LNER Gresley "B2" Class 4-6-0
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2803 | COL | Colchester | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 1607 | COL | Colchester | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2814 | COL | Colchester | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2815 | COL | Colchester | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2816 | COL | Colchester | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 1617 | CAM | Cambridge | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2832 | COL | Colchester | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 1639 | STR | Stratford | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2871 | CAM | Cambridge | |||
02/04/1949 | Reallocation | 1639 | STR | Stratford | COL | Colchester | |
16/04/1949 | Reallocation | 61644 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | COL | Colchester | |
17/11/1956 | Reallocation | 61607 | COL | Colchester | 31A | Cambridge | |
17/11/1956 | Reallocation | 61614 | COL | Colchester | 31A | Cambridge | |
17/11/1956 | Reallocation | 61615 | COL | Colchester | 31A | Cambridge | |
17/11/1956 | Reallocation | 61616 | COL | Colchester | 31A | Cambridge | |
17/11/1956 | Reallocation | 61632 | COL | Colchester | 31A | Cambridge | |
17/11/1956 | Reallocation | 61639 | COL | Colchester | 31A | Cambridge | |
17/11/1956 | Reallocation | 61644 | COL | Colchester | 31A | Cambridge | |
15/12/1956 | Reallocation | 61603 | COL | Colchester | 31A | Cambridge | |
11/08/1958 | Condemned | 61617 | CAM | Cambridge | COND | ||
08/09/1958 | Condemned | 61603 | 31A | Cambridge | COND | ||
22/09/1958 | Condemned | 61671 | CAM | Cambridge | COND | ||
02/02/1959 | Condemned | 61632 | 31A | Cambridge | COND | ||
09/02/1959 | Condemned | 61615 | 31A | Cambridge | COND | ||
18/05/1959 | Condemned | 61639 | 31A | Cambridge | COND | ||
08/06/1959 | Condemned | 61614 | 31A | Cambridge | COND | ||
07/09/1959 | Condemned | 61616 | 31A | Cambridge | COND | ||
25/11/1959 | Condemned | 61644 | 31A | Cambridge | COND | ||
14/01/1960 | Condemned | 61607 | 31A | Cambridge | COND |