LNER Gresley "B2" Class 4-6-0
Pre Grouping | Big 4 | BR | Build Date | Rebuild | Rebuild Date | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2803 | 61603 | 13/12/1928 | Rebuilt from B17 to B2 | 10/1946 | ||
2807 1607 |
61607 | 21/12/1928 | Rebuilt from B17 to B2 | 05/1947 | ||
2814 | 61614 | 23/10/1930 | Rebuilt from B17 to B2 | 11/1946 | ||
2815 | 61615 | 29/10/1930 | Rebuilt from B17 to B2 | 04/1946 | ||
2816 | 61616 | 10/1930 | Rebuilt from B17 to B2 | 11/1945 | ||
2817 1617 |
61617 | 10/1930 | Rebuilt from B17 to B2 | 12/1946 | ||
2832 | 61632 | 12/05/1931 | Rebuilt from B17 to B2 | 07/1946 | ||
2839 1639 |
61639 | 11/05/1933 | Rebuilt from B17 to B2 | 01/1946 | ||
2844 1644 |
61644 | 09/05/1935 | Rebuilt from B17 to B2 | 03/1949 | ||
2871 | 61671 | 11/06/1937 | Rebuilt from B17 to B2 | 08/1945 |