratford | |
14/04/1951 | Reallocation | 69842 | 30A | Stratford | 30A | Stratford | |
15/04/1951 | Reallocation | 69838 | DAR | Darlington | 30A | Stratford | |
15/04/1951 | Reallocation | 69841 | DAR | Darlington | 30A | Stratford | |
21/04/1951 | Reallocation | 69838 | 30A | Stratford | 30A | Stratford | |
21/04/1951 | Reallocation | 69841 | 30A | Stratford | 30A | Stratford | |
29/04/1951 | Reallocation | 69814 | CLK | Colwick | 34E | Neasden | |
05/05/1951 | Reallocation | 69814 | 34E | Neasden | 34E | Neasden | |
13/05/1951 | Reallocation | 69833 | 30A | Stratford | 51A | Darlington | |
13/05/1951 | Reallocation | 69835 | 30A | Stratford | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
13/05/1951 | Reallocation | 69839 | 30A | Stratford | 51A | Darlington | |
13/05/1951 | Reallocation | 69840 | 30A | Stratford | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
13/05/1951 | Reallocation | 69842 | 30A | Stratford | 34E | Neasden | |
19/05/1951 | Reallocation | 69833 | 51A | Darlington | 51A | Darlington | |
19/05/1951 | Reallocation | 69835 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
19/05/1951 | Reallocation | 69839 | 51A | Darlington | 51A | Darlington | |
19/05/1951 | Reallocation | 69840 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
19/05/1951 | Reallocation | 69842 | 34E | Neasden | 34E | Neasden | |
20/05/1951 | Reallocation | 69830 | 30A | Stratford | 51A | Darlington | |
20/05/1951 | Reallocation | 69832 | 30A | Stratford | 51A | Darlington | |
20/05/1951 | Reallocation | 69837 | 30A | Stratford | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
20/05/1951 | Reallocation | 69838 | 30A | Stratford | 51A | Darlington | |
26/05/1951 | Reallocation | 69830 | 51A | Darlington | 51A | Darlington | |
26/05/1951 | Reallocation | 69832 | 51A | Darlington | 51A | Darlington | |
26/05/1951 | Reallocation | 69837 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
26/05/1951 | Reallocation | 69838 | 51A | Darlington | 51A | Darlington | |
27/05/1951 | Reallocation | 69824 | 40F | Boston | 40A | Lincoln | |
02/06/1951 | Reallocation | 69824 | 40A | Lincoln | 40A | Lincoln | |
17/06/1951 | Reallocation | 69840 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 51A | Darlington | |
23/06/1951 | Reallocation | 69840 | 51A | Darlington | 51A | Darlington | |
01/07/1951 | Reallocation | 69801 | 51A | Darlington | 38A | Colwick | |
01/07/1951 | Reallocation | 69818 | 51A | Darlington | 38A | Colwick | |
01/07/1951 | Reallocation | 69837 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 51A | Darlington | |
01/07/1951 | Reallocation | 69842 | 34E | Neasden | 51A | Darlington | |
07/07/1951 | Reallocation | 69801 | 38A | Colwick | 38A | Colwick | |
07/07/1951 | Reallocation | 69818 | 38A | Colwick | 38A | Colwick | |
07/07/1951 | Reallocation | 69837 | 51A | Darlington | 51A | Darlington | |
07/07/1951 | Reallocation | 69842 | 51A | Darlington | 51A | Darlington | |
08/07/1951 | Reallocation | 69810 | 51A | Darlington | 38A | Colwick | |
08/07/1951 | Reallocation | 69841 | 30A | Stratford | 51A | Darlington | |
14/07/1951 | Reallocation | 69810 | 38A | Colwick | 38A | Colwick | |
14/07/1951 | Reallocation | 69841 | 51A | Darlington | 51A | Darlington | |
28/07/1951 | Reallocation | 69810 | 38A | Colwick | 38A | Colwick | |
28/07/1951 | Reallocation | 69841 | 51A | Darlington | 51A | Darlington | |
05/08/1951 | Reallocation | 69835 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 51A | Darlington | |
