Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 340 Today
» 988 Yesterday
» 4471 Week
» 14641 Month
» 292437 Year
» 1176818 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LNER Gresley "B17" Class 4-6-0


Pre Grouping Big 4 BR Build Date Rebuild Rebuild Date Notes
  2803 61603 13/12/1928 Rebuilt from B17 to B2 10/1946  
2807
1607
61607 21/12/1928 Rebuilt from B17 to B2 05/1947  
2814 61614 23/10/1930 Rebuilt from B17 to B2 11/1946  
2815 61615 29/10/1930 Rebuilt from B17 to B2 04/1946  
2816 61616 10/1930 Rebuilt from B17 to B2 11/1945  
2817
1617
61617 10/1930 Rebuilt from B17 to B2 12/1946  
2832 61632 12/05/1931 Rebuilt from B17 to B2 07/1946  
2839
1639
61639 11/05/1933 Rebuilt from B17 to B2 01/1946  
2844
1644
61644 09/05/1935 Rebuilt from B17 to B2 03/1949  
2871 61671 11/06/1937 Rebuilt from B17 to B2 08/1945