Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 4177 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17583 Week
» 70599 Month
» 190126 Year
» 3216979 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
LNER Peppercorn "A2" Class 4-6-2
Class |
LNER (1946) |
BR |
BR (Pfx) |
Built |
Date Withdrawn |
Modification |
Modification Date |
A2 |
526
|
60526
|
|
09/01/1948 |
12/11/1962 |
Double Chimney fitted |
27/10/1949 |
A2 |
|
60529
|
529
|
21/02/1948 |
29/12/1962 |
Double Chimney fitted |
16/09/1949 |
A2 |
|
60532
|
|
25/03/1948 |
31/12/1966 |
Double Chimney fitted |
28/09/1949 |
A2 |
|
60533
|
|
09/04/1948 |
15/06/1963 |
Double Chimney fitted |
09/1949 |
A2 |
|
60538
|
|
18/06/1948 |
12/11/1962 |
Double Chimney fitted |
28/10/1949 |