Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 190 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 190 Week
» 18972 Month
» 267265 Year
» 1151646 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LNER Gresley "B17" Class 4-6-0


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1600     IPS Ipswich  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1601     IPS Ipswich  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1602     IPS Ipswich  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1604     IPS Ipswich  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1605     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1606     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1608     CAM Cambridge  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1609     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1610     CAM Cambridge  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1611     CAM Cambridge  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1612     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1613     CAM Cambridge  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1618     IPS Ipswich  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1619     CAM Cambridge  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1620     CAM Cambridge  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1621     CAM Cambridge  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1622     CAM Cambridge  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1623     CAM Cambridge  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1624     CAM Cambridge  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1625     NOR Norwich Thorpe  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1626     NOR Norwich Thorpe  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1627     CAM Cambridge  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1628     CAM Cambridge  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1629     NOR Norwich Thorpe  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1630     MAR March  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1631     CAM Cambridge  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1633     CAM Cambridge  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1634     IPS Ipswich  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1635     MAR March  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1636     MAR March  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1637     CAM Cambridge  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1638     CAM Cambridge  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1640     CAM Cambridge  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1641     CAM Cambridge  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1642     CAM Cambridge  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1643     CAM Cambridge  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1644     NOR Norwich Thorpe  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1645     IPS Ipswich  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1646     MAR March  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1647     LIN Lincoln  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1648     MAR March  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1649     IPS Ipswich  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1650     CLK Colwick  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1651     CLK Colwick  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1652     CLK Colwick  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1653     CLK Colwick  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1654     CAM Cambridge  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1655     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1656     MAR March  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1657     