Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 633 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18436 Week
» 71452 Month
» 190979 Year
» 3217832 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
LNER Gresley "A1/1" Class 4-6-2
Company |
Old Number |
|
Company |
New Number |
Subtype |
|
Date |
Information |
GNR |
1470 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1470N |
1924 Tmp |
|
09/10/1923 |
|
LNER |
1470N |
renumbered to |
LNER |
4470 |
1924 |
|
21/03/1925 |
|
LNER |
4470 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
113 |
1946 2nd |
|
09/10/1946 |
|
LNER |
113 |
renumbered to |
BR |
60113 |
|
|
01/10/1948 |
|