Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 230 Today
» 839 Yesterday
» 230 Week
» 18551 Month
» 106743 Year
» 991124 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GNR/LNER Ivatt "C1" Class 4-4-2


Old Number Company Old Num Type New Number Company New Num Type Date
      4300 LNER BIG4   1824
293 GNR PRG 293N LNER BIG4   11/08/1923
1430 GNR PRG 1430N LNER BIG4   18/08/1923
283 GNR PRG 283N LNER BIG4   25/08/1923
281 GNR PRG 281N LNER BIG4   01/09/1923
1413 GNR PRG 1413N LNER BIG4   08/09/1923
1414 GNR PRG 1414N LNER BIG4   22/09/1923
297 GNR PRG 297N LNER BIG4   22/09/1923
273 GNR PRG 273N LNER BIG4   22/09/1923
1427 GNR PRG 1427N LNER BIG4   06/10/1923
276 GNR PRG 276N LNER BIG4   06/10/1923
1432 GNR PRG 1432N LNER BIG4   03/11/1923
1448 GNR PRG 1448N LNER BIG4   10/11/1923
1416 GNR PRG 1416N LNER BIG4   24/11/1923
251 GNR PRG 251N LNER BIG4   22/12/1923
1455 GNR PRG 1455N LNER BIG4   12/01/1924
1446 GNR PRG 1446N LNER BIG4   26/01/1924
299 GNR PRG 299N LNER BIG4   02/02/1924
275 GNR PRG 3275 LNER BIG4   23/02/1924
280 GNR PRG 3280 LNER BIG4   01/03/1924
1435 GNR PRG 4435 LNER BIG4   01/03/1924
1431 GNR PRG 4431 LNER BIG4   22/03/1924
292 GNR PRG 3292 LNER BIG4   05/04/1924
1424 GNR PRG 4424 LNER BIG4   10/04/1924
1426 GNR PRG 4426 LNER BIG4   14/04/1924
1411 GNR PRG 4411 LNER BIG4   29/04/1924
1458 GNR PRG 4458 LNER BIG4   03/05/1924
284 GNR PRG 3284 LNER BIG4   03/05/1924
1454 GNR PRG 4454 LNER BIG4   03/05/1924
1419 GNR PRG 4419 LNER BIG4   03/05/1924
1407 GNR PRG 4407 LNER BIG4   03/05/1924
278 GNR PRG 3278 LNER BIG4   03/05/1924
1461 GNR PRG 4461 LNER BIG4   10/05/1924
1453 GNR PRG 4453 LNER BIG4   10/05/1924
285 GNR PRG 3285 LNER BIG4   17/05/1924
1439 GNR PRG 4439 LNER BIG4   17/05/1924
1410 GNR PRG 4410 LNER BIG4   24/05/1924
300 GNR PRG 3300 LNER BIG4   24/05/1924
286 GNR PRG 3286 LNER BIG4   24/05/1924
290 GNR PRG 3290 LNER BIG4   31/05/1924
294 GNR PRG 3294 LNER BIG4   31/05/1924
1406 GNR PRG 4406 LNER BIG4   31/05/1924
282 GNR PRG 3282 LNER BIG4   31/05/1924
1457 GNR PRG 4457 LNER BIG4   07/06/1924
1436 GNR PRG 4436 LNER BIG4   07/06/1924
1428 GNR PRG 4428 LNER BIG4   14/06/1924
1417 GNR PRG 4417 LNER BIG4   14/06/1924
1403 GNR PRG 4403 LNER BIG4   21/06/1924
289 GNR PRG 3289 LNER BIG4   28/06/1924
1401 GNR PRG 4401 LNER BIG4   28/06/1924
1402 GNR PRG 4402 LNER BIG4   28/06/1924
1409 GNR PRG 4409 LNER BIG4   28/06/1924
301 GNR PRG 3301 LNER BIG4   05/07/1924
281N LNER BIG4 3281 LNER BIG4   05/07/1924
1429 GNR PRG 4429 LNER BIG4   05/07/1924
1425 GNR PRG 4425 LNER BIG4   12/07/1924
288 GNR PRG 3288 LNER BIG4   12/07/1924
1404 GNR PRG 4404 LNER BIG4   19/07/1924
1460 GNR PRG 4460 LNER BIG4   25/07/1924
291 GNR PRG 3291 LNER BIG4   26/07/1924
1437 GNR PRG 4437 LNER BIG4   26/07/1924
1412 GNR PRG 4412 LNER BIG4   02/08/1924
279 GNR PRG 3279 LNER BIG4   02/08/1924
1442 GNR PRG 4442 LNER BIG4   23/08/1924
1449 GNR PRG 4449 LNER BIG4   23/08/1924
1400 GNR PRG 4400 LNER BIG4   23/08/1924
