GER/LNER Holden "B12" Class 4-6-0
Class | GER | LNER (1924) | LNER (1942) | LNER (1946) | BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
B12/1 | 1500 | 8500 | 7415 | 1500 | 61500 | 12/1911 | KEI W |
Keith Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/06/1948 |
23/06/1948 |
B12/1 | 1501 | 8501 | 7416 | 1501 | 61501 | 02/1912 | KEI W |
Keith Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/05/1953 |
20/05/1953 |
B12/1 | 1502 | 8502 | 7417 | 1502 | 61502 | 02/1912 | KEI W |
Keith Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/04/1954 |
30/04/1954 |
B12/1 | 1503 | 8503 | 7418 | 1503 | 61503 | 03/1912 | KEI W |
Keith Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/05/1951 |
20/05/1951 |
B12/1 | 1504 | 8504 | 7419 | 1504 | 61504 | 05/1912 | KIT W |
Kittybrewster Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/06/1950 |
16/06/1950 |
B12/4 | 1505 | 8505 | 7420 | 1505 | 61505 | 02/1913 | KIT W |
Kittybrewster Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/03/1952 |
25/03/1952 |
B12/1 | 1506 | 12/1912 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1913 | 07/1913 | ||||
B12/4 | 1507 | 8507 | 7421 | 1507 | 61507 | 03/1913 | KIT 61C 61C W |
Kittybrewster Keith Keith Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/09/1951 09/09/1951 26/02/1953 |
26/02/1953 |
B12/4 | 1508 | 8508 | 7422 | 1508 | 61508 | 03/1913 | KIT 61C W |
Kittybrewster Keith Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1952 30/04/1953 |
30/04/1953 |
B12/3 | 1509 | 8509 | 7423 | 1509 | 61509 | 04/1913 | IPS W |
Ipswich Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/10/1948 |
15/10/1948 |
B12/3 | 1510 | 8510 | 7424 | 1510 | 61510 | 04/1913 | STR W |
Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/1949 |
06/1949 |
B12/4 | 1511 | 8511 | 7425 | 1511 | 61511 | 05/1913 | KIT W |
Kittybrewster Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/05/1952 |
05/05/1952 |
B12/3 | 1512 | 8512 | 7426 | 1512 | 61512 | 06/1913 | COL 30A W |
Colchester Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/12/1953 01/01/1957 |
01/01/1957 |
B12/1 | 1513 | 8513 | 7427 | 1513 | 61513 | 06/1913 | KIT W |
Kittybrewster Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/02/1953 |
18/02/1953 |
B12/3 | 1514 | 8514 | 7428 | 1514 | 61514 | 06/1913 | STR 32A 32D 32D 32A 32D 32A W |
Stratford Norwich Thorpe Yarmouth South Town Yarmouth South Town Norwich Thorpe Yarmouth South Town Norwich Thorpe Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/05/1951 26/05/1951 23/06/1951 22/01/1955 19/03/1955 23/07/1955 07/10/1959 |
07/10/1959 |
B12/3 | 1515 | 8515 | 7429 | 1515 | 61515 | 11/1913 | STR 30E 30E W |
Stratford Colchester Colchester Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/07/1951 21/07/1951 12/11/1951 |
12/11/1951 |
B12/3 | 1516 | 8516 | 7430 | 1516 | 61516 | 11/1913 | IPS STR 35B 31C 31A W |
Ipswich Stratford Grantham Kings Lynn Cambridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/05/1948 19/01/1957 20/04/1957 19/10/1957 14/07/1958 |
14/07/1958 |
B12/3 | 1517 | 8517 | 7431 | 1517 | 61517 | 11/1913 | STR W |
Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/10/1948 |
21/10/1948 |
B12/1 | 1518 | 8518 | 7432 | 1518 | 12/1913 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1947 | 12/1947 | |
B12/3 | 1519 | 8519 | 7433 | 1519 | 61519 | 12/1913 | STR 32A W |
Stratford Norwich Thorpe Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/01/1957 23/12/1957 |
23/12/1957 |
B12/3 | 1520 | 8520 | 7434 | 1520 | 61520 | 04/1914 | STR 32A W |
Stratford Norwich Thorpe Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/03/1955 24/06/1957 |
24/06/1957 |
B12/1 | 1521 | 8521 | 7435 | 1521 | 61521 | 04/1914 | KIT W |
Kittybrewster Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/07/1952 |
15/07/1952 |
B12/1 | 1522 | 8522 | 7436 | 1522 | 04/1914 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1947 | 08/1947 | |
