Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 389 Today
» 1251 Yesterday
» 4127 Week
» 1640 Month
» 229524 Year
» 1451089 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GNR/LNER Ivatt "D2" Class 4-4-0


Class GNR LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
D2 1305 4305 2150 62150 11/1897 CLK
W
Colwick
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/1949
05/1949
D2 1320 4320 2151 62151 06/1898 CLK
W
Colwick
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/1949
04/1949
D2 1321 4321 2152 62152 06/1898 YB
W
Yarmouth Beach
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/1949
01/1949
D2 1322 4322     06/1898 W Withdrawn 07/1939 07/1939
D2 1323 4323 2153 62153 06/1898 CLK
W
Colwick
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/1949
04/1949
D2 1324 4324 2154 62154 06/1898 BOS
W
Boston
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
25/11/1950
25/11/1950
D2 1325 4325     07/1898 W Withdrawn 12/1937 12/1937
D2 1326 4326 2155 62155 10/1898 MC
W
Melton Constable
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/02/1948
26/02/1948
D2 1327 4327 2156 62156 10/1898 MC
W
Melton Constable
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/1949
01/1949
D2 1328 4328     10/1898 W Withdrawn 10/1937 10/1937
D2 1329 4329 2157 62157 11/1898 MC
W
Melton Constable
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/04/1948
08/04/1948
D2 1330 4330 2158   11/1898 W Withdrawn 03/1946 03/1946
D2 1331 4331 2159   11/1898 W Withdrawn 07/1947 07/1947
D2 1332 4332 2160 62160 11/1898 HIT
W
Hitchin (GNR)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/10/1948
16/10/1948
D2 1333 4333 2161 62161 11/1898 GRA
W
Grantham
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/1950
07/1950
D2 1334 4334     11/1898 W Withdrawn 09/1936 09/1936
D2 1335 4335 2162   11/1898 W Withdrawn 07/1947 07/1947
D2 1336 4336     09/1899 W Withdrawn 05/1937 05/1937
D2 1337 4337 2163 62163 10/1899 HIT
W
Hitchin (GNR)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/10/1948
16/10/1948
D2 1338 4338 2164   10/1899 W Withdrawn 02/1946 02/1946
D2 1339 4339 2165 62165 10/1899 NWE
W
New England
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/1949
03/1949
D2 1340 4340 2166   10/1899 W Withdrawn 07/1947 07/1947
D2 1361 4361 2167 62167 11/1899 GRA
W
Grantham
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/1949
02/1949
D2 1362 4362     10/1899 W Withdrawn 06/1937 06/1937
D2 1363 4363     10/1899 W Withdrawn 06/1939 06/1939
D2 1364 4364 2168   11/1899 W Withdrawn 12/1947 12/1947
D2 1365 4365 2169 62169 11/1899 CLK
W
Colwick
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/07/1948
02/07/1948
D2 1366 4366 2170   10/1900 W Withdrawn 08/1947 08/1947
D2 1367 4367     10/1900 W Withdrawn 06/1939 06/1939
D2 1368 4368 2171   10/1900 W Withdrawn 04/1947 04/1947
D2 1369 4369 2172 62172 10/1900 GRA
W
Grantham
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/06/1951
19/06/1951
D2 1370 4370 2173 62173 11/1900 GRA
W
Grantham
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/1950
05/1950
D2 1371 4371 2174   11/1900 W Withdrawn 09/1947 09/1947
D2 1372 4372     11/1900 W Withdrawn 12/1938 12/1938
D2 1373 4373 2175 62175 11/1900 YB
W
Yarmouth Beach
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
25/11/1948
25/11/1948
D2 1374 4374 2176   12/1900 W Withdrawn 01/1947 01/1947
D2 1375 4375     12/1900 W Withdrawn 12/1939 12/1939
D2 1376 4376     12/1900 W Withdrawn 11/1937 11/1937
D2 1377 4377 2177 62177 01/1901 CLK
W
Colwick
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/1949
10/1949
D2 1378 4378     01/1901 W Withdrawn 06/1937 06/1937
D2 1379 4379 2178   01/1901 W Withdrawn 07/1947 07/1947
D2 1380 4380 2179 62179 11/1900 BOS
W
Boston
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/1949
03/1949
D2 1381 4381 2180 62180 01/1901 BOS
W
Boston
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/1950
05/1950
D2 1382 4382     11/1900 W Withdrawn 05/1937 05/1937
D2 1383 4383 2181 62181 12/1900 BOS
W
Boston
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
25/11/1950
25/11/1950
D2 1384 4384 2182   12/1900 W Withdrawn 03/1946 03/1946
D2 1385 4385 2183   12/1900 W Withdrawn 07/1947 07/1947
D2 1386 4386     01/1903 W Withdrawn 03/1939 03/1939
D2 1387 4387 2184   02/1903 W Withdrawn 12/1947 12/1947
D2 1388 4388 2185   02/1903 W Withdrawn 07/1947 07/1947
D2 1389 4389     02/1903 W Withdrawn 04/1937 04/1937
D2 1390 4390 2186   05/1903 W Withdrawn 05/1947 05/1947
D2 1391 4391     06/1903 W Withdrawn 08/1938 08/1938
D2 1392 4392 2187 62187 04/1903 CLK
W
Colwick
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/10/1948
01/10/1948
D2 1393 4393 2188 62188 02/1903 CLK
W
Colwick
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/1949
10/1949
D2 1394 4394 2189 62189 05/1903 MC
W
Melton Constable
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
25/11/1948
25/11/1948
D2 1395 4395 2190 62190 03/1903 NWE
W
New England
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/1949
09/1949
D2 1396 4396     08/1907 W Withdrawn 08/1938 08/1938
D2 1397 4397     09/1907 W Withdrawn 11/1938 11/1938
D2 1398 4398 2191   10/1907 W Withdrawn 06/1947 06/1947
D2 1399 4399 2192   10/1907 W Withdrawn 05/1946 05/1946
D2 1180 4180 2193 62193 10/1907 CLK
W
Colwick
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/1949
06/1949
D2 41   2194 62194 04/1909 CLK
W
Colwick
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/1949
06/1949
D2 42   2195 62195 04/1909 MC
W
Melton Constable
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/02/1948
26/02/1948
D2 43       04/1909 W Withdrawn 06/1938 06/1938
D2 44   2196   05/1909 W Withdrawn 05/1947 05/1947
D2 45   2197 62197 05/1909 MC
W
Melton Constable
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/1949
01/1949
D2 46       06/1909 W Withdrawn 11/1938 11/1938
D2 47   2198 62198 06/1909 CLK
W
Colwick
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/08/1948
27/08/1948
D2 48   2199 62199 06/1909 CLK
W
Colwick
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/1949
07/1949
D2 49   2200   06/1909 W Withdrawn 07/1946 07/1946
D2 50   2201   06/1909 W Withdrawn 07/1947 07/1947