12/08/1951 | Reallocation | 69836 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 51A | Darlington | |
19/08/1951 | Reallocation | 69802 | 51K | Saltburn | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | |
19/08/1951 | Reallocation | 69811 | 40F | Boston | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | |
25/08/1951 | Reallocation | 69802 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | |
25/08/1951 | Reallocation | 69811 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | |
26/08/1951 | Reallocation | 69826 | 51A | Darlington | 38A | Colwick | |
01/09/1951 | Reallocation | 69826 | 38A | Colwick | 38A | Colwick | |
10/02/1952 | Reallocation | 69820 | 40A | Lincoln | 40B | Immingham | |
10/02/1952 | Reallocation | 69821 | 40E | Langwith Junction | 40F | Boston | |
23/02/1952 | Reallocation | 69820 | 40B | Immingham | 40B | Immingham | |
23/02/1952 | Reallocation | 69821 | 40F | Boston | 40F | Boston | |
20/04/1952 | Reallocation | 69821 | 40F | Boston | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
11/05/1952 | Reallocation | 69824 | 40A | Lincoln | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
17/05/1952 | Reallocation | 69821 | 40E | Langwith Junction | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
17/05/1952 | Reallocation | 69824 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
25/05/1952 | Reallocation | 69826 | 38A | Colwick | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
14/06/1952 | Reallocation | 69826 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
15/06/1952 | Reallocation | 69828 | NEA | Neasden | 40A | Lincoln | |
06/07/1952 | Reallocation | 69836 | 51A | Darlington | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | |
06/07/1952 | Reallocation | 69837 | 51A | Darlington | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | |
12/07/1952 | Reallocation | 69828 | 40A | Lincoln | 40A | Lincoln | |
12/07/1952 | Reallocation | 69836 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | |
12/07/1952 | Reallocation | 69837 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | |
07/12/1952 | Reallocation | 69822 | 34E | Neasden | 38A | Colwick | |
27/12/1952 | Reallocation | 69822 | 38A | Colwick | 38A | Colwick | |
20/09/1953 | Reallocation | 69828 | 40A | Lincoln | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
04/10/1953 | Reallocation | 69828 | 40E | Langwith Junction | 40A | Lincoln | |
16/05/1954 | Reallocation | 69814 | 34E | Neasden | 35B | Grantham | |
16/05/1954 | Reallocation | 69827 | NEA | Neasden | 35B | Grantham | |
13/06/1954 | Reallocation | 69805 | 34E | Neasden | 39A | Gorton | |
13/06/1954 | Reallocation | 69806 | 38A | Colwick | 39A | Gorton | |
13/06/1954 | Reallocation | 69817 | CLK | Colwick | 39A | Gorton | |
13/06/1954 | Reallocation | 69823 | CLX | 39A | Gorton | ||
13/06/1954 | Reallocation | 69829 | NEA | Neasden | 39A | Gorton | |
13/06/1954 | Reallocation | 69830 | 51A | Darlington | 51E | Stockton | |
13/06/1954 | Reallocation | 69831 | SAL | Salisbury | 51A | Darlington | |
13/06/1954 | Reallocation | 69834 | SAL | Salisbury | 51E | Stockton | |
13/06/1954 | Reallocation | 69835 | 51A | Darlington | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | |
13/06/1954 | Reallocation | 69839 | 51A | Darlington | 51E | Stockton | |
13/06/1954 | Reallocation | 69841 | 51A | Darlington | 51E | Stockton | |
19/06/1954 | Reallocation | 69842 | 51A | Darlington | 51E | Stockton | |
19/09/1954 | Reallocation | 69830 | 51E | Stockton | 51A | Darlington | |
