GNR/LNER Ivatt "C12" Class 4-4-2T
Class | GNR | LNER (1924) | LNER (1946) | BR | Built | Date Withdrawn | Modification | Modification Date |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
C12 | 1018 | 4018 | 7356 | 67356 | 12/1898 | 01/10/1951 | Push/Pull equipment fitted | 05/1949 |
C12 | 1501 | 4501 | 7359 | (67359) | 02/1899 | 08/1949 | Condensers removed | 12/2000 |
C12 | 1502 | 4502 | 7360 | 67360 | 03/1899 | 24/01/1955 | Condensers removed | 07/1921 |
C12 | 1503 | 4503 | 7361 | 67361 | 03/1899 | 15/04/1955 | Condensers removed | 01/1922 |
C12 | 1504 | 4504 | 7362 | 67362 | 03/1899 | 11/01/1958 | Condensers removed | 08/1924 |
C12 | 1505 | 4505 | 7363 | 67363 | 04/1899 | 20/11/1958 | Push/Pull equipment fitted | 02/1949 |
C12 | 1506 | 4506 | 7364 | 67364 | 04/1899 | 25/05/1956 | Condensers removed | 10/1921 |
C12 | 1507 | 4507 | 7365 | 67365 | 04/1899 | 22/05/1958 | Condensers removed | 09/1922 |
C12 | 1508 | 4508 | 7366 | 67366 | 05/1899 | 03/04/1958 | Condensers removed | 04/1922 |
C12 | 1509 | 4509 | 7367 | 67367 | 05/1899 | 06/08/1958 | Condensers removed | 01/1924 |
C12 | 1510 | 4510 | 7368 | 67368 | 05/1899 | 26/10/1955 | Condensers removed | 09/1921 |
C12 | 1511 | 4511 | 7369 | 67369 | 08/1899 | 19/07/1954 | Condensers removed | 03/1921 |
C12 | 1512 | 4512 | 08/1899 | 04/1937 | Condensers removed | 08/1921 | ||
C12 | 1513 | 4513 | 7370 | (67370) | 08/1899 | 01/01/1948 | Condensers removed | 12/1920 |
C12 | 1514 | 4514 | 7371 | 67371 | 09/1899 | 04/04/1955 | Condensers removed | 07/1921 |
C12 | 1515 | 4515 | 10/1899 | 06/1937 | Condensers removed | 04/1921 | ||
C12 | 1516 | 4516 | 10/1899 | 11/1937 | Condensers removed | 02/1922 | ||
C12 | 1517 | 4517 | 7372 | 67372 | 10/1899 | 18/05/1953 | Condensers removed | 11/1923 |
C12 | 1518 | 4518 | 7373 | 67373 | 10/1899 | 05/03/1951 | Condensers removed | 11/1921 |
C12 | 1519 | 4519 | 7374 | 67374 | 11/1899 | 02/04/1958 | Push/Pull equipment fitted | 01/1948 |
C12 | 1520 | 4520 | 7375 | 67375 | 11/1899 | 05/04/1955 | Condensers removed | 05/1921 |
C12 | 1521 | 4521 | 7376 | 67376 | 06/1901 | 22/05/1958 | Condensers removed | 08/1923 |
C12 | 1522 | 4522 | 06/1901 | 06/1937 | Condensers removed | 05/1921 | ||
C12 | 1523 | 4523 | 7377 | (67377) | 06/1901 | 07/1949 | Condensers removed | 09/1922 |
C12 | 1524 | 4524 | 7378 | (67378) | 10/1901 | 01/01/1948 | Condensers removed | 02/1921 |
C12 | 1525 | 4525 | 7379 | 67379 | 08/1901 | 10/06/1958 | Condensers removed | 12/1923 |
C12 | 1526 | 4526 | 09/1901 | 04/1937 | Condensers removed | 12/1923 | ||
C12 | 1527 | 4527 | 7380 | 67380 | 06/1901 | 30/05/1958 | Condensers removed | 03/1922 |
C12 | 1528 | 4528 | 7381 | 67381 | 11/1901 | 21/01/1952 | Condensers removed | 05/1922 |
C12 | 1529 | 4529 | 7382 | 67382 | 10/1901 | 06/04/1955 | Condensers removed | 12/1921 |
C12 | 1530 | 4530 | 7383 | 67383 | 11/1901 | 01/1955 | Condensers removed | 12/1923 |
C12 | 1531 | 4531 | 7384 | 67384 | 12/1903 | 07/05/1956 | Condensers removed | 04/1923 |
C12 | 1532 | 4532 | 12/1903 | 04/1937 | Condensers removed | 04/1921 | ||
C12 | 1533 | 4533 | 12/1903 | 12/1937 | Condensers removed | 05/1922 | ||
C12 | 1534 | 4534 | 7385 | 67385 | 12/1903 | 01/04/1955 | Condensers removed | 07/1922 |
C12 | 1535 | 4535 | 12/1903 | 01/1939 | Condensers removed | 01/1924 | ||
C12 | 1536 | 4536 | 7386 | 67386 | 12/1903 | 03/04/1958 | Push/Pull equipment fitted | 03/1949 |
C12 | 1537 | 4537 | 7387 | 67387 | 12/1903 | 07/02/1955 | Condensers removed | 05/1922 |
C12 | 1538 | 4538 | 7388 | (67388) | 12/1903 | 07/1948 | Condensers removed | 10/1922 |
C12 | 1539 | 4539 | 7389 | 67389 | 01/1904 | 15/04/1955 | Condensers removed | 11/1921 |
C12 | 1540 | 4540 | 7390 | 67390 | 12/1903 | 15/06/1953 | Condensers removed | 08/1923 |
C12 | 1541 | 4541 | 7391 | 67391 | 07/1907 | 10/01/1958 | Condensers removed | 12/1929 |
C12 | 1542 | 4542 | 7392 | 67392 | 07/1907 | 19/10/1956 | Condensers removed | 02/1924 |
C12 | 1543 | 4543 | 7393 | 67393 | 07/1907 | 20/04/1953 | Condensers removed | 02/1923 |
C12 | 1544 | 4544 | 7394 | 67394 | 07/1907 | 16/06/1958 | Condensers removed | 03/1924 |
C12 | 1545 | 4545 | 7395 | 67395 | 07/1907 | 16/03/1957 | Condensers removed | 03/1921 |
C12 | 1546 | 4546 | 7396 | 08/1907 | 06/1947 | Condensers removed | 05/1923 | |
C12 | 1547 | 4547 | 7397 | 67397 | 08/1907 | 06/12/1958 | Condensers removed | 04/1921 |
C12 | 1548 | 4548 | 7398 | 67398 | 08/1907 | 04/11/1958 | Condensers removed | 09/1922 |
C12 | 1549 | 4549 | 7399 | (67399) | 08/1907 | 11/1949 | Condensers removed | 03/1921 |
C12 | 1550 | 4550 | 09/1907 | 12/1938 | Push/Pull equipment fitted | 11/1927 |