CLK Colwick  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1658     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1659     NOR Norwich Thorpe  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1660     MAR March  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1661     MAR March  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1662     CLK Colwick  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1663     CAM Cambridge  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1664     CLK Colwick  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1665     CAM Cambridge  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1666     CAM Cambridge  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1667     CLK Colwick  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1668     IPS Ipswich  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1669     CLK Colwick  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1670     NOR Norwich Thorpe  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1672     MAR March  
07/1949 Reallocation 61609 STR Stratford YAR Yarmouth South Town  
07/1949 Reallocation 61650 CLK Colwick WFD Woodford Halse  
07/1949 Reallocation 61651 CLK Colwick WFD Woodford Halse  
07/1949 Reallocation 1664 CLK Colwick WFD Woodford Halse  
07/1949 Reallocation 1669 CLK Colwick WFD Woodford Halse  
07/1949 Reallocation 61670 NOR Norwich Thorpe IPS Ipswich  
30/11/1949 Reallocation 61645 IPS Ipswich CAM Cambridge  
31/05/1950 Reallocation 61620 CAM Cambridge 31A Cambridge  
31/05/1950 Reallocation 61633 CAM Cambridge 31B March  
31/05/1950 Reallocation 61636 MAR March 31A Cambridge  
31/05/1950 Reallocation 61654 CAM Cambridge 30A Stratford  
23/09/1950 Reallocation 61621 CAM Cambridge 30A Stratford  
23/09/1950 Reallocation 61655 STR Stratford 31A Cambridge  
23/12/1950 Reallocation 61652 CLK Colwick 31A Cambridge  
23/12/1950 Reallocation 61653 CLK Colwick 31A Cambridge  
24/03/1951 Reallocation 61657 CLK Colwick 31A Cambridge  
21/04/1951 Reallocation 61621 30A Stratford 31A Cambridge  
19/05/1951 Reallocation 61621 31A Cambridge 30A Stratford  
23/06/1951 Reallocation 61621 30A Stratford 31B March  
23/06/1951 Reallocation 61650 WFD Woodford Halse 30A Stratford  
23/06/1951 Reallocation 61658 STR Stratford 31B March  
23/06/1951 Reallocation 61660 MAR March 30A Stratford  
23/06/1951 Reallocation 61664 WFD Woodford Halse 30A Stratford  
23/06/1951 Reallocation 61672 MAR March 30A Stratford  
21/07/1951 Reallocation 61659 NOR Norwich Thorpe 32D Yarmouth South Town  
21/07/1951 Reallocation 61661 MAR March 32A Norwich Thorpe  
21/07/1951 Reallocation 61665 CAM Cambridge 32A Norwich Thorpe  
21/07/1951 Reallocation 61670 IPS Ipswich 32D Yarmouth South Town  
22/09/1951 Reallocation 61638 CAM Cambridge 31B March  
20/10/1951 Reallocation 61651 WFD Woodford Halse 38A Colwick  
20/10/1951 Reallocation 61661 32A Norwich Thorpe 30A Stratford  
20/10/1951 Reallocation 61664 30A Stratford 32A Norwich Thorpe  
20/10/1951 Reallocation 61667 CLK Colwick 38A Colwick  
16/02/1952 Reallocation 61643 CAM Cambridge 30A Stratford  
16/02/1952 Reallocation 61646 MAR March 30A Stratford  
16/02/1952 Reallocation 61659 32D Yarmouth South Town 32A Norwich Thorpe  
16/02/1952 Reallocation 61664 32A Norwich Thorpe 32D Yarmouth South Town  
16/02/1952 Reallocation 61665 32A Norwich Thorpe 32D Yarmouth South Town  
16/02/1952 Reallocation 61670 32D Yarmouth South Town 32A Norwich Thorpe  
22/03/1952 Reallocation 61605 STR Stratford 31B March  
22/03/1952 Reallocation 61630 MAR March 30A Stratford  
21/06/1952 Reallocation 61631 CAM Cambridge 31A Cambridge  
19/07/1952 Reallocation 61604 IPS Ipswich 30A Stratford  
19/07/1952 Reallocation 61631 31A Cambridge 30A Stratford  
19/07/1952 Reallocation 61655 31A Cambridge 30A Stratford  
19/07/1952 Reallocation 61666 CAM Cambridge 30A Stratford  
15/09/1952 Condemned 61628 CAM Cambridge   COND  
