GCR/LNER Robinson "B5" Class 4-6-0
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/1904 | To Service | 181 | NEW | IMM | Immingham | ||
02/1904 | To Service | 185 | NEW | GOR | Gorton | ||
19/01/1917 | Reallocation | 1068 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
05/1922 | Reallocation | 1070 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
19/05/1922 | Reallocation | 1067 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
19/05/1922 | Reallocation | 1072 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
19/05/1922 | Reallocation | 180 | IMM | Immingham | |||
19/05/1922 | Reallocation | 183 | IMM | Immingham | |||
19/05/1922 | Reallocation | 184 | IMM | Immingham | |||
28/07/1922 | Reallocation | 1071 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
28/07/1922 | Reallocation | 187 | LIN | Lincoln | |||
01/09/1922 | Reallocation | 1069 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
15/12/1922 | Reallocation | 186 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
05/01/1924 | Reallocation | 1068 | MEX | Mexborough | ARD | Ardsley | |
05/01/1924 | Reallocation | 183 | IMM | Immingham | ARD | Ardsley | |
05/01/1924 | Reallocation | 184 | IMM | Immingham | ARD | Ardsley | |
05/01/1924 | Reallocation | 185 | GOR | Gorton | ARD | Ardsley | |
05/01/1924 | Reallocation | 186 | MEX | Mexborough | ARD | Ardsley | |
07/01/1924 | Reallocation | 186 | ARD | Ardsley | GOR | Gorton | |
26/02/1924 | Reallocation | 1071 | MEX | Mexborough | DON | Doncaster | |
04/03/1924 | Reallocation | 186 | GOR | Gorton | IMM | Immingham | |
22/03/1924 | Reallocation | 1069 | MEX | Mexborough | DON | Doncaster | |
15/04/1924 | Reallocation | 183 | ARD | Ardsley | GOR | Gorton | |
16/04/1924 | Reallocation | 5184 | ARD | Ardsley | GOR | Gorton | |
24/04/1924 | Reallocation | 185 | ARD | Ardsley | IMM | Immingham | |
19/05/1924 | Reallocation | 1072 | MEX | Mexborough | DON | Doncaster | |
22/05/1924 | Reallocation | 1068 | ARD | Ardsley | IMM | Immingham | |
02/06/1924 | Reallocation | 1067 | MEX | Mexborough | DON | Doncaster | |
15/08/1924 | Reallocation | 185 | IMM | Immingham | LIN | Lincoln | |
20/04/1925 | Reallocation | 5183 | GOR | Gorton | LIN | Lincoln | |
10/06/1925 | Reallocation | 6069 | DON | Doncaster | LIN | Lincoln | |
18/07/1925 | Reallocation | 6071 | DON | Doncaster | IMM | Immingham | |
08/10/1925 | Reallocation | 5184 | GOR | Gorton | IMM | Immingham | |
22/02/1926 | Reallocation | 6068 | IMM | Immingham | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |
27/04/1926 | Reallocation | 6068 | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | IMM | Immingham | |
06/08/1926 | Reallocation | 5184 | IMM | Immingham | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
07/08/1926 | Reallocation | 5186 | IMM | Immingham | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
18/11/1926 | Reallocation | 6067 | DON | Doncaster | LIN | Lincoln | |
26/07/1927 | Reallocation | 6068 | IMM | Immingham | DON | Doncaster | |
26/07/1927 | Reallocation | 5180 | IMM | Immingham | DON | Doncaster | |
14/01/1928 | Reallocation | 5181 | IMM | Immingham | LIN | Lincoln | |
14/01/1928 | Reallocation | 5182 | LIN | Lincoln | |||
14/07/1928 | Reallocation | 6068 | DON | Doncaster | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
18/07/1928 | Reallocation | 6071 | IMM | Immingham | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
30/05/1929 | Reallocation | 5184 | WFD | Woodford Halse | IMM | Immingham | |
08/07/1929 | Reallocation | 5180 | DON | Doncaster | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
16/06/1930 | Reallocation | 5185 | LIN | Lincoln | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
24/07/1930 | Reallocation | 5184 | IMM | Immingham | LIN | Lincoln | |
24/07/1930 | Reallocation | 5185 | WFD | Woodford Halse | ARD | Ardsley | |
30/07/1930 | Reallocation | 5180 | WFD | Woodford Halse | ARD | Ardsley | |
21/08/1930 | Reallocation | 5180 | ARD | Ardsley | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
22/08/1930 | Reallocation | 5185 | ARD | Ardsley | LIN | Lincoln | |
25/09/1930 | Reallocation | 5184 | LIN | Lincoln | IMM | Immingham | |
02/01/1931 | Reallocation | 6072 | DON | Doncaster | LIN | Lincoln | |
30/06/1931 | Reallocation | 6070 | MEX | Mexborough | LIN | Lincoln | |
21/07/1931 | Reallocation | 6070 | LIN | Lincoln | IMM | Immingham | |
15/11/1935 | Reallocation | 6067 | LIN | Lincoln | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
03/02/1936 | Reallocation | 5182 | LIN | Lincoln | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
30/03/1936 | Reallocation | 6068 | WFD | Woodford Halse | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
31/03/1936 | Reallocation | 5186 | WFD | Woodford Halse | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