1408 GNR PRG 4408 LNER BIG4   26/08/1924
1451 GNR PRG 4451 LNER BIG4   30/08/1924
1445 GNR PRG 4445 LNER BIG4   30/08/1924
1432N LNER BIG4 4432 LNER BIG4   30/08/1924
293N LNER BIG4 3293 LNER BIG4   20/09/1924
1438 GNR PRG 4438 LNER BIG4   11/10/1924
1422 GNR PRG 4422 LNER BIG4   18/10/1924
1423 GNR PRG 4423 LNER BIG4   24/10/1924
1450 GNR PRG 4450 LNER BIG4   01/11/1924
1440 GNR PRG 4440 LNER BIG4   08/11/1924
1430N LNER BIG4 4430 LNER BIG4   15/11/1924
1420 GNR PRG 4420 LNER BIG4   12/12/1924
1452 GNR PRG 4452 LNER BIG4   20/12/1924
1414N LNER BIG4 4414 LNER BIG4   20/12/1924
283N LNER BIG4 3283 LNER BIG4   30/12/1924
1418 GNR PRG 4418 LNER BIG4   17/01/1925
1416N LNER BIG4 4416 LNER BIG4   24/01/1925
1405 GNR PRG 4405 LNER BIG4   24/01/1925
276N LNER BIG4 3276 LNER BIG4   16/02/1925
298 GNR PRG 3298 LNER BIG4   16/02/1925
296 GNR PRG 3296 LNER BIG4   17/02/1925
251N LNER BIG4 3251 LNER BIG4   07/03/1925
1443 GNR PRG 4443 LNER BIG4   14/03/1925
295 GNR PRG 3295 LNER BIG4   28/03/1925
1421 GNR PRG 4421 LNER BIG4   04/04/1925
274 GNR PRG 3274 LNER BIG4   04/04/1925
1459 GNR PRG 4459 LNER BIG4   02/05/1925
273N LNER BIG4 3273 LNER BIG4   02/05/1925
1434 GNR PRG 4434 LNER BIG4   09/05/1925
277 GNR PRG 3277 LNER BIG4   16/05/1925
287 GNR PRG 3287 LNER BIG4   23/05/1925
299N LNER BIG4 3299 LNER BIG4   06/06/1925
1448N LNER BIG4 4448 LNER BIG4   06/06/1925
1455N LNER BIG4 4455 LNER BIG4   07/1925
272 GNR PRG 3272 LNER BIG4   04/07/1925
297N LNER BIG4 3297 LNER BIG4   11/07/1925
1444 GNR PRG 4444 LNER BIG4   18/07/1925
1441 GNR PRG 4441 LNER BIG4   18/07/1925
1456 GNR PRG 4456 LNER BIG4   18/07/1925
1433 GNR PRG 4433 LNER BIG4   25/07/1925
1415 GNR PRG 4415 LNER BIG4   25/07/1925
1413N LNER BIG4 4413 LNER BIG4   15/08/1925
1427N LNER BIG4 4427 LNER BIG4   28/11/1925
1447 GNR PRG 4447 LNER BIG4   18/12/1925
1446N LNER BIG4 4446 LNER BIG4   26/07/1926
3274 LNER BIG4 2803 LNER BIG4   1946
3287 LNER BIG4 2816 LNER BIG4   1946
4434 LNER BIG4 2864 LNER BIG4   1946
4406 LNER BIG4 2836 LNER BIG4   1946
3275 LNER BIG4 2804 LNER BIG4   1946
4435 LNER BIG4 2865 LNER BIG4   1946
4407 LNER BIG4 2837 LNER BIG4   1946
4414 LNER BIG4 2844 LNER BIG4   1946
4408 LNER BIG4 2838 LNER BIG4   1946
3276 LNER BIG4 2805 LNER BIG4   1946
4437 LNER BIG4 2867 LNER BIG4   1946
3277 LNER BIG4 2806 LNER BIG4   1946
4430 LNER BIG4 2860 LNER BIG4   1946
3298 LNER BIG4 2826 LNER BIG4   1946
4431 LNER BIG4 2861 LNER BIG4   1946
3278 LNER BIG4 2807 LNER BIG4   1946
4448 LNER BIG4 2878 LNER BIG4   1946
4413 LNER BIG4 2843 LNER BIG4   1946
4427 LNER BIG4 2857 LNER BIG4   1946
4457 LNER BIG4 2887 LNER BIG4   1946
4428 LNER BIG4 2858 LNER BIG4   1946
3296 LNER BIG4 2824 LNER BIG4   1946
4450 LNER BIG4 2880 LNER BIG4   1946
3289 LNER BIG4 2818 LNER BIG4   1946
4444 LNER BIG4 2874 LNER BIG4   1946
4422 LNER BIG4 2852 LNER BIG4   1946
4459 LNER BIG4 2889 LNER BIG4   1946
3290 LNER BIG4 2819 LNER BIG4   1946
4452 LNER BIG4 2882 LNER BIG4   1946
4460 LNER BIG4 2890 LNER BIG4   1946