B12/3 | 1523 | 8523 | 7437 | 1523 | 61523 | 05/1914 | COL 30A W |
Colchester Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/12/1953 21/03/1955 |
21/03/1955 |
B12/1 | 1524 | 8524 | 7438 | 1524 | 61524 | 05/1914 | KIT 61C W |
Kittybrewster Keith Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/07/1953 05/11/1953 |
05/11/1953 |
B12/3 | 1525 | 8525 | 7439 | 1525 | 61525 | 06/1914 | STR W |
Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/08/1951 |
06/08/1951 |
B12/1 | 1526 | 8526 | 7440 | 1526 | 61526 | 06/1914 | KIT W |
Kittybrewster Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/10/1951 |
26/10/1951 |
B12/1 | 1527 | 8527 | 7441 | 1527 | 08/1914 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1947 | 09/1947 | |
B12/1 | 1528 | 8528 | 7442 | 1528 | 61528 | 08/1914 | KIT W |
Kittybrewster Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/07/1953 |
01/07/1953 |
B12/1 | 1529 | 8529 | 7443 | 1529 | 61529 | 09/1914 | KIT W |
Kittybrewster Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/02/1950 |
03/02/1950 |
B12/3 | 1530 | 8530 | 7444 | 1530 | 61530 | 11/1914 | STR YB 32B 32B 32A 32A 32F 32A 32F 32A 31A W |
Stratford Yarmouth Beach Ipswich Ipswich Norwich Thorpe Norwich Thorpe Yarmouth Beach Norwich Thorpe Yarmouth Beach Norwich Thorpe Cambridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/05/1948 16/10/1950 21/10/1950 25/02/1951 24/03/1951 19/05/1951 19/09/1953 19/06/1954 31/01/1959 13/06/1959 09/11/1959 |
09/11/1959 |
B12/1 | 1531 | 8531 | 7445 | 1531 | 11/1914 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1947 | 11/1947 | |
B12/1 | 1532 | 8532 | 7446 | 1532 | 61532 | 12/1914 | KIT 61C W |
Kittybrewster Keith Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/04/1953 01/07/1953 |
01/07/1953 |
B12/3 | 1533 | 8533 | 7447 | 1533 | 61533 | 12/1914 | STR SL 32B 32B 31D 31D 32D 32B 32D 32A 32B 32F 32A 31A W |
Stratford South Lynn Ipswich Ipswich South Lynn South Lynn Yarmouth South Town Ipswich Yarmouth South Town Norwich Thorpe Ipswich Yarmouth Beach Norwich Thorpe Cambridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/08/1948 12/07/1952 19/07/1952 01/11/1952 15/11/1952 18/04/1953 23/01/1954 24/04/1954 22/01/1955 20/08/1955 14/12/1957 31/01/1959 13/06/1959 03/11/1959 |
03/11/1959 |
B12/1 | 1534 | 8534 | 7448 | 02/1915 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1945 | 06/1945 | ||
B12/3 | 1535 | 8535 | 7449 | 1535 | 61535 | 03/1915 | STR IPS 32A W |
Stratford Ipswich Norwich Thorpe Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/05/1948 07/11/1959 11/12/1959 |
11/12/1959 |
B12/1 | 1536 | 8536 | 7450 | 1536 | 61536 | 05/1915 | KIT W |
Kittybrewster Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/12/1949 |
30/12/1949 |
B12/3 | 1537 | 8537 | 7451 | 1537 | 61537 | 07/1915 | STR CAM SL 32B W |
Stratford Cambridge South Lynn Ipswich Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/02/1949 26/03/1949 21/08/1954 22/04/1957 |
22/04/1957 |
B12/3 | 1538 | 8538 | 7452 | 1538 | 61538 | 07/1915 | STR GRA 35C W |
Stratford Grantham Spital Bridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/10/1949 23/07/1955 01/01/1957 |
01/01/1957 |
B12/1 | 1539 | 8539 | 7453 | 1539 | 61539 | 06/1917 | KIT 61C W |
Kittybrewster Keith Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/04/1953 10/11/1954 |
10/11/1954 |
B12/3 | 1540 | 8540 | 7454 | 1540 | 61540 | 07/1917 | STR SL 32A 32F W |
Stratford South Lynn Norwich Thorpe Yarmouth Beach Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/12/1948 24/07/1954 19/01/1957 28/10/1957 |
28/10/1957 |
B12/3 | 1541 | 8541 | 7455 | 1541 | 61541 | 06/1920 | STR GRA GRA W |
Stratford Grantham Grantham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/11/1949 30/11/1949 01/01/1957 |
01/01/1957 |
B12/3 | 1542 | 8542 | 7456 | 1542 | 61542 | 07/1920 | STR 32A 32D 32A W |
