Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 946 Today
» 1008 Yesterday
» 7101 Week
» 17271 Month
» 295067 Year
» 1179448 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LNER Gresley "B17" Class 4-6-0


Class LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
B17/1 2800 1600 61600 07/12/1928 IPS
30A
31A
30A
W
Ipswich
Stratford
Cambridge
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/02/1953
19/01/1957
20/07/1957
28/07/1958
28/07/1958
B17/1 2801 1601 61601 05/12/1928 IPS
30A
31A
30A
W
Ipswich
Stratford
Cambridge
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/02/1953
19/01/1957
20/07/1957
13/01/1958
13/01/1958
B17/1 2802 1602 61602 11/1928 IPS
32D
W
Ipswich
Yarmouth South Town
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/01/1957
13/01/1958
13/01/1958
B17/1 2803   61603 13/12/1928 COL
31A
W
Colchester
Cambridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/12/1956
08/09/1958
08/09/1958
B17/6 2804 1604 61604 13/12/1928 IPS
30A
W
Ipswich
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/07/1952
24/08/1953
24/08/1953
B17/6 2805 1605 61605 17/12/1928 STR
31B
30A
W
Stratford
March
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/03/1952
20/09/1952
15/05/1958
15/05/1958
B17/6 2806 1606 61606 19/12/1928 STR
30E
30A
30E
W
Stratford
Colchester
Stratford
Colchester
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/11/1956
19/01/1957
14/06/1958
01/09/1958
01/09/1958
B17/1 2807 1607 61607 21/12/1928 COL
31A
W
Colchester
Cambridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/11/1956
14/01/1960
14/01/1960
B17/1 2808 1608 61608 26/12/1928 CAM
30E
30A
30E
31A
W
Cambridge
Colchester
Stratford
Colchester
Cambridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/11/1956
19/01/1957
14/06/1958
20/12/1958
14/03/1960
14/03/1960
B17/1 2809 1609 61609 27/12/1928 STR
YAR
30A
32B
W
Stratford
Yarmouth South Town
Stratford
Ipswich
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/1949
14/02/1953
10/05/1958
23/06/1958
23/06/1958
B17/2 2810 1610 61610 22/08/1930 CAM
31B
31A
W
Cambridge
March
Cambridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/05/1958
12/12/1959
11/01/1960
11/01/1960
B17/6 2811 1611 61611 22/08/1930 CAM
30E
32B
32A
W
Cambridge
Colchester
Ipswich
Norwich Thorpe
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/11/1956
19/01/1957
01/08/1959
14/10/1959
14/10/1959
B17/6 2812 1612 61612 22/10/1930 STR
30E
32B
W
Stratford
Colchester
Ipswich
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/06/1958
16/08/1958
29/09/1959
29/09/1959
B17/6 2813 1613 61613 22/10/1930 CAM
30E
30A
31A
W
Cambridge
Colchester
Stratford
Cambridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/06/1958
11/10/1958
14/02/1959
18/12/1959
18/12/1959
B17/2 2814   61614 23/10/1930 COL
31A
W
Colchester
Cambridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/11/1956
08/06/1959
08/06/1959
B17/2 2815   61615 29/10/1930 COL
31A
W
Colchester
Cambridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/11/1956
09/02/1959
09/02/1959
B17/2 2816   61616 10/1930 COL
31A
W
Colchester
Cambridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/11/1956
07/09/1959
07/09/1959
B17/2 2817 1617 61617 10/1930 CAM
W
Cambridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/08/1958
11/08/1958
B17/6 2818 1618 61618 05/11/1930 IPS
30A
32B
31A
W
Ipswich
Stratford
Ipswich
Cambridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/11/1953
23/01/1954
31/10/1959
23/01/1960
23/01/1960
B17/6 2819 1619 61619 08/11/1930 CAM
