GCR/LNER Robinson "B7" Class 4-6-0
GCR | LNER (1923 Int) | LNER (1924) | LNER (1946) | BR (BR Tmp) | BR (BR 1st) | BR (BR 2nd) | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
475C | 5475 | 1388 | 61388 | 61710 | 11/08/1923 | Neasden | 20/02/1950 | Gorton | 26.5 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Gorton) | 04/1950 | 26.70 | ||
476C | 5476 | 1389 | 61389 | 25/08/1923 | Neasden | 04/02/1949 | Gorton | 25.5 | Cut | Carriage Works (Dukinfield) | |||||
477C | 5477 | 1390 | 61390 | 22/09/1923 | Gorton | 02/11/1948 | Gorton | 25.17 | Cut | Carriage Works (Dukinfield) | |||||
478C | 5478 | 1391 | E1391 | 61391 | 61711 | 20/10/1923 | Gorton | 03/07/1950 | Gorton | 26.75 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Gorton) | 09/1950 | 26.92 | |
479C | 5479 | 1392 | 61392 | 61712 | 03/11/1923 | Gorton | 13/06/1949 | Gorton | 25.58 | Cut | Carriage Works (Dukinfield) | ||||
480C | 5480 | 1393 | 61393 | 24/11/1923 | Gorton | 03/08/1948 | Gorton | 24.75 | Cut | Carriage Works (Dukinfield) | |||||
5481 | 1394 | 61394 | 08/12/1923 | Gorton | 22/04/1948 | Gorton | 24.33 | Cut | Carriage Works (Dukinfield) | ||||||
5482 | 1395 | 61395 | 22/12/1923 | Gorton | 30/11/1948 | Gorton | 24.92 | Cut | Carriage Works (Dukinfield) | 01/1949 | 25.08 | ||||
5483 | 1396 | 61396 | 61713 | 02/02/1924 | Gorton | 05/09/1949 | Gorton | 25.58 | Cut | Carriage Works (Dukinfield) | |||||
5484 | 1397 | 61397 | 01/03/1924 | Gorton | 04/06/1948 | Sheffield Darnall | 24.25 | Cut | Carriage Works (Dukinfield) |