Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1192 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18995 Week
» 72011 Month
» 191538 Year
» 3218391 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
GCR/LNER Robinson "C14" Class 4-4-2T
Class |
GCR |
LNER (1924) |
LNER (1946) |
BR |
Built |
Date Withdrawn |
Modification |
Modification Date |
C14 |
1120
|
6120
|
7440
|
67440
|
05/1907 |
04/07/1957 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
06/1929 |
C14 |
1121
|
6121
|
7441
|
67441
|
05/1907 |
05/08/1957 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
06/1926 |
C14 |
1122
|
6122
|
7442
|
67442
|
05/1907 |
30/11/1957 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
03/1932 |
C14 |
1123
|
6123
|
7443
|
67443
|
05/1907 |
24/06/1957 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
01/1926 |
C14 |
1124
|
6124
|
7444
|
67444
|
05/1907 |
03/07/1957 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
04/1928 |
C14 |
1125
|
6125
|
7445
|
67445
|
05/1907 |
22/12/1959 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
01/1935 |
C14 |
1126
|
6126
|
7446
|
67446
|
06/1907 |
27/05/1957 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
11/1927 |
C14 |
1127
|
6127
|
7447
|
67447
|
06/1907 |
02/12/1958 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
08/1930 |
C14 |
1128
|
6128
|
7448
|
67448
|
06/1907 |
18/06/1959 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
07/1928 |
C14 |
1129
|
6129
|
7449
|
67449
|
06/1907 |
07/12/1957 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
06/1930 |
C14 |
1130
|
6130
|
7450
|
67450
|
06/1907 |
23/01/1960 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
01/1931 |
C14 |
1131
|
6131
|
7451
|
67451
|
06/1907 |
21/01/1957 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
07/1929 |