31B
W
Cambridge
March
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/10/1952
19/09/1958
19/09/1958
B17/6 2820 1620 61620 12/11/1930 CAM
31A
31B
31C
W
Cambridge
Cambridge
March
Kings Lynn
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/05/1950
18/10/1952
11/04/1959
25/01/1960
25/01/1960
B17/2 2821 1621 61621 21/11/1930 CAM
30A
31A
30A
31B
32B
30A
31B
W
Cambridge
Stratford
Cambridge
Stratford
March
Ipswich
Stratford
March
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/09/1950
21/04/1951
19/05/1951
23/06/1951
20/06/1953
21/11/1953
23/01/1954
10/11/1958
10/11/1958
B17/2 2822 1622 61622 30/01/1931 CAM
32D
W
Cambridge
Yarmouth South Town
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/06/1953
27/09/1958
27/09/1958
B17/2 2823 1623 61623 03/02/1931 CAM
W
Cambridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/1959
07/1959
B17/2 2824 1624 61624 09/02/1931 CAM
31B
W
Cambridge
March
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/10/1952
16/03/1953
16/03/1953
B17/2 2825 1625 61625 16/02/1931 NOR
32B
31A
W
Norwich Thorpe
Ipswich
Cambridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/06/1953
31/10/1959
03/12/1959
03/12/1959
B17/2 2826 1626 61626 04/03/1931 NOR
31C
31B
31A
W
Norwich Thorpe
Kings Lynn
March
Cambridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/12/1958
11/04/1959
12/12/1959
11/01/1960
11/01/1960
B17/2 2827 1627 61627 18/03/1931 CAM
31B
W
Cambridge
March
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/07/1954
17/07/1959
17/07/1959
B17/2 2828 1628 61628 23/03/1931 CAM
W
Cambridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/09/1952
15/09/1952
B17/2 2829 1629 61629 08/04/1931 NOR
32D
32A
32B
W
Norwich Thorpe
Yarmouth South Town
Norwich Thorpe
Ipswich
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/08/1954
25/12/1954
20/08/1955
25/09/1959
25/09/1959
B17/6 2830 1630 61630 28/04/1931 MAR
30A
31A
30A
31B
30A
31B
W
March
Stratford
Cambridge
Stratford
March
Stratford
March
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/03/1952
21/03/1953
16/05/1953
23/01/1954
24/07/1954
16/08/1958
19/08/1958
19/08/1958
B17/2 2831 1631 61631 01/05/1931 CAM
31A
30A
32B
W
Cambridge
Cambridge
Stratford
Ipswich
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/06/1952
19/07/1952
14/02/1953
10/04/1959
10/04/1959
B17/2 2832   61632 12/05/1931 COL
31A
W
Colchester
Cambridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/11/1956
02/02/1959
02/02/1959
B17/6 2833 1633 61633 28/05/1931 CAM
31B
31A
31B
W
Cambridge
March
Cambridge
March
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/05/1950
24/03/1956
15/12/1956
09/1959
09/1959
B17/6 2834 1634 61634 17/06/1931 IPS
30A
30E
30A
31A
31B
W
Ipswich
Stratford
Colchester
Stratford
Cambridge
March
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/11/1953
19/12/1953
22/05/1954
21/04/1956
14/12/1957
04/08/1958
04/08/1958
B17/6 2835 1635 61635 02/07/1931 MAR
W
March
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/01/1959
29/01/1959
B17/6 2836 1636 61636 16/07/1931 MAR
31A
32A
W
March
Cambridge
Norwich Thorpe
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/05/1950
19/07/1958
21/10/1959
21/10/1959
B17/6 2837 1637 61637 01/03/1933 CAM
32A
32B
W
Cambridge
Norwich Thorpe
Ipswich
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/06/1953
25/07/1953
24/09/1959
24/09/1959
B17/6 2838 1638 61638 02/03/1933 CAM
31B
W
Cambridge
March
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/09/1951
17/03/1958
17/03/1958