Stratford Norwich Thorpe Yarmouth South Town Norwich Thorpe Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/05/1951 23/06/1951 22/01/1955 14/07/1958 |
14/07/1958 |
B12/1 | 1543 | 8543 | 7457 | 1543 | 61543 | 07/1920 | KIT W |
Kittybrewster Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/06/1953 |
19/06/1953 |
B12/1 | 1544 | 8544 | 7458 | 1544 | 07/1920 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1947 | 09/1947 | |
B12/3 | 1545 | 8545 | 7459 | 1545 | 61545 | 08/1920 | STR YB 32A 32A 32D 32D 32F 32D 32A 32F W |
Stratford Yarmouth Beach Norwich Thorpe Norwich Thorpe Yarmouth South Town Yarmouth South Town Yarmouth Beach Yarmouth South Town Norwich Thorpe Yarmouth Beach Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/05/1948 16/10/1950 21/10/1950 20/01/1951 31/01/1951 23/06/1951 24/07/1954 25/09/1954 22/01/1955 01/01/1957 |
01/01/1957 |
B12/3 | 1546 | 8546 | 7460 | 1546 | 61546 | 09/1920 | STR 31A W |
Stratford Cambridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/02/1957 11/05/1959 |
11/05/1959 |
B12/3 | 1547 | 8547 | 7461 | 1547 | 61547 | 09/1920 | STR SL 32A W |
Stratford South Lynn Norwich Thorpe Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/12/1948 25/09/1954 13/10/1958 |
13/10/1958 |
B12/1 | 1548 | 8548 | 7462 | 1548 | 05/1921 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1946 | 12/1946 | |
B12/3 | 1549 | 8549 | 7463 | 1549 | 61549 | 06/1921 | STR 31A W |
Stratford Cambridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/02/1957 01/01/1959 |
01/01/1959 |
B12/3 | 1550 | 8550 | 7464 | 1550 | 61550 | 10/1920 | STR W |
Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/01/1957 |
01/01/1957 |
B12/1 | 1551 | 8551 | 7465 | 1551 | 10/1920 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1947 | 01/1947 | |
B12/1 | 1552 | 8552 | 7466 | 1552 | 61552 | 12/1920 | KIT W |
Kittybrewster Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/07/1952 |
17/07/1952 |
B12/3 | 1553 | 8553 | 7467 | 1553 | 61553 | 12/1920 | COL GRA GRA 31A W |
Colchester Grantham Grantham Cambridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/11/1949 17/12/1949 20/04/1957 25/08/1958 |
25/08/1958 |
B12/3 | 1554 | 8554 | 7468 | 1554 | 61554 | 01/1921 | STR GRA 35C 31A W |
Stratford Grantham Spital Bridge Cambridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/12/1949 24/03/1956 16/03/1957 15/09/1958 |
15/09/1958 |
B12/3 | 1555 | 8555 | 7469 | 1555 | 61555 | 01/1921 | STR COL 30A 30E 35B 31A W |
Stratford Colchester Stratford Colchester Grantham Cambridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/02/1948 19/12/1953 17/11/1956 19/01/1957 20/04/1957 07/10/1957 |
07/10/1957 |
B12/3 | 1556 | 8556 | 7470 | 1556 | 61556 | 02/1921 | STR COL 30A 30E 32A W |
Stratford Colchester Stratford Colchester Norwich Thorpe Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/02/1948 19/12/1953 17/11/1956 19/01/1957 23/12/1957 |
23/12/1957 |
B12/3 | 1557 | 8557 | 7471 | 1557 | 61557 | 02/1921 | STR COL 30A 30E W |
Stratford Colchester Stratford Colchester Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/02/1948 19/12/1953 17/11/1956 01/01/1957 |
01/01/1957 |
B12/3 | 1558 | 8558 | 7472 | 1558 | 61558 | 02/1921 | STR COL 30A 30E 35C 31A 31C 31A W |
Stratford Colchester Stratford Colchester Spital Bridge Cambridge Kings Lynn Cambridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/02/1948 19/12/1953 17/11/1956 19/01/1957 16/03/1957 20/04/1957 14/12/1957 13/04/1959 |
13/04/1959 |
B12/3 | 1559 | 8559 | 7473 | 1559 | 61559 | 02/1921 | STR 30E 30E W |
Stratford Colchester Colchester Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/05/1951 23/06/1951 03/09/1951 |
03/09/1951 |
B12/1 | 1560 | 8560 | 7474 | 1560 | 61560 | 04/1921 | KIT W |
Kittybrewster Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/05/1952 |
09/05/1952 |
B12/3 | 1561 | 8561 | 7475 | 1561 | 61561 | 03/1920 | IPS W |
