LNER Thompson "A2" Class 4-6-2
LNER (1924) | LNER (1946 1st) | LNER (1946) | LNER (1946 2nd) | BR (BR Tmp) | BR | Date To Service | Rebuilt From | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2001 | 990 | 501 | 60501 | 22/05/1934 | 14/09/1944 from P2 |
Doncaster | 08/02/1960 | York (North) | 25.75 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | ||||
2002 | 991 | 502 | 60502 | 06/10/1934 | 23/06/1944 from P2 |
Doncaster | 03/07/1961 | York (North) | 26.75 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | ||||
2003 | 992 | 503 | 60503 | 13/06/1936 | 17/12/1944 from P2 |
Haymarket | 27/11/1959 | York (North) | 23.42 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | ||||
2004 | 993 | 504 | E504 | 60504 | 11/07/1936 | 03/11/1944 from P2 |
Haymarket | 23/01/1961 | New England | 24.5 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | |||
2005 | 994 | 505 | 60505 | 08/08/1936 | 18/01/1943 from P2 |
Dundee Tay Bridge | 10/11/1959 | New England | 23.25 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | ||||
2006 | 995 | 506 | 60506 | 05/09/1936 | 15/04/1944 from P2 |
Haymarket | 04/04/1961 | New England | 24.58 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |