Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 526 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2433 Week
» 21215 Month
» 269508 Year
» 1153889 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GCR/LNER Robinson "C4" Class 4-4-2


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
11/1939 Condemned 6090       COND  
10/1943 Condemned 5266       COND  
11/1944 Condemned 6087       COND  
04/1947 Condemned 2913       COND  
11/1947 Condemned 2906       COND  
12/1947 Condemned 2904       COND  
12/1947 Condemned 2907       COND  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2900     BOS Boston  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2901     BOS Boston  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2902     IMM Immingham  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2903     IMM Immingham  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2908     LIN Lincoln  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2909     LIN Lincoln  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2910     LIN Lincoln  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2912     LIN Lincoln  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2914     LIN Lincoln  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2915     LIN Lincoln  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2916     LIN Lincoln  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2917     LIN Lincoln  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2918     LIN Lincoln  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2919     BOS Boston  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2920     BOS Boston  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2921     BOS Boston  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2922     BOS Boston  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2923     BOS Boston  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2924     BOS Boston  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2925     BOS Boston  
30/01/1948 Condemned 2924 BOS Boston   COND  
03/02/1948 Condemned 2920 BOS Boston   COND  
20/03/1948 Condemned 2914 LIN Lincoln   COND  
05/04/1948 Condemned 2921 BOS Boston   COND  
23/06/1948 Condemned 2922 BOS Boston   COND  
13/11/1948 Condemned 2916 LIN Lincoln   COND  
04/02/1949 Condemned 62923 BOS Boston   COND  
12/02/1949 Condemned 62910 LIN Lincoln   COND  
01/04/1949 Condemned 62902 IMM Immingham   COND  
14/04/1949 Condemned 62925 BOS Boston   COND  
12/05/1949 Condemned 62917 LIN Lincoln   COND  
08/06/1949 Condemned 62915 LIN Lincoln   COND  
15/06/1949 Condemned 62903 IMM Immingham   COND  
07/08/1949 Condemned 62912 LIN Lincoln   COND  
09/11/1950 Condemned 62900 BOS Boston   COND  
17/11/1950 Condemned 62909 LIN Lincoln   COND  
22/11/1950 Condemned 62908 LIN Lincoln   COND  
22/11/1950 Condemned 62919 BOS Boston   COND  
28/11/1950 Condemned 62901 BOS Boston   COND  
02/12/1950 Condemned 62918 LIN Lincoln   COND