GCR/LNER Robinson "C14" Class 4-4-2T
Class | GCR | LNER (1924) | LNER (1946) | BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
C14 | 1120 | 6120 | 7440 | 67440 | 05/1907 | ARD 37B 37B 37A 37A 39A W |
Ardsley Copley Hill (Leeds) Copley Hill (Leeds) Ardsley Ardsley Gorton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/03/1951 31/03/1951 30/06/1951 21/07/1951 16/05/1953 04/07/1957 |
04/07/1957 |
C14 | 1121 | 6121 | 7441 | 67441 | 05/1907 | ARD 39A 39A W |
Ardsley Gorton Gorton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/06/1951 21/07/1951 05/08/1957 |
05/08/1957 |
C14 | 1122 | 6122 | 7442 | 67442 | 05/1907 | ARD LIN WRX W |
Ardsley Lincoln Wrexham Rhosddu Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/04/1948 17/07/1948 30/11/1957 |
30/11/1957 |
C14 | 1123 | 6123 | 7443 | 67443 | 05/1907 | ARD 39A W |
Ardsley Gorton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/06/1955 24/06/1957 |
24/06/1957 |
C14 | 1124 | 6124 | 7444 | 67444 | 05/1907 | ARD 39A W |
Ardsley Gorton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/04/1953 03/07/1957 |
03/07/1957 |
C14 | 1125 | 6125 | 7445 | 67445 | 05/1907 | ARD 39A 36D W |
Ardsley Gorton Barnsley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/01/1953 20/07/1957 22/12/1959 |
22/12/1959 |
C14 | 1126 | 6126 | 7446 | 67446 | 06/1907 | ARD 39A W |
Ardsley Gorton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/06/1955 27/05/1957 |
27/05/1957 |
C14 | 1127 | 6127 | 7447 | 67447 | 06/1907 | IPS 37C 37C 39A 39A 36D W |
Ipswich Bradford Hammerton Street Bradford Hammerton Street Gorton Gorton Barnsley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/05/1950 31/05/1950 30/06/1951 21/07/1951 09/11/1957 02/12/1958 |
02/12/1958 |
C14 | 1128 | 6128 | 7448 | 67448 | 06/1907 | IPS 37C 39A 39A 36D W |
Ipswich Bradford Hammerton Street Gorton Gorton Barnsley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/05/1950 30/06/1951 21/07/1951 20/07/1957 18/06/1959 |
18/06/1959 |
C14 | 1129 | 6129 | 7449 | 67449 | 06/1907 | ARD LIN WRX W |
Ardsley Lincoln Wrexham Rhosddu Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/03/1948 17/07/1948 07/12/1957 |
07/12/1957 |
C14 | 1130 | 6130 | 7450 | 67450 | 06/1907 | IPS 37C 37C 39A 39A W |
Ipswich Bradford Hammerton Street Bradford Hammerton Street Gorton Gorton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/05/1950 31/05/1950 30/06/1951 21/07/1951 23/01/1960 |
23/01/1960 |
C14 | 1131 | 6131 | 7451 | 67451 | 06/1907 | ARD 39A 39A W |
Ardsley Gorton Gorton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/06/1951 21/07/1951 21/01/1957 |
21/01/1957 |