20/09/1952 Reallocation 61605 31B March 30A Stratford  
20/09/1952 Reallocation 61643 30A Stratford 31A Cambridge  
18/10/1952 Reallocation 61619 CAM Cambridge 31B March  
18/10/1952 Reallocation 61620 31A Cambridge 31B March  
18/10/1952 Reallocation 61624 CAM Cambridge 31B March  
18/10/1952 Reallocation 61656 MAR March 31A Cambridge  
13/12/1952 Reallocation 61643 31A Cambridge 31B March  
14/02/1953 Reallocation 61600 IPS Ipswich 30A Stratford  
14/02/1953 Reallocation 61601 IPS Ipswich 30A Stratford  
14/02/1953 Reallocation 61609 YAR Yarmouth South Town 30A Stratford  
14/02/1953 Reallocation 61631 30A Stratford 32B Ipswich  
14/02/1953 Reallocation 61668 IPS Ipswich 30A Stratford  
16/03/1953 Condemned 61624 31B March   COND  
21/03/1953 Reallocation 61630 30A Stratford 31A Cambridge  
21/03/1953 Reallocation 61666 30A Stratford 31B March  
16/05/1953 Reallocation 61630 31A Cambridge 30A Stratford  
20/06/1953 Reallocation 61621 31B March 32B Ipswich  
20/06/1953 Reallocation 61622 CAM Cambridge 32D Yarmouth South Town  
20/06/1953 Reallocation 61625 NOR Norwich Thorpe 32B Ipswich  
20/06/1953 Reallocation 61637 CAM Cambridge 32A Norwich Thorpe  
20/06/1953 Reallocation 61656 31A Cambridge 32A Norwich Thorpe  
20/06/1953 Reallocation 61659 32A Norwich Thorpe 32D Yarmouth South Town  
20/06/1953 Reallocation 61663 CAM Cambridge 30A Stratford  
20/06/1953 Reallocation 61664 32D Yarmouth South Town 32A Norwich Thorpe  
20/06/1953 Reallocation 61665 32D Yarmouth South Town 32A Norwich Thorpe  
20/06/1953 Reallocation 61666 31B March 30A Stratford  
20/06/1953 Reallocation 61670 32A Norwich Thorpe 32D Yarmouth South Town  
25/07/1953 Reallocation 61637 32A Norwich Thorpe 32B Ipswich  
24/08/1953 Condemned 61604 30A Stratford   COND  
24/10/1953 Reallocation 61654 30A Stratford 31B March  
24/10/1953 Reallocation 61667 38A Colwick 31B March  
24/10/1953 Reallocation 61672 30A Stratford 31B March  
21/11/1953 Reallocation 61618 IPS Ipswich 30A Stratford  
21/11/1953 Reallocation 61621 32B Ipswich 30A Stratford  
21/11/1953 Reallocation 61634 IPS Ipswich 30A Stratford  
21/11/1953 Reallocation 61645 CAM Cambridge 30A Stratford  
19/12/1953 Reallocation 61634 30A Stratford 30E Colchester  
19/12/1953 Reallocation 61645 30A Stratford 30E Colchester  
19/12/1953 Reallocation 61646 30A Stratford 30E Colchester  
19/12/1953 Reallocation 61650 30A Stratford 30E Colchester  
19/12/1953 Reallocation 61651 38A Colwick 30E Colchester  
19/12/1953 Reallocation 61662 CLK Colwick 30E Colchester  
19/12/1953 Reallocation 61667 31B March 30E Colchester  
23/01/1954 Reallocation 61618 30A Stratford 32B Ipswich  
23/01/1954 Reallocation 61621 30A Stratford 31B March  
23/01/1954 Reallocation 61630 30A Stratford 31B March  
22/05/1954 Reallocation 61634 30E Colchester 30A Stratford  
22/05/1954 Reallocation 61666 30A Stratford 30E Colchester  
24/07/1954 Reallocation 61627 CAM Cambridge 31B March  
24/07/1954 Reallocation 61630 31B March 30A Stratford  
21/08/1954 Reallocation 61629 NOR Norwich Thorpe 32D Yarmouth South Town  
25/12/1954 Reallocation 61629 32D Yarmouth South Town 32A Norwich Thorpe  
22/01/1955 Reallocation 61656 32A Norwich Thorpe 32D Yarmouth South Town  
22/01/1955 Reallocation 61664 32A Norwich Thorpe 32D Yarmouth South Town  
22/01/1955 Reallocation 61665 32A Norwich Thorpe 32D Yarmouth South Town  
19/03/1955 Reallocation 61664 32D Yarmouth South Town 32A Norwich Thorpe  
14/05/1955 Reallocation 61645 30E Colchester 30A Stratford  
14/05/1955 Reallocation 61658 31B March 30E Colchester  
23/07/1955 Reallocation 61654 31B March 30E Colchester  
23/07/1955 Reallocation 61664 32A Norwich Thorpe 32D Yarmouth South Town  
23/07/1955 Reallocation 61668 30A Stratford 30E Colchester  
23/07/1955 Reallocation 61672 31B March 30E Colchester  
20/08/1955 Reallocation 61629 32A Norwich Thorpe 32B Ipswich  
22/10/1955 Reallocation 61654 30E Colchester 30A Stratford  
