Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 215 Today
» 1073 Yesterday
» 215 Week
» 11786 Month
» 260079 Year
» 1144460 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GCR/LNER Robinson "C4" Class 4-4-2


Class GCR LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
C4/2 192 5192 2900 62900 12/1903 BOS
W
Boston
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/11/1950
09/11/1950
C4/2 194 5194 2901 62901 12/1903 BOS
W
Boston
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/11/1950
28/11/1950
C4/2 263 5263 2902 62902 07/1904 IMM
W
Immingham
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/04/1949
01/04/1949
C4/2 264 5264 2903 62903 07/1904 IMM
W
Immingham
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/06/1949
15/06/1949
C4/2 265 5265 2904   07/1904 W Withdrawn 12/1947 12/1947
C4/2 266 5266 2905   07/1904 W Withdrawn 10/1943 10/1943
C4/2 267 5267 2906   07/1904 W Withdrawn 11/1947 11/1947
C4/2 1083 6083 2907   10/1905 W Withdrawn 12/1947 12/1947
C4/2 1084 6084 2908 62908 10/1905 LIN
W
Lincoln
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/11/1950
22/11/1950
C4/2 1085 6085 2909 62909 10/1905 LIN
W
Lincoln
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/11/1950
17/11/1950
C4/2 1086 6086 2910 62910 10/1905 LIN
W
Lincoln
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/02/1949
12/02/1949
C4/2 1087 6087 2911   10/1905 W Withdrawn 11/1944 11/1944
C4/2 1088 6088 2912 62912 10/1905 LIN
W
Lincoln
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/08/1949
07/08/1949
C4/2 1089 6089 2913   11/1905 W Withdrawn 04/1947 04/1947
C4/2 1090 6090     11/1905 W Withdrawn 11/1939 11/1939
C4/2 1091 6091 2914 62914 11/1905 LIN
W
Lincoln
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/03/1948
20/03/1948
C4/2 1092 6092 2915 62915 11/1905 LIN
W
Lincoln
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/06/1949
08/06/1949
C4/2 1093 6093 2916 62916 11/1905 LIN
W
Lincoln
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
13/11/1948
13/11/1948
C4/2 1094 6094 2917 62917 11/1905 LIN
W
Lincoln
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/05/1949
12/05/1949
C4/2 260 5260 2918 62918 02/1906 LIN
W
Lincoln
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/12/1950
02/12/1950
C4/2 261 5261 2919 62919 03/1906 BOS
W
Boston
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/11/1950
22/11/1950
C4/2 262 5262 2920 62920 04/1906 BOS
W
Boston
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/02/1948
03/02/1948
C4/2 358 5358 2921 62921 05/1906 BOS
W
Boston
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/04/1948
05/04/1948
C4/2 360 5360 2922 62922 06/1906 BOS
W
Boston
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/06/1948
23/06/1948
C4/2 361 5361 2923 62923 07/1906 BOS
W
Boston
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/02/1949
04/02/1949
C4/2 362 5362 2924 62924 06/1906 BOS
W
Boston
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/01/1948
30/01/1948
C4/2 363 5363 2925 62925 08/1906 BOS
W
Boston
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/04/1949
14/04/1949