Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 581 Today
» 862 Yesterday
» 4129 Week
» 5019 Month
» 313000 Year
» 1197381 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LNER Gresley "B17" Class 4-6-0


LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Rebuilt To Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
2810 1610 61610 22/08/1930 11/01/1960 Cambridge 29.42 29.42
2811 1611 61611 22/08/1930 14/10/1959 Norwich Thorpe 29.17 29.17
2812 1612 61612 22/10/1930 29/09/1959 Ipswich 28.92 29.00
2813 1613 61613 22/10/1930 18/12/1959 Cambridge 29.17 29.17
2814 61614 23/10/1930 08/06/1959 11/1946
to B2
Cambridge 28.67 28.66
2815 61615 29/10/1930 09/02/1959 04/1946
to B2
Cambridge 28.33 28.32
2816 61616 10/1930 07/09/1959 11/1945
to B2
Cambridge 28.92 28.94
2817 1617 61617 10/1930 11/08/1958 12/1946
to B2
Cambridge 27.83 27.85
2818 1618 61618 05/11/1930 23/01/1960 Cambridge 29.17 29.21
2819 1619 61619 08/11/1930 19/09/1958 March 27.83 27.87
2820 1620 61620 12/11/1930 25/01/1960 Kings Lynn 29.17 29.19
2821 1621 61621 21/11/1930 10/11/1958 March 28 28.00
2822 1622 61622 30/01/1931 27/09/1958 Yarmouth South Town 27.67 27.64
2823 1623 61623 03/02/1931 07/1959 Cambridge 28.42 28.59
2824 1624 61624 09/02/1931 16/03/1953 March 22.08 22.11
2825 1625 61625 16/02/1931 03/12/1959 Cambridge 28.83 28.85
2826 1626 61626 04/03/1931 11/01/1960 Cambridge 28.83 28.89
2827 1627 61627 18/03/1931 17/07/1959 March 28.33 28.35
2828 1628 61628 23/03/1931 15/09/1952 Cambridge 21.5 21.50
2829 1629 61629 08/04/1931 25/09/1959 Ipswich 28.42 28.46
2830 1630 61630 28/04/1931 19/08/1958 March 27.33 27.32
2831 1631 61631 01/05/1931 10/04/1959 Ipswich 27.92 27.98
2832 61632 12/05/1931 02/02/1959 07/1946
to B2
Cambridge 27.75 27.78
2833 1633 61633 28/05/1931 09/1959 March 28.33 28.40
2834 1634 61634 17/06/1931 04/08/1958 March 27.17 27.18
2835 1635 61635 02/07/1931 29/01/1959 March 27.5 27.64
2836 1636 61636 16/07/1931 21/10/1959 Norwich Thorpe 28.25 28.27
2837 1637 61637 01/03/1933 24/09/1959 Ipswich 26.5 26.56
2838 1638 61638 02/03/1933 17/03/1958 March 25 25.05
2839 1639 61639 11/05/1933 18/05/1959 01/1946
to B2
Cambridge 26 26.03
2840 1640 61640 18/05/1933 15/11/1958 Cambridge 25.5 25.51
2841 1641 61641 25/05/1933 28/01/1960 March 26.67 26.66
2842 1642 61642 05/1933 15/09/1958 Cambridge 25.33 25.35