22/10/1955 Reallocation 61668 30E Colchester 30A Stratford  
22/10/1955 Reallocation 61672 30E Colchester 30A Stratford  
24/03/1956 Reallocation 61633 31B March 31A Cambridge  
24/03/1956 Reallocation 61657 31A Cambridge 31B March  
21/04/1956 Reallocation 61634 30A Stratford 31A Cambridge  
21/07/1956 Reallocation 61645 30A Stratford 30E Colchester  
21/07/1956 Reallocation 61648 MAR March 30E Colchester  
21/07/1956 Reallocation 61660 30A Stratford 30E Colchester  
22/09/1956 Reallocation 61645 30E Colchester 30A Stratford  
22/09/1956 Reallocation 61646 30E Colchester 30A Stratford  
22/09/1956 Reallocation 61648 30E Colchester 30A Stratford  
22/09/1956 Reallocation 61660 30E Colchester 30A Stratford  
20/10/1956 Reallocation 61645 30A Stratford 31A Cambridge  
20/10/1956 Reallocation 61646 30A Stratford 31A Cambridge  
17/11/1956 Reallocation 61606 STR Stratford 30E Colchester  
17/11/1956 Reallocation 61608 CAM Cambridge 30E Colchester  
17/11/1956 Reallocation 61611 CAM Cambridge 30E Colchester  
15/12/1956 Reallocation 61633 31A Cambridge 31B March  
15/12/1956 Reallocation 61645 31A Cambridge 31B March  
19/01/1957 Reallocation 61600 30A Stratford 31A Cambridge  
19/01/1957 Reallocation 61601 30A Stratford 31A Cambridge  
19/01/1957 Reallocation 61602 IPS Ipswich 32D Yarmouth South Town  
19/01/1957 Reallocation 61606 30E Colchester 30A Stratford  
19/01/1957 Reallocation 61608 30E Colchester 30A Stratford  
19/01/1957 Reallocation 61611 30E Colchester 32B Ipswich  
20/07/1957 Reallocation 61600 31A Cambridge 30A Stratford  
20/07/1957 Reallocation 61601 31A Cambridge 30A Stratford  
19/10/1957 Reallocation 61667 30E Colchester 30A Stratford  
14/12/1957 Reallocation 61634 31A Cambridge 31B March  
14/12/1957 Reallocation 61646 31A Cambridge 31B March  
14/12/1957 Reallocation 61653 31A Cambridge 31B March  
13/01/1958 Condemned 61601 30A Stratford   COND  
13/01/1958 Condemned 61602 32D Yarmouth South Town   COND  
10/02/1958 Condemned 61649 IPS Ipswich   COND  
17/03/1958 Condemned 61638 31B March   COND  
10/05/1958 Reallocation 61609 30A Stratford 32B Ipswich  
10/05/1958 Reallocation 61610 CAM Cambridge 31B March  
10/05/1958 Reallocation 61660 30A Stratford 32D Yarmouth South Town  
10/05/1958 Reallocation 61667 30A Stratford 31A Cambridge  
15/05/1958 Condemned 61605 30A Stratford   COND  
14/06/1958 Reallocation 61606 30A Stratford 30E Colchester  
14/06/1958 Reallocation 61608 30A Stratford 30E Colchester  
14/06/1958 Reallocation 61612 STR Stratford 30E Colchester  
14/06/1958 Reallocation 61613 CAM Cambridge 30E Colchester  
14/06/1958 Reallocation 61661 30A Stratford 30E Colchester  
23/06/1958 Condemned 61609 32B Ipswich   COND  
23/06/1958 Condemned 61667 31A Cambridge   COND  
14/07/1958 Condemned 61643 31B March   COND  
19/07/1958 Reallocation 61636 31A Cambridge 32A Norwich Thorpe  
19/07/1958 Reallocation 61654 30A Stratford 32A Norwich Thorpe  
28/07/1958 Condemned 61600 30A Stratford   COND  
04/08/1958 Condemned 61634 31B March   COND  
16/08/1958 Reallocation 61612 30E Colchester 32B Ipswich  
16/08/1958 Reallocation 61630 30A Stratford 31B March  
19/08/1958 Condemned 61630 31B March   COND  
01/09/1958 Condemned 61606 30E Colchester   COND  
03/09/1958 Condemned 61650 30E Colchester   COND  
15/09/1958 Condemned 61642 CAM Cambridge   COND  
19/09/1958 Condemned 61619 31B March   COND  
26/09/1958 Condemned 61669 WFD Woodford Halse   COND  
27/09/1958 Condemned 61622 32D Yarmouth South Town   COND  
11/10/1958 Reallocation 61613 30E Colchester 30A Stratford  
11/10/1958 Reallocation 61661 30E Colchester 30A Stratford  
10/11/1958 Condemned 61621 31B March   COND  
15/11/1958 Condemned 61640 CAM Cambridge   COND  
15/11/1958 Reallocation 61672 30A Stratford 32B Ipswich  
01/12/1958 Condemned 61648 30A Stratford   COND  
06/12/1958 Reallocation 61626 NOR Norwich Thorpe 31C Kings Lynn  
20/12/1958 Reallocation 61608 30E Colchester 31A Cambridge  
