NER/LNER Worsdell "A6" Class 4-6-2T
Class | NER | LNER (1946) | BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
A6 | 686 | 9790 | 12/1907 | NEV WBY HLD WBY MAL NEV SBK W |
Neville Hill Whitby Hull Dairycoates Whitby Malton Neville Hill Starbeck Withdrawn |
12/1907 23/06/1923 01/11/1937 06/1938 10/02/1940 11/07/1942 12/03/1945 07/06/1947 |
07/06/1947 | |
A6 | 687 | 9791 | 69791 | 12/1907 | SALT MID AUK DAR NLN SBK 53B W |
Saltburn Middlesbrough West Auckland Darlington Northallerton Starbeck Hull Botanic Gardens Withdrawn |
12/1907 12/10/1933 04/12/1939 28/02/1942 21/08/1943 05/03/1945 11/02/1951 16/08/1951 |
16/08/1951 |
A6 | 688 | 9792 | 69792 | 12/1907 | WBY NEV WBY HLD WBY MAL SCA SBK WBY SBK SBK W |
Whitby Neville Hill Whitby Hull Dairycoates Whitby Malton Scarborough Starbeck Whitby Starbeck Starbeck Withdrawn |
12/1907 14/11/1923 13/02/1924 02/11/1937 07/06/1938 10/02/1940 04/06/1941 12/03/1945 05/10/1947 30/05/1948 05/06/1948 20/12/1948 |
20/12/1948 |
A6 | 689 | 9793 | 69793 | 01/1908 | WBY NEV WBY SCA SBK 53B W |
Whitby Neville Hill Whitby Scarborough Starbeck Hull Botanic Gardens Withdrawn |
01/1908 02/02/1928 06/1928 22/08/1934 12/03/1945 11/02/1951 09/04/1951 |
09/04/1951 |
A6 | 690 | 9794 | 69794 | 02/1908 | SALT MID HLD MID AUK SKN DAR NLN DAR NEV SBK NEV SBK W |
Saltburn Middlesbrough Hull Dairycoates Middlesbrough West Auckland Stockton Darlington Northallerton Darlington Neville Hill Starbeck Neville Hill Starbeck Withdrawn |
02/1908 12/10/1933 28/10/1937 06/1938 01/01/1940 02/12/1941 18/05/1942 25/01/1943 21/08/1943 08/01/1944 12/03/1945 13/04/1947 05/10/1947 15/08/1951 |
15/08/1951 |
A6 | 691 | 9795 | 69795 | 03/1908 | WBY NEV WBY MAL SCA SBK HLB W |
Whitby Neville Hill Whitby Malton Scarborough Starbeck Hull Botanic Gardens Withdrawn |
03/1908 05/02/1928 23/06/1928 10/02/1940 06/10/1941 12/03/1945 13/04/1947 17/07/1950 |
17/07/1950 |
A6 | 692 | 9796 | 69796 | 03/1908 | WBY MAL WBY HTN WBY MAL NEV MAL SBK HLB W |
Whitby Malton Whitby Heaton Whitby Malton Neville Hill Malton Starbeck Hull Botanic Gardens Withdrawn |
03/1908 01/1924 09/06/1924 24/03/1937 02/05/1937 21/05/1940 05/03/1942 31/07/1943 12/03/1945 13/04/1947 30/03/1953 |
30/03/1953 |
A6 | 693 | 9797 | 69797 | 03/1908 | SCA WBY MID HTN MID AUK DAR AUK SBK W |
Scarborough Whitby Middlesbrough Heaton Middlesbrough West Auckland Darlington West Auckland Starbeck Withdrawn |
03/1908 27/06/1934 22/08/1934 24/03/1937 02/05/1937 01/01/1940 28/02/1942 24/10/1944 05/03/1945 24/08/1951 |
24/08/1951 |
A6 | 694 | 9798 | 69798 | 04/1908 | SBK SCA HLB SCA MAL NEV AUK DAR HLB W |
Starbeck Scarborough Hull Botanic Gardens Scarborough Malton Neville Hill West Auckland Darlington Hull Botanic Gardens Withdrawn |
04/1908 12/1923 17/05/1935 30/05/1935 05/08/1940 31/07/1943 08/01/1944 08/10/1945 05/07/1947 06/02/1951 |
06/02/1951 |
A6 | 695 | 9799 | 69799 | 04/1908 | MAL WBY SBK WBY WBY SBK SBK W |
Malton Whitby Starbeck Whitby Whitby Starbeck Starbeck Withdrawn |
04/1908 01/12/1923 12/03/1945 15/08/1948 21/08/1948 31/10/1948 06/11/1948 06/02/1950 |
06/02/1950 |