GNR/LNER Ivatt "C12" Class 4-4-2T
Class | GNR | LNER (1924) | LNER (1946) | BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
C12 | 1009 | 4009 | 7350 | 67350 | 02/1898 | LIN BOS 35A W |
Lincoln Boston New England Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/08/1949 25/07/1953 13/04/1955 |
13/04/1955 |
C12 | 1010 | 4010 | 7351 | 67351 | 02/1898 | LNG W |
Langwith Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/1948 |
12/1948 |
C12 | 1013 | 4013 | 7352 | 67352 | 05/1898 | LTH 53B 35A 35C 35B W |
Louth Hull Botanic Gardens New England Spital Bridge Grantham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/07/1953 23/04/1955 17/12/1955 20/07/1957 19/11/1958 |
19/11/1958 |
C12 | 1014 | 4014 | 7353 | 67353 | 03/1898 | COP 37A 37B 37B 37A 37A 37B 53B W |
Copley Hill (Leeds) Ardsley Copley Hill (Leeds) Copley Hill (Leeds) Ardsley Ardsley Copley Hill (Leeds) Hull Botanic Gardens Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/04/1951 29/12/1951 19/01/1952 15/11/1952 29/11/1952 20/06/1953 25/07/1953 12/04/1955 |
12/04/1955 |
C12 | 1015 | 4015 | 7354 | 67354 | 10/1898 | MC CAM HLB W |
Melton Constable Cambridge Hull Botanic Gardens Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/08/1948 16/10/1948 30/01/1950 22/06/1953 |
22/06/1953 |
C12 | 1016 | 4016 | 7355 | 67355 | 10/1898 | LNG W |
Langwith Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/1948 |
03/1948 |
C12 | 1017 | 4017 | 10/1898 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1937 | 04/1937 | ||
C12 | 1018 | 4018 | 7356 | 67356 | 12/1898 | COP KX 31D 31C 31C W |
Copley Hill (Leeds) Kings Cross South Lynn Kings Lynn Kings Lynn Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/05/1949 30/06/1951 21/07/1951 28/07/1951 01/10/1951 |
01/10/1951 |
C12 | 1019 | 4019 | 7357 | 67357 | 10/1898 | LNG NWE W |
Langwith Junction New England Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/03/1949 22/05/1958 |
22/05/1958 |
C12 | 1020 | 4020 | 7358 | 67358 | 02/1899 | TFD W |
Trafford Park (LNER) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/01/1948 |
01/01/1948 |
C12 | 1501 | 4501 | 7359 | 67359 | 02/1899 | LTH W |
Louth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/1949 |
08/1949 |
C12 | 1502 | 4502 | 7360 | 67360 | 03/1899 | CAM 31E 31E 31A 31C W |
Cambridge Bury St Edmunds Bury St Edmunds Cambridge Kings Lynn Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/11/1952 15/11/1952 25/07/1953 24/10/1953 24/01/1955 |
24/01/1955 |
C12 | 1503 | 4503 | 7361 | 67361 | 03/1899 | NWE W |
New England Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/04/1955 |
15/04/1955 |
C12 | 1504 | 4504 | 7362 | 67362 | 03/1899 | NWE 35C 35B W |
New England Spital Bridge Grantham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/08/1950 22/05/1954 11/01/1958 |
11/01/1958 |
C12 | 1505 | 4505 | 7363 | 67363 | 04/1899 | NWE ANN 30A 38B 33B 34E W |
New England Annesley Stratford Annesley Tilbury New England Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/02/1949 20/06/1953 19/09/1953 20/10/1956 13/09/1958 20/11/1958 |
20/11/1958 |
C12 | 1506 | 4506 | 7364 | 67364 | 04/1899 | LIN W |
Lincoln Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/05/1956 |
25/05/1956 |
C12 | 1507 | 4507 | 7365 | 67365 | 04/1899 | NWE W |
New England Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/05/1958 |
22/05/1958 |
C12 | 1508 | 4508 | 7366 | 67366 | 05/1899 | CHR TFD 35A 35C 32D W |
Chester Northgate Trafford Park (LNER) New England Spital Bridge Yarmouth South Town Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/04/1948 14/02/1953 21/03/1953 23/04/1955 03/04/1958 |
03/04/1958 |
