Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 807 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18610 Week
» 71626 Month
» 191153 Year
» 3218006 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
GCR/LNER Robinson "C5" Class 4-4-2
Company |
Old Number |
|
Company |
New Number |
Subtype |
|
Date |
Information |
GCR |
259 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5259 |
1924 |
|
19/04/1924 |
|
GCR |
258 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5258 |
1924 |
|
28/02/1925 |
|
GCR |
365 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5365 |
1924 |
|
05/09/1925 |
|
GCR |
364 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5364 |
1924 |
|
05/12/1925 |
|
LNER |
5258 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2895 |
1946 |
|
23/06/1946 |
|
LNER |
5259 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2896 |
1946 |
|
23/06/1946 |
|
LNER |
5365 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2898 |
1946 |
|
01/09/1946 |
|
LNER |
5364 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
2897 |
1946 |
|
03/11/1946 |
|