GCR/LNER Robinson "B6" Class 4-6-0
Class | GCR | LNER (1924 Tmp) | LNER (1924) | LNER (1946 1st) | LNER (1946 2nd) | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
B6 | 416 | 5416 | 1328 | 1346 | 07/1918 | GOR SHF GOR SHF ARD COP ARD BFD SHF SHF ARD W |
Gorton Sheffield Neepsend Gorton Sheffield Neepsend Ardsley Copley Hill (Leeds) Ardsley Bradford Hammerton Street Sheffield Neepsend Sheffield Darnall Ardsley Withdrawn |
14/07/1922 05/09/1925 23/04/1927 07/05/1927 17/02/1928 30/04/1928 01/10/1928 15/06/1929 01/06/1934 11/04/1943 28/07/1946 28/11/1947 |
28/11/1947 | |
B6 | 52 | 52 | 5052 | 1329 | 1347 | 03/1921 | GOR SHF ARD BFD ARD BFD ARD SHF SHF ARD W |
Gorton Sheffield Neepsend Ardsley Bradford Hammerton Street Ardsley Bradford Hammerton Street Ardsley Sheffield Neepsend Sheffield Darnall Ardsley Withdrawn |
14/07/1922 10/02/1926 07/02/1928 13/05/1930 10/09/1930 29/12/1930 14/04/1931 15/05/1934 11/04/1943 04/08/1946 31/12/1947 |
31/12/1947 |
B6 | 53 | 53 | 5053 | 1330 | 1348 | 04/1921 | GOR SHF ARD COP ARD BFD SHF SHF ARD W |
Gorton Sheffield Neepsend Ardsley Copley Hill (Leeds) Ardsley Bradford Hammerton Street Sheffield Neepsend Sheffield Darnall Ardsley Withdrawn |
14/07/1922 02/02/1927 17/02/1928 26/03/1928 30/04/1928 01/02/1930 26/06/1934 11/04/1943 28/07/1946 31/12/1947 |
31/12/1947 |