19/09/1954 | Reallocation | 69834 | 51E | Stockton | 51A | Darlington | |
19/09/1954 | Reallocation | 69839 | 51E | Stockton | 51A | Darlington | |
19/09/1954 | Reallocation | 69841 | 51E | Stockton | 51A | Darlington | |
26/09/1954 | Reallocation | 69813 | 40A | Lincoln | 40B | Immingham | |
24/10/1954 | Reallocation | 69812 | LNG | Langwith Junction | 40A | Lincoln | |
24/10/1954 | Reallocation | 69821 | 40E | Langwith Junction | 40A | Lincoln | |
07/11/1954 | Reallocation | 69815 | LNG | Langwith Junction | 40B | Immingham | |
02/01/1955 | Reallocation | 69813 | 40B | Immingham | 40A | Lincoln | |
09/01/1955 | Reallocation | 69802 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | 53D | Bridlington | |
13/02/1955 | Reallocation | 69812 | 40A | Lincoln | 40B | Immingham | |
13/02/1955 | Reallocation | 69821 | 40A | Lincoln | 40B | Immingham | |
13/02/1955 | Reallocation | 69831 | 51A | Darlington | 51E | Stockton | |
13/02/1955 | Reallocation | 69834 | 51A | Darlington | 51E | Stockton | |
20/02/1955 | Reallocation | 69804 | 40A | Lincoln | 40B | Immingham | |
24/04/1955 | Reallocation | 69804 | 40B | Immingham | 40F | Boston | |
15/05/1955 | Reallocation | 69804 | 40F | Boston | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
15/05/1955 | Reallocation | 69828 | 40A | Lincoln | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
29/05/1955 | Reallocation | 69802 | 53D | Bridlington | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | |
19/06/1955 | Reallocation | 69838 | 51A | Darlington | 51E | Stockton | |
10/07/1955 | Reallocation | 69821 | 40B | Immingham | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
28/08/1955 | Reallocation | 69803 | 40F | Boston | 40B | Immingham | |
11/09/1955 | Reallocation | 69815 | 40B | Immingham | 39A | Gorton | |
11/09/1955 | Reallocation | 69829 | 39A | Gorton | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
25/09/1955 | Reallocation | 69831 | 51E | Stockton | 51A | Darlington | |
25/09/1955 | Reallocation | 69834 | 51E | Stockton | 51A | Darlington | |
23/10/1955 | Reallocation | 69800 | 40B | Immingham | 38A | Colwick | |
23/10/1955 | Reallocation | 69804 | 40E | Langwith Junction | 38A | Colwick | |
23/10/1955 | Reallocation | 69821 | 40E | Langwith Junction | 38A | Colwick | |
30/10/1955 | Reallocation | 69824 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 32C | Lowestoft | |
11/12/1955 | Reallocation | 69828 | 40E | Langwith Junction | 40D | Tuxford | |
08/01/1956 | Reallocation | 69829 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 32C | Lowestoft | |
29/01/1956 | Reallocation | 69826 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 32C | Lowestoft | |
19/02/1956 | Reallocation | 69808 | 40F | Boston | 40B | Immingham | |
19/02/1956 | Reallocation | 69813 | 40A | Lincoln | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
26/02/1956 | Reallocation | 69808 | 40B | Immingham | 40F | Boston | |
26/02/1956 | Reallocation | 69813 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | 40B | Immingham | |
11/03/1956 | Reallocation | 69812 | 40B | Immingham | 40F | Boston | |
11/03/1956 | Reallocation | 69816 | 40F | Boston | 40B | Immingham | |
24/06/1956 | Reallocation | 69803 | 40B | Immingham | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
09/07/1956 | Reallocation | 69828 | 40D | Tuxford | 38A | Colwick | |
29/07/1956 | Reallocation | 69812 | 40F | Boston | 38A | Colwick | |
07/10/1956 | Reallocation | 69801 | 38A | Colwick | 39A | Gorton | |
07/10/1956 | Reallocation | 69809 | CLK | Colwick | 38B | Annesley | |
