Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 331 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18134 Week
» 71150 Month
» 190677 Year
» 3217530 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
GCR/LNER Robinson "B5" Class 4-6-0
Company |
Old Number |
|
Company |
New Number |
Subtype |
|
Date |
Information |
GCR |
1071 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1071C |
1923 Int |
|
15/09/1923 |
|
GCR |
185 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
185C |
1923 Int |
|
01/12/1923 |
|
GCR |
184 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5184 |
1924 |
|
26/01/1924 |
|
GCR |
1070 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
6070 |
1924 |
|
19/04/1924 |
|
GCR |
187 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5187 |
1924 |
|
26/04/1924 |
|
GCR |
182 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5182 |
1924 |
|
12/07/1924 |
|
GCR |
1067 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
6067 |
1924 |
|
25/10/1924 |
|
GCR |
180 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5180 |
1924 |
|
06/12/1924 |
|
GCR |
183 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5183 |
1924 |
|
04/04/1925 |
|
GCR |
1072 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
6072 |
1924 |
|
09/05/1925 |
|
GCR |
1069 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
6069 |
1924 |
|
30/05/1925 |
|
LNER |
185C |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5185 |
1924 |
|
04/07/1925 |
|
LNER |
1071C |
renumbered to |
LNER |
6071 |
1924 |
|
11/07/1925 |
|
GCR |
186 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5186 |
1924 |
|
24/10/1925 |
|
GCR |
181 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5181 |
1924 |
|
28/11/1925 |
|
GCR |
1068 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
6068 |
1924 |
|
09/01/1926 |
|
LNER |
5187 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1312 |
1946 1st |
on |
27/01/1946 |
|
LNER |
5186 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1311 |
1946 1st |
on |
31/01/1946 |
|
LNER |
1311 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1689 |
1946 2nd |
on |
24/03/1946 |
|
LNER |
1312 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1690 |
1946 2nd |
on |
24/03/1946 |
|
LNER |
5183 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1686 |
1946 2nd |
|
31/03/1946 |
|
LNER |
5180 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1683 |
1946 2nd |
|
12/05/1946 |
|
LNER |
5185 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1688 |
1946 2nd |
|
26/05/1946 |
|
LNER |
6068 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1679 |
1946 2nd |
|
07/07/1946 |
|
LNER |
6069 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1680 |
1946 2nd |
|
24/08/1946 |
|
LNER |
6071 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1681 |
1946 2nd |
|
30/08/1946 |
|
LNER |
6072 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1682 |
1946 2nd |
|
01/09/1946 |
|
LNER |
5181 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1684 |
1946 2nd |
|
22/09/1946 |
|
LNER |
5184 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1687 |
1946 2nd |
|
22/09/1946 |
|
LNER |
5182 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1685 |
1946 2nd |
|
27/10/1946 |
|
LNER |
6067 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1678 |
1946 2nd |
|
10/11/1946 |
|