Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2963 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16369 Week
» 69385 Month
» 188912 Year
» 3215765 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
GCR/LNER Robinson "B6" Class 4-6-0
Class |
GCR |
LNER (1924) |
LNER (1946 1st) |
LNER (1946 2nd) |
LNER (1924 Tmp) |
Built |
Date Withdrawn |
Modification |
Modification Date |
B6 |
416
|
5416
|
(1328)
|
1346
|
|
07/1918 |
28/11/1947 |
Intensifore lubricator removed |
06/07/1935 |
B6 |
52
|
5052
|
(1329)
|
1347
|
52
|
03/1921 |
31/12/1947 |
Intensifore lubricator removed |
27/07/1935 |
B6 |
53
|
5053
|
(1330)
|
1348
|
53
|
04/1921 |
31/12/1947 |
Intensifore lubricator removed |
06/10/1934 |