07/10/1956 | Reallocation | 69828 | 38A | Colwick | 39A | Gorton | |
14/10/1956 | Reallocation | 69825 | CLK | Colwick | 38B | Annesley | |
21/10/1956 | Reallocation | 69818 | 38A | Colwick | 38B | Annesley | |
28/10/1956 | Reallocation | 69803 | 40E | Langwith Junction | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | |
02/12/1956 | Reallocation | 69813 | 40B | Immingham | 40A | Lincoln | |
02/12/1956 | Reallocation | 69820 | 40B | Immingham | 40A | Lincoln | |
09/12/1956 | Reallocation | 69816 | 40B | Immingham | 40A | Lincoln | |
16/12/1956 | Reallocation | 69813 | 40A | Lincoln | 39A | Gorton | |
16/12/1956 | Reallocation | 69819 | 40F | Boston | 40A | Lincoln | |
17/02/1957 | Reallocation | 69821 | 38A | Colwick | 40B | Immingham | |
17/02/1957 | Reallocation | 69822 | 38A | Colwick | 39A | Gorton | |
17/02/1957 | Reallocation | 69824 | 32C | Lowestoft | 40B | Immingham | |
17/02/1957 | Reallocation | 69826 | 32C | Lowestoft | 40B | Immingham | |
17/02/1957 | Reallocation | 69829 | 32C | Lowestoft | 40B | Immingham | |
19/05/1957 | Reallocation | 69805 | 39A | Gorton | 38A | Colwick | |
19/05/1957 | Reallocation | 69828 | 39A | Gorton | 38A | Colwick | |
27/05/1957 | Condemned | 69833 | 51A | Darlington | COND | ||
15/06/1957 | Reallocation | 69800 | 38A | Colwick | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | |
16/06/1957 | Reallocation | 69821 | 40B | Immingham | 40A | Lincoln | |
16/06/1957 | Reallocation | 69835 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | 51E | Stockton | |
16/06/1957 | Reallocation | 69836 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | 51A | Darlington | |
15/07/1957 | Condemned | 69815 | 39A | Gorton | COND | ||
15/09/1957 | Reallocation | 69830 | 51A | Darlington | 51C | West Hartlepool | |
15/09/1957 | Reallocation | 69831 | 51A | Darlington | 51C | West Hartlepool | |
15/09/1957 | Reallocation | 69832 | 51A | Darlington | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | |
15/09/1957 | Reallocation | 69834 | 51A | Darlington | 51C | West Hartlepool | |
15/09/1957 | Reallocation | 69836 | 51A | Darlington | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | |
15/09/1957 | Reallocation | 69842 | 51E | Stockton | 51C | West Hartlepool | |
10/11/1957 | Reallocation | 69830 | 51C | West Hartlepool | 51K | Saltburn | |
10/11/1957 | Reallocation | 69831 | 51C | West Hartlepool | 51K | Saltburn | |
10/11/1957 | Reallocation | 69834 | 51C | West Hartlepool | 51K | Saltburn | |
10/11/1957 | Reallocation | 69842 | 51C | West Hartlepool | 51K | Saltburn | |
26/01/1958 | Reallocation | 69800 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | |
02/02/1958 | Reallocation | 69830 | 51K | Saltburn | 51D | Middlesbrough | |
02/02/1958 | Reallocation | 69831 | 51K | Saltburn | 51D | Middlesbrough | |
02/02/1958 | Reallocation | 69834 | 51K | Saltburn | 51D | Middlesbrough | |
02/02/1958 | Reallocation | 69842 | 51K | Saltburn | 51D | Middlesbrough | |
03/03/1958 | Condemned | 69819 | 40A | Lincoln | COND | ||
07/04/1958 | Condemned | 69804 | 38A | Colwick | COND | ||
13/04/1958 | Reallocation | 69803 | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | |
13/04/1958 | Reallocation | 69824 | 40B | Immingham | 34F | Grantham | |
01/06/1958 | Reallocation | 69830 | 51D | Middlesbrough | 51L | Thornaby | |
01/06/1958 | Reallocation | 69831 | 51D | Middlesbrough | 51L | Thornaby | |
01/06/1958 | Reallocation | 69834 | 51D | Middlesbrough | 51L | Thornaby | |
01/06/1958 | Reallocation | 69842 | 51D | Middlesbrough | 51L | Thornaby | |
