NER/LNER Worsdell "A6" Class 4-6-2T
NER | LNER (1946) | BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
686 | 9790 | 12/1907 | Neville Hill | 07/06/1947 | Starbeck | 39.5 | 39.53 | ||||
687 | 9791 | 69791 | 12/1907 | Saltburn | 16/08/1951 | Hull Botanic Gardens | 43.67 | 43.70 | |||
688 | 9792 | 69792 | 12/1907 | Whitby | 20/12/1948 | Starbeck | 41 | 41.36 | |||
689 | 9793 | 69793 | 01/1908 | Whitby | 09/04/1951 | Hull Botanic Gardens | 43.25 | 43.28 | |||
690 | 9794 | 69794 | 02/1908 | Saltburn | 15/08/1951 | Starbeck | 43.5 | 43.53 | |||
691 | 9795 | 69795 | 03/1908 | Whitby | 17/07/1950 | Hull Botanic Gardens | 42.33 | 42.36 | |||
692 | 9796 | 69796 | 03/1908 | Whitby | 30/03/1953 | Hull Botanic Gardens | 45 | 45.12 | |||
693 | 9797 | 69797 | 03/1908 | Scarborough | 24/08/1951 | Starbeck | 43.42 | 43.53 | |||
694 | 9798 | 69798 | 04/1908 | Starbeck | 06/02/1951 | Hull Botanic Gardens | 42.83 | 42.87 | |||
695 | 9799 | 69799 | 04/1908 | Malton | 06/02/1950 | Starbeck | 41.83 | 41.87 |