B17/2 2839 1639 61639 11/05/1933 STR
31A
W
Stratford
Cambridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/11/1956
18/05/1959
18/05/1959
B17/6 2840 1640 61640 18/05/1933 CAM
W
Cambridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/11/1958
15/11/1958
B17/6 2841 1641 61641 25/05/1933 CAM
W
Cambridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/01/1960
28/01/1960
B17/6 2842 1642 61642 05/1933 CAM
W
Cambridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/09/1958
15/09/1958
B17/6 2843 1643 61643 03/05/1935 CAM
30A
31A
31B
W
Cambridge
Stratford
Cambridge
March
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/02/1952
20/09/1952
13/12/1952
14/07/1958
14/07/1958
B17/3 2844 1644 61644 09/05/1935 NOR
31A
W
Norwich Thorpe
Cambridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/11/1956
25/11/1959
25/11/1959
B17/3 2845 1645 61645 14/06/1935 IPS
CAM
30A
30E
30A
30E
30A
31A
31B
W
Ipswich
Cambridge
Stratford
Colchester
Stratford
Colchester
Stratford
Cambridge
March
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/11/1949
21/11/1953
19/12/1953
14/05/1955
21/07/1956
22/09/1956
20/10/1956
15/12/1956
26/02/1959
26/02/1959
B17/3 2846 1646 61646 23/08/1935 MAR
30A
30E
30A
31A
31B
W
March
Stratford
Colchester
Stratford
Cambridge
March
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/02/1952
19/12/1953
22/09/1956
20/10/1956
14/12/1957
09/01/1959
09/01/1959
B17/3 2847 1647 61647 10/09/1935 LIN
31A
W
Lincoln
Cambridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/10/1959
18/11/1959
18/11/1959
B17/4 2848 1648 61648 03/03/1936 MAR
30E
30A
W
March
Colchester
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/07/1956
22/09/1956
01/12/1958
01/12/1958
B17/4 2849 1649 61649 09/03/1936 IPS
W
Ipswich
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/02/1958
10/02/1958
B17/4 2850 1650 61650 09/03/1936 CLK
WFD
30A
30E
W
Colwick
Woodford Halse
Stratford
Colchester
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/1949
23/06/1951
19/12/1953
03/09/1958
03/09/1958
B17/4 2851 1651 61651 30/03/1936 CLK
WFD
38A
30E
31A
W
Colwick
Woodford Halse
Colwick
Colchester
Cambridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/1949
20/10/1951
19/12/1953
14/02/1959
14/08/1959
14/08/1959
B17/4 2852 1652 61652 02/04/1936 CLK
31A
W
Colwick
Cambridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/12/1950
17/09/1959
17/09/1959
B17/4 2853 1653 61653 06/04/1936 CLK
31A
31B
W
Colwick
Cambridge
March
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/12/1950
14/12/1957
25/01/1960
25/01/1960
B17/4 2854 1654 61654 17/04/1936 CAM
30A
31B
30E
30A
32A
W
Cambridge
Stratford
March
Colchester
Stratford
Norwich Thorpe
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/05/1950
24/10/1953
23/07/1955
22/10/1955
19/07/1958
06/11/1959
06/11/1959
B17/6 2855 1655 61655 29/04/1936 STR
31A
30A
31A
W
Stratford
Cambridge
Stratford
Cambridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/09/1950
19/07/1952
14/02/1959
09/04/1959
09/04/1959
B17/6 2856 1656 61656 06/05/1936 MAR
31A
32A
32D
32A
31B
W
March
Cambridge
Norwich Thorpe
Yarmouth South Town
Norwich Thorpe
March
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/10/1952
20/06/1953
22/01/1955
05/09/1959
16/01/1960
27/01/1960
27/01/1960
B17/6 2857 1657 61657 15/05/1936 CLK
31A
31B
W
Colwick
Cambridge
March
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/03/1951
24/03/1956
03/06/1960
03/06/1960
B17/4 2858 1658 61658 28/05/1936 STR
31B
30E
30A
30E
30A
W
Stratford
March
Colchester
Stratford