C12 | 1509 | 4509 | 7367 | 67367 | 05/1899 | CAM CAM 31E 31E 31A 31C 31A 35C 35B W |
Cambridge Cambridge Bury St Edmunds Bury St Edmunds Cambridge Kings Lynn Cambridge Spital Bridge Grantham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/08/1949 15/10/1949 01/11/1952 15/11/1952 25/07/1953 21/11/1953 17/12/1955 20/04/1957 20/07/1957 06/08/1958 |
06/08/1958 |
C12 | 1510 | 4510 | 7368 | 67368 | 05/1899 | BOS NWE NWE 35C W |
Boston New England New England Spital Bridge Withdrawn |
11/1935 01/1936 01/01/1948 25/07/1953 26/10/1955 |
26/10/1955 |
C12 | 1511 | 4511 | 7369 | 67369 | 08/1899 | TFD 35A W |
Trafford Park (LNER) New England Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/02/1953 19/07/1954 |
19/07/1954 |
C12 | 1512 | 4512 | 08/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1937 | 04/1937 | ||
C12 | 1513 | 4513 | 7370 | 67370 | 08/1899 | TFD W |
Trafford Park (LNER) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/01/1948 |
01/01/1948 |
C12 | 1514 | 4514 | 7371 | 67371 | 09/1899 | HLB HLB W |
Hull Botanic Gardens Hull Botanic Gardens Withdrawn |
01/1936 01/01/1948 04/04/1955 |
04/04/1955 |
C12 | 1515 | 4515 | 10/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1937 | 06/1937 | ||
C12 | 1516 | 4516 | 10/1899 | CLK W |
Colwick Withdrawn |
01/1936 11/1937 |
11/1937 | ||
C12 | 1517 | 4517 | 7372 | 67372 | 10/1899 | COP W |
Copley Hill (Leeds) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/05/1953 |
18/05/1953 |
C12 | 1518 | 4518 | 7373 | 67373 | 10/1899 | NWE W |
New England Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/03/1951 |
05/03/1951 |
C12 | 1519 | 4519 | 7374 | 67374 | 11/1899 | LTH KX 31D 31C 31C W |
Louth Kings Cross South Lynn Kings Lynn Kings Lynn Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/01/1948 30/06/1951 21/07/1951 28/07/1951 02/04/1958 |
02/04/1958 |
C12 | 1520 | 4520 | 7375 | 67375 | 11/1899 | CAM 31B 31E 31E W |
Cambridge March Bury St Edmunds Bury St Edmunds Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/04/1952 01/11/1952 15/11/1952 05/04/1955 |
05/04/1955 |
C12 | 1521 | 4521 | 7376 | 67376 | 06/1901 | HSY 35A 35A W |
Hornsey New England New England Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/01/1951 31/01/1951 22/05/1958 |
22/05/1958 |
C12 | 1522 | 4522 | 06/1901 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1937 | 06/1937 | ||
C12 | 1523 | 4523 | 7377 | 67377 | 06/1901 | COP BOS W |
Copley Hill (Leeds) Boston Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/06/1948 07/1949 |
07/1949 |
C12 | 1524 | 4524 | 7378 | 67378 | 10/1901 | TFD W |
Trafford Park (LNER) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/01/1948 |
01/01/1948 |
C12 | 1525 | 4525 | 7379 | 67379 | 08/1901 | LTH 35C 35A W |
Louth Spital Bridge New England Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/11/1955 17/12/1955 10/06/1958 |
10/06/1958 |
C12 | 1526 | 4526 | 09/1901 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1937 | 04/1937 | ||
C12 | 1527 | 4527 | 7380 | 67380 | 06/1901 | GRA 35C 35A W |
Grantham Spital Bridge New England Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/06/1954 17/11/1956 30/05/1958 |
30/05/1958 |
C12 | 1528 | 4528 | 7381 | 67381 | 11/1901 | LIN W |
Lincoln Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/01/1952 |
21/01/1952 |
C12 | 1529 | 4529 | 7382 | 67382 | 10/1901 | GRA W |
Grantham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/04/1955 |
06/04/1955 |
C12 | 1530 | 4530 | 7383 | 67383 | 11/1901 | COP BOS LIN 40C 40C W |
Copley Hill (Leeds) Boston Lincoln Louth Louth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/06/1948 05/03/1949 27/08/1950 23/09/1950 01/1955 |
