Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 277 Today
» 1015 Yesterday
» 4445 Week
» 19559 Month
» 322749 Year
» 1544314 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

NER/LNER Worsdell "A7" Class 4-6-2T


Company Old Number Company New Number Subtype Date Information
NER 1113 renumbered to LNER 9770 1946 on 27/01/1946  
NER 1180 renumbered to LNER 9780 1946 on 03/02/1946  
NER 1176 renumbered to LNER 9778 1946 on 10/02/1946  
NER 1181 renumbered to LNER 9781 1946 on 10/02/1946  
NER 1183 renumbered to LNER 9783 1946 on 10/02/1946  
NER 1129 renumbered to LNER 9773 1946 on 17/02/1946  
NER 1179 renumbered to LNER 9779 1946 on 17/02/1946  
NER 1185 renumbered to LNER 9784 1946 on 17/02/1946  
NER 1182 renumbered to LNER 9782 1946 on 21/02/1946  
NER 1126 renumbered to LNER 9772 1946 on 24/02/1946  
NER 1114 renumbered to LNER 9771 1946 on 10/03/1946  
NER 1174 renumbered to LNER 9776 1946 on 10/03/1946  
NER 1136 renumbered to LNER 9774 1946 on 24/03/1946  
NER 1175 renumbered to LNER 9777 1946 on 24/03/1946  
NER 1170 renumbered to LNER 9775 1946   31/03/1946  
NER 1190 renumbered to LNER 9785 1946   14/04/1946  
NER 1191 renumbered to LNER 9786 1946   14/04/1946  
NER 1195 renumbered to LNER 9789 1946   14/04/1946  
NER 1192 renumbered to LNER 9787 1946   19/05/1946  
NER 1193 renumbered to LNER 9788 1946   14/07/1946  
LNER 9780 renumbered to BR E9780 BR Tmp   30/01/1948  
LNER 9775 renumbered to BR E9775 BR Tmp   27/02/1948  
LNER 9779 renumbered to BR E9779 BR Tmp   11/03/1948  
LNER 9786 renumbered to BR 69786     16/04/1948  
LNER 9783 renumbered to BR 69783     23/04/1948  
LNER 9784 renumbered to BR 69784     21/05/1948  
LNER 9771 renumbered to BR 69771     10/06/1948  
LNER 9770 renumbered to BR 69770     02/07/1948  
LNER 9788 renumbered to BR 69788     02/07/1948  
LNER 9782 renumbered to BR 69782     16/07/1948  
LNER 9781 renumbered to BR 69781     20/08/1948  
LNER 9787 renumbered to BR 69787     24/09/1948  
LNER 9777 renumbered to BR 69777     01/10/1948  
LNER 9776 renumbered to BR 69776     05/11/1948  
LNER 9772 renumbered to BR 69772     19/02/1949  
LNER 9773 renumbered to BR 69773     12/03/1949  
LNER 9785 renumbered to BR 69785     08/10/1949  
BR E9775 renumbered to BR 69775     05/11/1949  
BR E9779 renumbered to BR 69779     08/12/1949  
LNER 9778 renumbered to BR 69778     06/01/1950  
BR E9780 renumbered to BR 69780     18/01/1950  
LNER 9774 renumbered to BR 69774     19/05/1950