Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 815 Today
» 1015 Yesterday
» 4983 Week
» 20097 Month
» 323287 Year
» 1544852 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GCR/LNER Robinson "B5" Class 4-6-0


Class GCR LNER (1923 Int) LNER (1924) LNER (1946 1st) LNER (1946 2nd) BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
B5 1067   6067 1300 1678   11/1902 MEX
DON
LIN
SHF
SHF
MEX
W
Mexborough
Doncaster
Lincoln
Sheffield Neepsend
Sheffield Darnall
Mexborough
Withdrawn
19/05/1922
02/06/1924
18/11/1926
15/11/1935
11/04/1943
31/05/1943
20/11/1947
20/11/1947
B5 1068   6068 1301 1679   11/1902 MEX
ARD
IMM
COP
IMM
DON
WFD
SHF
SHF
TFD
MEX
W
Mexborough
Ardsley
Immingham
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Immingham
Doncaster
Woodford Halse
Sheffield Neepsend
Sheffield Darnall
Trafford Park (LNER)
Mexborough
Withdrawn
19/01/1917
05/01/1924
22/05/1924
22/02/1926
27/04/1926
26/07/1927
14/07/1928
30/03/1936
11/04/1943
06/10/1946
24/08/1947
23/12/1947
23/12/1947
B5 1069   6069 1302 1680 61680 11/1902 MEX
DON
LIN
SHF
SHF
TFD
19D
MEX
W
Mexborough
Doncaster
Lincoln
Sheffield Neepsend
Sheffield Darnall
Trafford Park (LNER)
Heaton Mersey
Mexborough
Withdrawn
01/09/1922
22/03/1924
10/06/1925
30/05/1936
11/04/1943
06/10/1946
08/01/1947
24/08/1947
13/11/1948
13/11/1948
B5 1070   6070       11/1902 MEX
LIN
IMM
LIN
IMM
LIN
W
Mexborough
Lincoln
Immingham
Lincoln
Immingham
Lincoln
Withdrawn
05/1922
30/06/1931
21/07/1931
07/07/1937
02/09/1937
16/05/1938
06/03/1939
06/03/1939
B5 1071 1071 6071 1303 1681 61681 11/1902 MEX
DON
IMM
WFD
GOR
MEX
LIN
MEX
W
Mexborough
Doncaster
Immingham
Woodford Halse
Gorton
Mexborough
Lincoln
Mexborough
Withdrawn
28/07/1922
26/02/1924
18/07/1925
18/07/1928
24/07/1939
16/04/1943
22/12/1946
14/07/1947
23/06/1948
23/06/1948
B5 1072   6072 1304 1682   11/1902 MEX
DON
LIN
IMM
DON
MEX
W
Mexborough
Doncaster
Lincoln
Immingham
Doncaster
Mexborough
Withdrawn
19/05/1922
19/05/1924
02/01/1931
15/12/1936
15/03/1940
18/03/1940
14/08/1947
14/08/1947
B5 180   5180 1305 1683   01/1904 IMM
DON
WFD
ARD
WFD
MEX
LIN
MEX
W
Immingham
Doncaster
Woodford Halse
Ardsley
Woodford Halse
Mexborough
Lincoln
Mexborough
Withdrawn
19/05/1922
26/07/1927
08/07/1929
30/07/1930
21/08/1930
19/04/1943
29/12/1946
14/07/1947
23/12/1947
23/12/1947
B5 181   5181 1306 1684   01/1904 IMM
LIN
IMM
MEX
LIN
W
Immingham
Lincoln
Immingham
Mexborough
Lincoln
Withdrawn
01/1904
14/01/1928
03/02/1937
18/03/1940
22/12/1946
01/05/1947
01/05/1947
B5 182   5182 1307 1685 61685 01/1904 LIN
SHF
SHF
MEX
LIN
MEX
W
Lincoln
Sheffield Neepsend
Sheffield Darnall
Mexborough
Lincoln
Mexborough
Withdrawn
14/01/1928
03/02/1936
11/04/1943
31/05/1943
22/12/1946
14/07/1947
06/03/1948
06/03/1948
B5 183   5183 1308 1686 61686 02/1904 IMM
ARD
GOR
LIN
SHF
SHF
TFD
MEX
W
Immingham
Ardsley
Gorton
Lincoln
Sheffield Neepsend
Sheffield Darnall
Trafford Park (LNER)
Mexborough
Withdrawn
19/05/1922
05/01/1924
15/04/1924
20/04/1925
20/06/1936
11/04/1943
06/10/1946
24/08/1947
12/06/1950
12/06/1950
B5 184   5184 1309 1687   02/1904 IMM
ARD
GOR
IMM
WFD
IMM
LIN
IMM
LIN
IMM
DON
MEX
W
Immingham
Ardsley
Gorton
Immingham
Woodford Halse
Immingham
Lincoln
Immingham
Lincoln
Immingham
Doncaster
Mexborough
Withdrawn
19/05/1922
05/01/1924
16/04/1924
08/10/1925
06/08/1926
30/05/1929
24/07/1930
25/09/1930
06/07/1937
03/09/1937
15/03/1940
18/03/1940
04/07/1947
04/07/1947
B5 185 185 5185 1310 1688 61688 02/1904 GOR
ARD
IMM
LIN
WFD
ARD
LIN
MEX
BFD
MEX
W
Gorton
Ardsley
Immingham
Lincoln
Woodford Halse
Ardsley
Lincoln
Mexborough
Bradford Hammerton Street
Mexborough
Withdrawn
02/1904
05/01/1924
24/04/1924
15/08/1924
16/06/1930
24/07/1930
22/08/1930
18/03/1940
17/06/1947
07/09/1947
31/10/1949
31/10/1949
B5 186   5186 1311 1689 61689 02/1904 MEX
ARD
GOR
IMM
WFD
SHF
SHF
MEX
LIN
MEX
W
Mexborough
Ardsley
Gorton
Immingham
Woodford Halse
Sheffield Neepsend
Sheffield Darnall
Mexborough
Lincoln
Mexborough
Withdrawn
15/12/1922
05/01/1924
07/01/1924
04/03/1924
07/08/1926
31/03/1936
11/04/1943
31/05/1943
22/12/1946
14/07/1947
19/10/1949
19/10/1949
B5 187   5187 1312 1690 61690 03/1904 LIN
IMM
MEX
W
Lincoln
Immingham
Mexborough
Withdrawn
28/07/1922
30/06/1936
18/03/1940
20/04/1948
20/04/1948