Colchester
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/06/1951
14/05/1955
20/12/1958
14/02/1959
07/11/1959
03/12/1959
03/12/1959
B17/4 2859 1659 61659 11/06/1936 NOR
32D
32A
32D
32C
W
Norwich Thorpe
Yarmouth South Town
Norwich Thorpe
Yarmouth South Town
Lowestoft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/07/1951
16/02/1952
20/06/1953
10/01/1959
14/03/1960
14/03/1960
B17/4 2860 1660 61660 19/06/1936 MAR
30A
30E
30A
32D
32C
31B
W
March
Stratford
Colchester
Stratford
Yarmouth South Town
Lowestoft
March
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/06/1951
21/07/1956
22/09/1956
10/05/1958
10/01/1959
16/01/1960
02/06/1960
02/06/1960
B17/4 2861 1661 61661 06/1936 MAR
32A
30A
30E
30A
31A
W
March
Norwich Thorpe
Stratford
Colchester
Stratford
Cambridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/07/1951
20/10/1951
14/06/1958
11/10/1958
14/02/1959
23/07/1959
23/07/1959
B17/4 2862 1662 61662 13/01/1937 CLK
30E
30A
W
Colwick
Colchester
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/12/1953
07/11/1959
01/12/1959
01/12/1959
B17/6 2863 1663 61663 04/02/1937 CAM
30A
30E
30A
W
Cambridge
Stratford
Colchester
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/06/1953
20/12/1958
05/12/1959
20/02/1960
20/02/1960
B17/6 2864 1664 61664 15/01/1937 CLK
WFD
30A
32A
32D
32A
32D
32A
32D
32A
32D
32C
31B
W
Colwick
Woodford Halse
Stratford
Norwich Thorpe
Yarmouth South Town
Norwich Thorpe
Yarmouth South Town
Norwich Thorpe
Yarmouth South Town
Norwich Thorpe
Yarmouth South Town
Lowestoft
March
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/1949
23/06/1951
20/10/1951
16/02/1952
20/06/1953
22/01/1955
19/03/1955
23/07/1955
20/06/1959
05/09/1959
07/11/1959
16/01/1960
01/06/1960
01/06/1960
B17/6 2865 1665 61665 26/01/1937 CAM
32A
32D
32A
32D
W
Cambridge
Norwich Thorpe
Yarmouth South Town
Norwich Thorpe
Yarmouth South Town
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/07/1951
16/02/1952
20/06/1953
22/01/1955
16/04/1959
16/04/1959
B17/6 2866 1666 61666 15/02/1937 CAM
30A
31B
30A
30E
30A
W
Cambridge
Stratford
March
Stratford
Colchester
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/07/1952
21/03/1953
20/06/1953
22/05/1954
07/11/1959
07/03/1960
07/03/1960
B17/4 2867 1667 61667 15/04/1937 CLK
38A
31B
30E
30A
31A
W
Colwick
Colwick
March
Colchester
Stratford
Cambridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/10/1951
24/10/1953
19/12/1953
19/10/1957
10/05/1958
23/06/1958
23/06/1958
B17/4 2868 1668 61668 28/04/1937 IPS
30A
30E
30A
30E
30A
W
Ipswich
Stratford
Colchester
Stratford
Colchester
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/02/1953
23/07/1955
22/10/1955
20/12/1958
05/12/1959
22/08/1960
22/08/1960
B17/4 2869 1669 61669 06/05/1937 CLK
WFD
W
Colwick
Woodford Halse
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/1949
26/09/1958
26/09/1958
B17/4 2870 1670 61670 13/05/1937 NOR
IPS
32D
32A
32D
32C
W
Norwich Thorpe
Ipswich
Yarmouth South Town
Norwich Thorpe
Yarmouth South Town
Lowestoft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/1949
21/07/1951
16/02/1952
20/06/1953
07/11/1959
04/04/1960
04/04/1960
B17/4 2871   61671 11/06/1937 CAM
W
Cambridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/09/1958
22/09/1958
B17/6 2872 1672 61672 19/07/1937 MAR
30A
31B
30E
30A
32B
32C
W
March
Stratford
March
Colchester
Stratford
Ipswich
Lowestoft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/06/1951
24/10/1953
23/07/1955
22/10/1955
15/11/1958
20/06/1959
09/03/1960
09/03/1960