GCR/LNER Robinson "C14" Class 4-4-2T
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7440 | ARD | Ardsley | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7441 | ARD | Ardsley | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7442 | ARD | Ardsley | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7443 | ARD | Ardsley | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7444 | ARD | Ardsley | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7445 | ARD | Ardsley | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7446 | ARD | Ardsley | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7447 | IPS | Ipswich | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7448 | IPS | Ipswich | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7449 | ARD | Ardsley | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7450 | IPS | Ipswich | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7451 | ARD | Ardsley | |||
27/03/1948 | Reallocation | 7449 | ARD | Ardsley | LIN | Lincoln | |
03/04/1948 | Reallocation | 7442 | ARD | Ardsley | LIN | Lincoln | |
17/07/1948 | Reallocation | 7442 | LIN | Lincoln | WRX | Wrexham Rhosddu | |
17/07/1948 | Reallocation | 7449 | LIN | Lincoln | WRX | Wrexham Rhosddu | |
14/05/1950 | Reallocation | 67447 | IPS | Ipswich | 37C | Bradford Hammerton Street | |
14/05/1950 | Reallocation | 7448 | IPS | Ipswich | 37C | Bradford Hammerton Street | |
14/05/1950 | Reallocation | 67450 | IPS | Ipswich | 37C | Bradford Hammerton Street | |
31/05/1950 | Reallocation | 67447 | 37C | Bradford Hammerton Street | 37C | Bradford Hammerton Street | |
31/05/1950 | Reallocation | 67450 | 37C | Bradford Hammerton Street | 37C | Bradford Hammerton Street | |
24/03/1951 | Reallocation | 67440 | ARD | Ardsley | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |
31/03/1951 | Reallocation | 67440 | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | |
30/06/1951 | Reallocation | 67440 | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | 37A | Ardsley | |
30/06/1951 | Reallocation | 67441 | ARD | Ardsley | 39A | Gorton | |
30/06/1951 | Reallocation | 67447 | 37C | Bradford Hammerton Street | 39A | Gorton | |
30/06/1951 | Reallocation | 67448 | 37C | Bradford Hammerton Street | 39A | Gorton | |
30/06/1951 | Reallocation | 67450 | 37C | Bradford Hammerton Street | 39A | Gorton | |
30/06/1951 | Reallocation | 67451 | ARD | Ardsley | 39A | Gorton | |
21/07/1951 | Reallocation | 67440 | 37A | Ardsley | 37A | Ardsley | |
21/07/1951 | Reallocation | 67441 | 39A | Gorton | 39A | Gorton | |
21/07/1951 | Reallocation | 67447 | 39A | Gorton | 39A | Gorton | |
21/07/1951 | Reallocation | 67448 | 39A | Gorton | 39A | Gorton | |
21/07/1951 | Reallocation | 67450 | 39A | Gorton | 39A | Gorton | |
21/07/1951 | Reallocation | 67451 | 39A | Gorton | 39A | Gorton | |
17/01/1953 | Reallocation | 67445 | ARD | Ardsley | 39A | Gorton | |
18/04/1953 | Reallocation | 67444 | ARD | Ardsley | 39A | Gorton | |
16/05/1953 | Reallocation | 67440 | 37A | Ardsley | 39A | Gorton | |
18/06/1955 | Reallocation | 67443 | ARD | Ardsley | 39A | Gorton | |
18/06/1955 | Reallocation | 67446 | ARD | Ardsley | 39A | Gorton | |
21/01/1957 | Condemned | 67451 | 39A | Gorton | COND | ||
27/05/1957 | Condemned | 67446 | 39A | Gorton | COND | ||
24/06/1957 | Condemned | 67443 | 39A | Gorton | COND | ||
03/07/1957 | Condemned | 67444 | 39A | Gorton | COND | ||
04/07/1957 | Condemned | 67440 | 39A | Gorton | COND | ||
20/07/1957 | Reallocation | 67445 | 39A | Gorton | 36D | Barnsley | |
20/07/1957 | Reallocation | 67448 | 39A | Gorton | 36D | Barnsley | |
05/08/1957 | Condemned | 67441 | 39A | Gorton | COND | ||
09/11/1957 | Reallocation | 67447 | 39A | Gorton | 36D | Barnsley | |
30/11/1957 | Condemned | 67442 | WRX | Wrexham Rhosddu | COND | ||
07/12/1957 | Condemned | 67449 | WRX | Wrexham Rhosddu | COND | ||
02/12/1958 | Condemned | 67447 | 36D | Barnsley | COND | ||
18/06/1959 | Condemned | 67448 | 36D | Barnsley | COND | ||
22/12/1959 | Condemned | 67445 | 36D | Barnsley | COND | ||
23/01/1960 | Condemned | 67450 | 39A | Gorton | COND |