Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1708 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19511 Week
» 72527 Month
» 192054 Year
» 3218907 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
GCR/LNER Robinson "B9" Class 4-6-0
Company |
Old Number |
|
Company |
New Number |
Subtype |
|
Date |
Information |
GCR |
1107 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1107C |
1923 Int |
|
24/11/1923 |
|
GCR |
1108 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
6108 |
1924 |
|
26/04/1924 |
|
GCR |
1110 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
6110 |
1924 |
|
26/04/1924 |
|
GCR |
1106 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
6106 |
1924 |
|
03/05/1924 |
|
GCR |
1114 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
6114 |
1924 |
|
30/08/1924 |
|
GCR |
1113 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
6113 |
1924 |
|
06/09/1924 |
|
GCR |
1111 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
6111 |
1924 |
|
18/10/1924 |
|
GCR |
1109 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
6109 |
1924 |
|
15/11/1924 |
|
GCR |
1112 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
6112 |
1924 |
|
20/12/1924 |
|
GCR |
1105 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
6105 |
1924 |
|
15/08/1925 |
|
LNER |
1107C |
renumbered to |
LNER |
6107 |
1924 |
|
26/09/1925 |
|
LNER |
6114 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1478 |
1946 2nd |
|
25/08/1946 |
|
LNER |
6109 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1473 |
1946 2nd |
|
27/10/1946 |
|
LNER |
6111 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1475 |
1946 2nd |
|
27/10/1946 |
|
LNER |
6105 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1469 |
1946 2nd |
|
03/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
6108 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1472 |
1946 2nd |
|
09/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
6113 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1477 |
1946 2nd |
|
09/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
6112 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1476 |
1946 2nd |
|
10/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
6106 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1470 |
1946 2nd |
|
16/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
6107 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1471 |
1946 2nd |
|
17/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
6110 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
1474 |
1946 2nd |
|
24/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
1469 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61469 |
|
|
12/02/1949 |
|
LNER |
1475 |
renumbered to |
BR |
61475 |
|
|
12/02/1949 |
|