02/06/1958 | Condemned | 69826 | 40B | Immingham | COND | ||
08/06/1958 | Reallocation | 69800 | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | 16D | Annesley | |
08/06/1958 | Reallocation | 69803 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | 40A | Lincoln | |
08/06/1958 | Reallocation | 69824 | 34F | Grantham | 40A | Lincoln | |
15/06/1958 | Reallocation | 69800 | 16D | Annesley | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | |
14/07/1958 | Condemned | 69807 | CLK | Colwick | COND | ||
25/08/1958 | Condemned | 69836 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | COND | ||
19/09/1958 | Condemned | 69839 | 51A | Darlington | COND | ||
22/09/1958 | Condemned | 69840 | 51A | Darlington | COND | ||
23/09/1958 | Condemned | 69841 | 51A | Darlington | COND | ||
06/10/1958 | Condemned | 69811 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | COND | ||
06/10/1958 | Condemned | 69832 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | COND | ||
23/10/1958 | Condemned | 69810 | 38A | Colwick | COND | ||
29/10/1958 | Condemned | 69842 | 51L | Thornaby | COND | ||
03/11/1958 | Condemned | 69822 | 39A | Gorton | COND | ||
05/11/1958 | Condemned | 69838 | 51E | Stockton | COND | ||
11/11/1958 | Condemned | 69834 | 51L | Thornaby | COND | ||
18/11/1958 | Condemned | 69830 | 51L | Thornaby | COND | ||
26/11/1958 | Condemned | 69828 | 38A | Colwick | COND | ||
26/11/1958 | Condemned | 69835 | 51E | Stockton | COND | ||
27/11/1958 | Condemned | 69831 | 51L | Thornaby | COND | ||
03/12/1958 | Condemned | 69837 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | COND | ||
14/12/1958 | Reallocation | 69809 | 38B | Annesley | 40E | Colwick | |
14/12/1958 | Reallocation | 69825 | 38B | Annesley | 40E | Colwick | |
16/12/1958 | Condemned | 69818 | 38B | Annesley | COND | ||
16/12/1958 | Condemned | 69824 | 40A | Lincoln | COND | ||
24/12/1958 | Condemned | 69802 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | COND | ||
11/01/1959 | Reallocation | 69800 | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | 40E | Colwick | |
19/01/1959 | Condemned | 69816 | 40A | Lincoln | COND | ||
01/03/1959 | Reallocation | 69808 | 40F | Boston | 40A | Lincoln | |
04/05/1959 | Condemned | 69809 | 40E | Colwick | COND | ||
23/06/1959 | Condemned | 69803 | 40A | Lincoln | COND | ||
07/07/1959 | Condemned | 69812 | 38A | Colwick | COND | ||
24/08/1959 | Condemned | 69800 | 40E | Colwick | COND | ||
23/09/1959 | Condemned | 69805 | 38A | Colwick | COND | ||
02/11/1959 | Condemned | 69827 | 35B | Grantham | COND | ||
30/11/1959 | Condemned | 69825 | 40E | Colwick | COND | ||
27/12/1959 | Reallocation | 69814 | 35B | Grantham | 34A | Kings Cross | |
01/03/1960 | Condemned | 69801 | 39A | Gorton | COND | ||
01/03/1960 | Condemned | 69813 | 39A | Gorton | COND | ||
03/03/1960 | Condemned | 69806 | 39A | Gorton | COND | ||
04/04/1960 | Condemned | 69817 | 39A | Gorton | COND | ||
05/04/1960 | Condemned | 69823 | 39A | Gorton | COND | ||
19/05/1960 | Condemned | 69821 | 40A | Lincoln | COND | ||
30/05/1960 | Condemned | 69829 | 40B | Immingham | COND | ||
12/06/1960 | Reallocation | 69814 | 34A | Kings Cross | 40A | Lincoln | |
19/06/1960 | Reallocation | 69814 | 40A | Lincoln | 40E | Colwick | |
10/07/1960 | Reallocation | 69820 | 40A | Lincoln | 40B | Immingham | |
14/11/1960 | Condemned | 69814 | 40E | Colwick | COND | ||
14/11/1960 | Condemned | 69820 | 40B | Immingham | COND | ||
17/11/1960 | Condemned | 69808 | 40A | Lincoln | COND |