01/1955 |
C12 | 1531 | 4531 | 7384 | 67384 | 12/1903 | LNG LTH W |
Langwith Junction Louth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/09/1949 07/05/1956 |
07/05/1956 |
C12 | 1532 | 4532 | 12/1903 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1937 | 04/1937 | ||
C12 | 1533 | 4533 | 12/1903 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1937 | 12/1937 | ||
C12 | 1534 | 4534 | 7385 | 67385 | 12/1903 | CAM 31B 31B 31E 31E W |
Cambridge March March Bury St Edmunds Bury St Edmunds Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/08/1952 23/08/1952 01/11/1952 15/11/1952 01/04/1955 |
01/04/1955 |
C12 | 1535 | 4535 | 12/1903 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1939 | 01/1939 | ||
C12 | 1536 | 4536 | 7386 | 67386 | 12/1903 | COP ARD 31C 30A 31C W |
Copley Hill (Leeds) Ardsley Kings Lynn Stratford Kings Lynn Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/03/1949 22/09/1951 23/10/1954 25/12/1954 03/04/1958 |
03/04/1958 |
C12 | 1537 | 4537 | 7387 | 67387 | 12/1903 | BOS ANN ANN 32F 32D 32C 30A 32D W |
Boston Annesley Annesley Yarmouth Beach Yarmouth South Town Lowestoft Stratford Yarmouth South Town Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/11/1949 30/11/1949 29/12/1951 19/01/1952 24/07/1954 25/09/1954 13/11/1954 07/02/1955 |
07/02/1955 |
C12 | 1538 | 4538 | 7388 | 67388 | 12/1903 | COP W |
Copley Hill (Leeds) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/1948 |
07/1948 |
C12 | 1539 | 4539 | 7389 | 67389 | 01/1904 | LTH 40A 40A 31A 31A 35A 35A W |
Louth Lincoln Lincoln Cambridge Cambridge New England New England Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/08/1950 23/09/1950 23/12/1950 31/12/1950 05/05/1951 19/05/1951 15/04/1955 |
15/04/1955 |
C12 | 1540 | 4540 | 7390 | 67390 | 12/1903 | NWE W |
New England Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/06/1953 |
15/06/1953 |
C12 | 1541 | 4541 | 7391 | 67391 | 07/1907 | HLB HLB 35B W |
Hull Botanic Gardens Hull Botanic Gardens Grantham Withdrawn |
01/1936 01/01/1948 23/04/1955 10/01/1958 |
10/01/1958 |
C12 | 1542 | 4542 | 7392 | 67392 | 07/1907 | HLB HLB 35A W |
Hull Botanic Gardens Hull Botanic Gardens New England Withdrawn |
01/1936 01/01/1948 23/04/1955 19/10/1956 |
19/10/1956 |
C12 | 1543 | 4543 | 7393 | 67393 | 07/1907 | HLB HLB W |
Hull Botanic Gardens Hull Botanic Gardens Withdrawn |
01/1936 01/01/1948 20/04/1953 |
20/04/1953 |
C12 | 1544 | 4544 | 7394 | 67394 | 07/1907 | HLB HLB 35A W |
Hull Botanic Gardens Hull Botanic Gardens New England Withdrawn |
01/1936 01/01/1948 23/04/1955 16/06/1958 |
16/06/1958 |
C12 | 1545 | 4545 | 7395 | 67395 | 07/1907 | HLB HLB 31E 31A W |
Hull Botanic Gardens Hull Botanic Gardens Bury St Edmunds Cambridge Withdrawn |
01/1936 01/01/1948 23/04/1955 21/01/1956 16/03/1957 |
16/03/1957 |
C12 | 1546 | 4546 | 7396 | 08/1907 | HLB W |
Hull Botanic Gardens Withdrawn |
01/1936 06/1947 |
06/1947 | |
C12 | 1547 | 4547 | 7397 | 67397 | 08/1907 | HLB HLB 31E 31A 35C 35B W |
Hull Botanic Gardens Hull Botanic Gardens Bury St Edmunds Cambridge Spital Bridge Grantham Withdrawn |
01/1936 01/01/1948 23/04/1955 21/01/1956 20/04/1957 20/07/1957 06/12/1958 |
06/12/1958 |
C12 | 1548 | 4548 | 7398 | 67398 | 08/1907 | LTH 40B 35A W |
Louth Immingham New England Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/12/1956 16/02/1957 04/11/1958 |
04/11/1958 |
C12 | 1549 | 4549 | 7399 | 67399 | 08/1907 | HLB HLB W |
Hull Botanic Gardens Hull Botanic Gardens Withdrawn |
01/1936 01/01/1948 11/1949 |
11/1949 |
C12 | 1550 | 4550 | 09/1907 | HLB W |
Hull Botanic Gardens Withdrawn |
01/1936 12/1938 |
12/1938 |