LNER Gresley "B2" Class 4-6-0
Class | LNER (1924) | LNER (1946) | BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
B2 | 2803 | 61603 | 13/12/1928 | COL 31A W |
Colchester Cambridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/12/1956 08/09/1958 |
08/09/1958 | |
B2 | 2807 | 1607 | 61607 | 21/12/1928 | COL 31A W |
Colchester Cambridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/11/1956 14/01/1960 |
14/01/1960 |
B2 | 2814 | 61614 | 23/10/1930 | COL 31A W |
Colchester Cambridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/11/1956 08/06/1959 |
08/06/1959 | |
B2 | 2815 | 61615 | 29/10/1930 | COL 31A W |
Colchester Cambridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/11/1956 09/02/1959 |
09/02/1959 | |
B2 | 2816 | 61616 | 10/1930 | COL 31A W |
Colchester Cambridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/11/1956 07/09/1959 |
07/09/1959 | |
B2 | 2817 | 1617 | 61617 | 10/1930 | CAM W |
Cambridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/08/1958 |
11/08/1958 |
B2 | 2832 | 61632 | 12/05/1931 | COL 31A W |
Colchester Cambridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/11/1956 02/02/1959 |
02/02/1959 | |
B2 | 2839 | 1639 | 61639 | 11/05/1933 | STR COL 31A W |
Stratford Colchester Cambridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/04/1949 17/11/1956 18/05/1959 |
18/05/1959 |
B2 | 2844 | 1644 | 61644 | 09/05/1935 | NOR CAM NOR COL 31A W |
Norwich Thorpe Cambridge Norwich Thorpe Colchester Cambridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/10/1948 27/11/1948 16/04/1949 17/11/1956 25/11/1959 |
25/11/1959 |
B2 | 2871 | 61671 | 11/06/1937 | CAM W |
Cambridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/09/1958 |
22/09/1958 |