Ipswich Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/09/1958 |
30/09/1958 |
B12/3 | 1562 | 8562 | 7476 | 1562 | 61562 | 04/1920 | IPS W |
Ipswich Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/08/1955 |
08/08/1955 |
B12/1 | 1563 | 8563 | 7477 | 1563 | 61563 | 04/1920 | KIT W |
Kittybrewster Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/04/1953 |
10/04/1953 |
B12/3 | 1564 | 8564 | 7478 | 1564 | 61564 | 04/1920 | IPS W |
Ipswich Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/11/1958 |
24/11/1958 |
B12/3 | 1565 | 8565 | 7479 | 1565 | 61565 | 05/1920 | STR GRA GRA 35C W |
Stratford Grantham Grantham Spital Bridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/11/1949 10/12/1949 23/07/1955 01/01/1957 |
01/01/1957 |
B12/3 | 1566 | 8566 | 7480 | 1566 | 61566 | 05/1920 | IPS 32A W |
Ipswich Norwich Thorpe Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1958 26/01/1959 |
26/01/1959 |
B12/3 | 1567 | 8567 | 7481 | 1567 | 61567 | 05/1920 | STR 30E 30E 30A 35B 35C 31A W |
Stratford Colchester Colchester Stratford Grantham Spital Bridge Cambridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/05/1951 23/06/1951 17/11/1951 14/02/1953 22/09/1956 16/03/1957 11/11/1958 |
11/11/1958 |
B12/3 | 1568 | 8568 | 7482 | 1568 | 61568 | 06/1920 | STR 32B 32A 32A 32F 32D 32B 32F 32B 32A W |
Stratford Ipswich Norwich Thorpe Norwich Thorpe Yarmouth Beach Yarmouth South Town Ipswich Yarmouth Beach Ipswich Norwich Thorpe Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/05/1951 07/07/1951 21/07/1951 25/07/1953 24/10/1953 23/01/1954 22/05/1954 24/07/1954 21/08/1954 03/08/1959 |
03/08/1959 |
B12/3 | 1569 | 8569 | 7483 | 1569 | 61569 | 06/1920 | IPS W |
Ipswich Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/01/1957 |
01/01/1957 |
B12/3 | 1570 | 8570 | 7484 | 1570 | 61570 | 06/1920 | IPS W |
Ipswich Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/03/1958 |
31/03/1958 |
B12/3 | 8571 | 7485 | 1571 | 61571 | 08/1928 | STR 35B 32B 32A W |
Stratford Grantham Ipswich Norwich Thorpe Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/02/1953 21/03/1953 14/12/1957 12/1959 |
12/1959 | |
B12/3 | 8572 | 7486 | 1572 | 61572 | 08/1928 | STR 35B 32B 32A W |
Stratford Grantham Ipswich Norwich Thorpe Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/02/1953 21/03/1953 17/10/1959 20/09/1961 |
20/09/1961 | |
B12/3 | 8573 | 7487 | 1573 | 61573 | 08/1928 | STR 31A W |
Stratford Cambridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/03/1957 01/01/1959 |
01/01/1959 | |
B12/3 | 8574 | 7488 | 1574 | 61574 | 08/1928 | STR 35B W |
Stratford Grantham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/02/1953 01/01/1957 |
01/01/1957 | |
B12/3 | 8575 | 7489 | 1575 | 61575 | 09/1928 | STR 31A 31C 31A W |
Stratford Cambridge Kings Lynn Cambridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/01/1957 20/04/1957 14/12/1957 06/04/1959 |
06/04/1959 | |
B12/3 | 8576 | 7490 | 1576 | 61576 | 08/1928 | STR 31A W |
Stratford Cambridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/01/1957 01/01/1959 |
01/01/1959 | |
B12/3 | 8577 | 7491 | 1577 | 61577 | 09/1928 | IPS 32A 31A W |
Ipswich Norwich Thorpe Cambridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/08/1958 18/04/1959 28/09/1959 |
28/09/1959 | |
B12/3 | 8578 | 7492 | 1578 | 61578 | 09/1928 | STR W |
Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/01/1957 |
01/01/1957 | |
B12/3 | 8579 | 7493 | 1579 | 61579 | 09/1928 | STR 30E 30A W |
Stratford Colchester Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/11/1951 19/12/1953 01/01/1957 |
01/01/1957 | |
B12/3 | 8580 | 7494 | 1580 | 61580 | 10/1928 | STR 30E 30E 30A 35B 31A W |
Stratford Colchester Colchester Stratford Grantham Cambridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/09/1951 22/09/1951 24/11/1951 14/02/1953 20/04/1957 02/03/1959 |
02/03/1959 |