Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 3019 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16425 Week
» 69441 Month
» 188968 Year
» 3215821 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
NER/LNER Worsdell "C6" Class 4-4-2
NER |
LNER (1946) |
BR |
Date To Service |
Depot Delivered To |
Date Withdrawn |
Depot Withdrawn From |
Svc Age (Yrs) |
Fate |
Where |
When |
Tot Age (Yrs) |
532
|
|
|
11/1903 |
|
01/1943 |
|
39.17 |
|
|
|
|
649
|
|
|
12/1903 |
|
08/1943 |
|
39.67 |
|
|
|
|
784
|
2931
|
|
12/1903 |
|
15/11/1947 |
|
43.92 |
|
|
|
|
295
|
2932
|
|
06/1904 |
|
03/1944 |
|
39.75 |
|
|
|
|
1680
|
2934
|
|
06/1904 |
|
15/11/1947 |
|
43.42 |
|
|
|
|
742
|
2933
|
62933
|
06/1904 |
|
06/03/1948 |
|
43.75 |
|
|
|
|
1753
|
2935
|
|
08/1904 |
|
07/1946 |
|
41.92 |
|
|
|
|
1776
|
2936
|
|
10/1904 |
|
04/1944 |
|
39.5 |
|
|
|
|
1792
|
2937
|
62937
|
10/1904 |
|
12/03/1948 |
|
43.42 |
|
|
|
|
1794
|
2938
|
|
10/1904 |
|
05/1944 |
|
39.58 |
|
|
|
|
696
|
2939
|
|
05/1910 |
|
31/12/1947 |
|
37.58 |
|
|
|
|
697
|
2940
|
|
05/1910 |
|
10/1945 |
|
35.42 |
|
|
|
|
698
|
2941
|
|
06/1910 |
|
27/12/1947 |
|
37.5 |
|
|
|
|
699
|
2942
|
|
06/1910 |
|
07/1944 |
|
34.08 |
|
|
|
|
700
|
2943
|
|
07/1910 |
|
05/1946 |
|
35.83 |
|
|
|
|
701
|
2944
|
|
07/1910 |
|
08/1944 |
|
34.08 |
|
|
|
|
702
|
2945
|
|
08/1910 |
|
07/1946 |
|
35.92 |
|
|
|
|
703
|
2946
|
|
08/1910 |
|
01/1945 |
|
34.42 |
|
|
|
|
704
|
2947
|
|
09/1910 |
|
22/11/1947 |
|
37.17 |
|
|
|
|
705
|
2948
|
|
09/1910 |
|
12/1943 |
|
33.25 |
|
|
|
|