30/05/1936 | Reallocation | 6069 | LIN | Lincoln | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
20/06/1936 | Reallocation | 5183 | LIN | Lincoln | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
30/06/1936 | Reallocation | 5187 | LIN | Lincoln | IMM | Immingham | |
15/12/1936 | Reallocation | 6072 | LIN | Lincoln | IMM | Immingham | |
03/02/1937 | Reallocation | 5181 | LIN | Lincoln | IMM | Immingham | |
06/07/1937 | Reallocation | 5184 | IMM | Immingham | LIN | Lincoln | |
07/07/1937 | Reallocation | 6070 | IMM | Immingham | LIN | Lincoln | |
02/09/1937 | Reallocation | 6070 | LIN | Lincoln | IMM | Immingham | |
03/09/1937 | Reallocation | 5184 | LIN | Lincoln | IMM | Immingham | |
16/05/1938 | Reallocation | 6070 | IMM | Immingham | LIN | Lincoln | |
06/03/1939 | Condemned | 6070 | LIN | Lincoln | COND | ||
24/07/1939 | Reallocation | 6071 | WFD | Woodford Halse | GOR | Gorton | |
15/03/1940 | Reallocation | 6072 | IMM | Immingham | DON | Doncaster | |
15/03/1940 | Reallocation | 5184 | IMM | Immingham | DON | Doncaster | |
18/03/1940 | Reallocation | 6072 | DON | Doncaster | MEX | Mexborough | |
18/03/1940 | Reallocation | 5181 | IMM | Immingham | MEX | Mexborough | |
18/03/1940 | Reallocation | 5184 | DON | Doncaster | MEX | Mexborough | |
18/03/1940 | Reallocation | 5185 | LIN | Lincoln | MEX | Mexborough | |
18/03/1940 | Reallocation | 5187 | IMM | Immingham | MEX | Mexborough | |
11/04/1943 | Reallocation | 6067 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
11/04/1943 | Reallocation | 6068 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
11/04/1943 | Reallocation | 6069 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
11/04/1943 | Reallocation | 5182 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
11/04/1943 | Reallocation | 5183 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
11/04/1943 | Reallocation | 5186 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
16/04/1943 | Reallocation | 6071 | GOR | Gorton | MEX | Mexborough | |
19/04/1943 | Reallocation | 5180 | WFD | Woodford Halse | MEX | Mexborough | |
31/05/1943 | Reallocation | 6067 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | MEX | Mexborough | |
31/05/1943 | Reallocation | 5182 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | MEX | Mexborough | |
31/05/1943 | Reallocation | 5186 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | MEX | Mexborough | |
06/10/1946 | Reallocation | 1679 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | |
06/10/1946 | Reallocation | 1680 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | |
06/10/1946 | Reallocation | 1686 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | |
22/12/1946 | Reallocation | 1681 | MEX | Mexborough | LIN | Lincoln | |
22/12/1946 | Reallocation | 1684 | MEX | Mexborough | LIN | Lincoln | |
22/12/1946 | Reallocation | 1685 | MEX | Mexborough | LIN | Lincoln | |
22/12/1946 | Reallocation | 1689 | MEX | Mexborough | LIN | Lincoln | |
29/12/1946 | Reallocation | 1683 | MEX | Mexborough | LIN | Lincoln | |
08/01/1947 | Reallocation | 1680 | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | 19D | Heaton Mersey | |
01/05/1947 | Condemned | 1684 | LIN | Lincoln | COND | ||
17/06/1947 | Reallocation | 1688 | MEX | Mexborough | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street | |
04/07/1947 | Condemned | 1687 | MEX | Mexborough | COND | ||
14/07/1947 | Reallocation | 1681 | LIN | Lincoln | MEX | Mexborough | |
14/07/1947 | Reallocation | 1683 | LIN | Lincoln | MEX | Mexborough | |
14/07/1947 | Reallocation | 1685 | LIN | Lincoln | MEX | Mexborough | |
14/07/1947 | Reallocation | 1689 | LIN | Lincoln | MEX | Mexborough | |
14/08/1947 | Condemned | 1682 | MEX | Mexborough | COND | ||
24/08/1947 | Reallocation | 1679 | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | MEX | Mexborough | |
24/08/1947 | Reallocation | 1680 | 19D | Heaton Mersey | MEX | Mexborough | |
24/08/1947 | Reallocation | 1686 | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | MEX | Mexborough | |
07/09/1947 | Reallocation | 1688 | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street | MEX | Mexborough | |
20/11/1947 | Condemned | 1678 | MEX | Mexborough | COND | ||
23/12/1947 | Condemned | 1679 | MEX | Mexborough | COND | ||
23/12/1947 | Condemned | 1683 | MEX | Mexborough | COND | ||
06/03/1948 | Condemned | 61685 | MEX | Mexborough | COND | ||
20/04/1948 | Condemned | 61690 | MEX | Mexborough | COND | ||
23/06/1948 | Condemned | 61681 | MEX | Mexborough | COND | ||
13/11/1948 | Condemned | 61680 | MEX | Mexborough | COND | ||
19/10/1949 | Condemned | 61689 | MEX | Mexborough | COND | ||
31/10/1949 | Condemned | 61688 | MEX | Mexborough | COND | ||
12/06/1950 | Condemned | 61686 | MEX | Mexborough | COND |