3291 LNER BIG4 2820 LNER BIG4   1946
4416 LNER BIG4 2846 LNER BIG4   1946
4461 LNER BIG4 2891 LNER BIG4   1946
3284 LNER BIG4 2813 LNER BIG4   1946
4417 LNER BIG4 2847 LNER BIG4   1946
3299 LNER BIG4 2827 LNER BIG4   1946
3285 LNER BIG4 2814 LNER BIG4   1946
4432 LNER BIG4 2862 LNER BIG4   1946
4418 LNER BIG4 2848 LNER BIG4   1946
4426 LNER BIG4 2856 LNER BIG4   1946
4433 LNER BIG4 2863 LNER BIG4   1946
3280 LNER BIG4 2809 LNER BIG4   1946
4443 LNER BIG4 2873 LNER BIG4   20/01/1946
3297 LNER BIG4 2825 LNER BIG4   26/01/1946
4438 LNER BIG4 2868 LNER BIG4   26/01/1946
4442 LNER BIG4 2872 LNER BIG4   03/02/1946
3288 LNER BIG4 2817 LNER BIG4   17/02/1946
3282 LNER BIG4 2811 LNER BIG4   17/02/1946
3279 LNER BIG4 2808 LNER BIG4   17/02/1946
4441 LNER BIG4 2871 LNER BIG4   17/02/1946
4436 LNER BIG4 2866 LNER BIG4   18/02/1946
4439 LNER BIG4 2869 LNER BIG4   03/03/1946
4440 LNER BIG4 2870 LNER BIG4   10/03/1946
4451 LNER BIG4 2881 LNER BIG4   12/06/1946
4454 LNER BIG4 2884 LNER BIG4   07/07/1946
4453 LNER BIG4 2883 LNER BIG4   07/07/1946
4446 LNER BIG4 2876 LNER BIG4   14/07/1946
4447 LNER BIG4 2877 LNER BIG4   21/07/1946
4455 LNER BIG4 2885 LNER BIG4   21/07/1946
4456 LNER BIG4 2886 LNER BIG4   27/07/1946
4445 LNER BIG4 2875 LNER BIG4   18/08/1946
4449 LNER BIG4 2879 LNER BIG4   31/08/1946
4458 LNER BIG4 2888 LNER BIG4   31/08/1946
4409 LNER BIG4 2839 LNER BIG4   05/09/1946
4411 LNER BIG4 2841 LNER BIG4   14/09/1946
4404 LNER BIG4 2834 LNER BIG4   14/09/1946
4410 LNER BIG4 2840 LNER BIG4   21/09/1946
4402 LNER BIG4 2832 LNER BIG4   22/09/1946
4415 LNER BIG4 2845 LNER BIG4   28/09/1946
4421 LNER BIG4 2851 LNER BIG4   29/09/1946
4400 LNER BIG4 2830 LNER BIG4   29/09/1946
3272 LNER BIG4 2801 LNER BIG4   06/10/1946
4401 LNER BIG4 2831 LNER BIG4   06/10/1946
4403 LNER BIG4 2833 LNER BIG4   06/10/1946
4412 LNER BIG4 2842 LNER BIG4   06/10/1946
4405 LNER BIG4 2835 LNER BIG4   16/10/1946
4429 LNER BIG4 2859 LNER BIG4   26/10/1946
4420 LNER BIG4 2850 LNER BIG4   10/11/1946
4425 LNER BIG4 2855 LNER BIG4   10/11/1946
3294 LNER BIG4 2822 LNER BIG4   10/11/1946
3300 LNER BIG4 2828 LNER BIG4   11/11/1946
3283 LNER BIG4 2812 LNER BIG4   12/11/1946
4419 LNER BIG4 2849 LNER BIG4   16/11/1946
3301 LNER BIG4 2829 LNER BIG4   17/11/1946
4423 LNER BIG4 2853 LNER BIG4   17/11/1946
4424 LNER BIG4 2854 LNER BIG4   17/11/1946
3281 LNER BIG4 2810 LNER BIG4   26/11/1946
3295 LNER BIG4 2823 LNER BIG4   29/11/1946
3293 LNER BIG4 2821 LNER BIG4   29/11/1946
3273 LNER BIG4 2802 LNER BIG4   11/12/1946
3251 LNER BIG4 2800 LNER BIG4   13/12/1946
3286 LNER BIG4 2815 LNER BIG4   01/01/1947
2829 LNER BIG4 62829 BR BR   1948
2810 LNER BIG4 62810 BR BR   1948
2828 LNER BIG4 62828 BR BR   1948
2849 LNER BIG4 62849 BR BR   1948
2817 LNER BIG4 62817 BR BR   1948
2839 LNER BIG4 62839 BR BR   1948
2808 LNER BIG4 62808 BR BR   1948
2877 LNER BIG4 E2877 BR BR   10/03/1948
2885 LNER BIG4 62885 BR BR   06/05/1948
2822 LNER BIG4 62822 BR BR   16/02/1949