20/12/1958 Reallocation 61658 30E Colchester 30A Stratford  
20/12/1958 Reallocation 61663 30A Stratford 30E Colchester  
20/12/1958 Reallocation 61668 30A Stratford 30E Colchester  
09/01/1959 Condemned 61646 31B March   COND  
10/01/1959 Reallocation 61659 32D Yarmouth South Town 32C Lowestoft  
10/01/1959 Reallocation 61660 32D Yarmouth South Town 32C Lowestoft  
29/01/1959 Condemned 61635 MAR March   COND  
14/02/1959 Reallocation 61613 30A Stratford 31A Cambridge  
14/02/1959 Reallocation 61651 30E Colchester 31A Cambridge  
14/02/1959 Reallocation 61655 30A Stratford 31A Cambridge  
14/02/1959 Reallocation 61658 30A Stratford 30E Colchester  
14/02/1959 Reallocation 61661 30A Stratford 31A Cambridge  
26/02/1959 Condemned 61645 31B March   COND  
09/04/1959 Condemned 61655 31A Cambridge   COND  
10/04/1959 Condemned 61631 32B Ipswich   COND  
11/04/1959 Reallocation 61620 31B March 31C Kings Lynn  
11/04/1959 Reallocation 61626 31C Kings Lynn 31B March  
16/04/1959 Condemned 61665 32D Yarmouth South Town   COND  
20/06/1959 Reallocation 61664 32D Yarmouth South Town 32A Norwich Thorpe  
20/06/1959 Reallocation 61672 32B Ipswich 32C Lowestoft  
07/1959 Condemned 61623 CAM Cambridge   COND  
17/07/1959 Condemned 61627 31B March   COND  
23/07/1959 Condemned 61661 31A Cambridge   COND  
01/08/1959 Reallocation 61611 32B Ipswich 32A Norwich Thorpe  
14/08/1959 Condemned 61651 31A Cambridge   COND  
09/1959 Condemned 61633 31B March   COND  
05/09/1959 Reallocation 61656 32D Yarmouth South Town 32A Norwich Thorpe  
05/09/1959 Reallocation 61664 32A Norwich Thorpe 32D Yarmouth South Town  
17/09/1959 Condemned 61652 31A Cambridge   COND  
24/09/1959 Condemned 61637 32B Ipswich   COND  
25/09/1959 Condemned 61629 32B Ipswich   COND  
29/09/1959 Condemned 61612 32B Ipswich   COND  
14/10/1959 Condemned 61611 32A Norwich Thorpe   COND  
21/10/1959 Condemned 61636 32A Norwich Thorpe   COND  
31/10/1959 Reallocation 61618 32B Ipswich 31A Cambridge  
31/10/1959 Reallocation 61625 32B Ipswich 31A Cambridge  
31/10/1959 Reallocation 61647 LIN Lincoln 31A Cambridge  
06/11/1959 Condemned 61654 32A Norwich Thorpe   COND  
07/11/1959 Reallocation 61658 30E Colchester 30A Stratford  
07/11/1959 Reallocation 61662 30E Colchester 30A Stratford  
07/11/1959 Reallocation 61664 32D Yarmouth South Town 32C Lowestoft  
07/11/1959 Reallocation 61666 30E Colchester 30A Stratford  
07/11/1959 Reallocation 61670 32D Yarmouth South Town 32C Lowestoft  
18/11/1959 Condemned 61647 31A Cambridge   COND  
01/12/1959 Condemned 61662 30A Stratford   COND  
03/12/1959 Condemned 61625 31A Cambridge   COND  
03/12/1959 Condemned 61658 30A Stratford   COND  
05/12/1959 Reallocation 61663 30E Colchester 30A Stratford  
05/12/1959 Reallocation 61668 30E Colchester 30A Stratford  
12/12/1959 Reallocation 61610 31B March 31A Cambridge  
12/12/1959 Reallocation 61626 31B March 31A Cambridge  
18/12/1959 Condemned 61613 31A Cambridge   COND  
11/01/1960 Condemned 61610 31A Cambridge   COND  
11/01/1960 Condemned 61626 31A Cambridge   COND  
16/01/1960 Reallocation 61656 32A Norwich Thorpe 31B March  
16/01/1960 Reallocation 61660 32C Lowestoft 31B March  
16/01/1960 Reallocation 61664 32C Lowestoft 31B March  
23/01/1960 Condemned 61618 31A Cambridge   COND  
25/01/1960 Condemned 61620 31C Kings Lynn   COND  
25/01/1960 Condemned 61653 31B March   COND  
27/01/1960 Condemned 61656 31B March   COND  
28/01/1960 Condemned 61641 CAM Cambridge   COND  
20/02/1960 Condemned 61663 30A Stratford   COND  
07/03/1960 Condemned 61666 30A Stratford   COND  
09/03/1960 Condemned 61672 32C Lowestoft   COND  
14/03/1960 Condemned 61608 31A Cambridge   COND  
14/03/1960 Condemned 61659 32C Lowestoft   COND  
04/04/1960 Condemned 61670 32C Lowestoft   COND  
01/06/1960 Condemned 61664 31B March   COND  
02/06/1960 Condemned 61660 31B March   COND  
03/06/1960 Condemned 61657 31B March   COND  
22/08/1960 Condemned 61668 30A Stratford   COND