Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1098 Today
» 4720 Yesterday
» 24729 Week
» 89683 Month
» 292347 Year
» 3319200 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
NER/LNER Worsdell "A7" Class 4-6-2T
Class |
NER |
LNER (1946) |
BR |
BR (BR Tmp) |
Built |
Date Withdrawn |
Modification |
Modification Date |
A7 |
1113
|
9770
|
69770
|
|
10/1910 |
13/10/1954 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
05/1922 |
A7 |
1114
|
9771
|
69771
|
|
11/1910 |
08/11/1954 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
16/09/1924 |
A7 |
1126
|
9772
|
69772
|
|
11/1910 |
16/12/1957 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
07/1917 |
A7 |
1129
|
9773
|
69773
|
|
12/1910 |
23/03/1955 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
03/10/1930 |
A7 |
1136
|
9774
|
69774
|
|
12/1910 |
23/08/1954 |
Rebuilt with 63B Superheated Boiler and reclassified A7 to A7/1 |
19/05/1950 |
A7 |
1170
|
9775
|
69775
|
9775
|
12/1910 |
04/04/1952 |
Rebuilt with 63B Superheated Boiler and reclassified A7 to A7/1 |
17/11/1945 |
A7 |
1174
|
9776
|
69776
|
|
01/1911 |
14/06/1954 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
03/01/1930 |
A7 |
1175
|
9777
|
69777
|
|
01/1911 |
12/05/1952 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
05/1919 |
A7 |
1179
|
9779
|
69779
|
9779
|
02/1911 |
30/11/1954 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
27/02/1929 |
A7 |
1180
|
9780
|
69780
|
9780
|
02/1911 |
15/11/1954 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
12/12/1930 |
A7 |
1181
|
9781
|
69781
|
|
03/1911 |
23/11/1956 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
04/03/1929 |
A7 |
1182
|
9782
|
69782
|
|
03/1911 |
16/12/1957 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
28/03/1923 |
A7 |
1183
|
9783
|
69783
|
|
03/1911 |
17/12/1956 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
30/11/1928 |
A7 |
1185
|
9784
|
69784
|
|
04/1911 |
05/03/1956 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
03/1922 |
A7 |
1190
|
9785
|
69785
|
|
04/1911 |
17/11/1955 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
11/1918 |
A7 |
1191
|
9786
|
69786
|
|
05/1911 |
16/12/1957 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
12/04/1930 |
A7 |
1192
|
9787
|
69787
|
|
05/1911 |
09/08/1954 |
Rebuilt with 63B Superheated Boiler and reclassified A7 to A7/1 |
18/08/1951 |
A7 |
1193
|
9788
|
69788
|
|
05/1911 |
21/11/1955 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
09/1920 |
A7 |
1195
|
9789
|
(69789)
|
|
06/1911 |
28/05/1951 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
11/1922 |