GNR/LNER Ivatt "D3" Class 4-4-0
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
10/1935 | Condemned | 4308 | COND | ||||
10/1935 | Condemned | 4360 | COND | ||||
11/1935 | Reallocation | 4073 | CLK | Colwick | |||
11/1935 | Reallocation | 4312 | CLK | Colwick | |||
11/1935 | Reallocation | 4346 | CLK | Colwick | |||
12/1935 | Condemned | 4072 | COND | ||||
12/1935 | Condemned | 4078 | COND | ||||
12/1935 | Condemned | 4313 | COND | ||||
01/1936 | Reallocation | 4071 | YK | York (North) | |||
01/1936 | Reallocation | 4075 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | |||
01/1936 | Reallocation | 4077 | 12C | Durran Hill (Carlisle) | |||
01/1936 | Reallocation | 4079 | YK | York (North) | |||
01/1936 | Reallocation | 4347 | SEL | Selby | |||
01/1936 | Reallocation | 4348 | DAR | Darlington | |||
01/1936 | Reallocation | 4349 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | |||
01/1936 | Reallocation | 4350 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | |||
01/1936 | Reallocation | 4354 | MID | Middlesbrough | |||
04/1936 | Condemned | 4353 | COND | ||||
06/1936 | Condemned | 4076 | COND | ||||
11/1936 | Condemned | 4342 | COND | ||||
06/1937 | Condemned | 4314 | COND | ||||
07/1937 | Condemned | 4341 | COND | ||||
08/1937 | Condemned | 4358 | COND | ||||
10/1937 | Condemned | 4077 | 12C | Durran Hill (Carlisle) | COND | ||
10/1937 | Condemned | 4079 | YK | York (North) | COND | ||
10/1937 | Condemned | 4354 | MID | Middlesbrough | COND | ||
11/1942 | Condemned | 4304 | COND | ||||
02/1946 | Condemned | 2117 | CLK | Colwick | COND | ||
02/1946 | Condemned | 2129 | CLK | Colwick | COND | ||
06/1946 | Condemned | 2146 | COND | ||||
11/1946 | Condemned | 2118 | COND | ||||
11/1946 | Condemned | 2141 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | COND | ||
12/1946 | Condemned | 2134 | COND | ||||
04/1947 | Condemned | 2130 | COND | ||||
04/1947 | Condemned | 2142 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | COND | ||
05/1947 | Condemned | 2127 | COND | ||||
06/1947 | Condemned | 2147 | COND | ||||
08/1947 | Condemned | 2120 | COND | ||||
08/1947 | Condemned | 2121 | COND | ||||
08/1947 | Condemned | 2138 | CLK | Colwick | COND | ||
09/1947 | Condemned | 2115 | COND | ||||
11/1947 | Condemned | 2136 | COND | ||||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2116 | YK | York (North) | CLK | Colwick | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2119 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | GRA | Grantham | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2122 | SL | South Lynn | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2123 | CLK | Colwick | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2124 | SL | South Lynn | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2125 | CLK | Colwick | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2126 | CLK | Colwick | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2128 | NWE | New England | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2131 | NWE | New England | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2132 | IMM | Immingham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2133 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2135 | CLK | Colwick | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2137 | SL | South Lynn | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2139 | SEL | Selby | IMM | Immingham | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2140 | DAR | Darlington | CLK | Colwick | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2143 | LTH | Louth | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2144 | SL | South Lynn | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2145 | SL | South Lynn | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2148 | HITL | Hitchin (GNR) | |||
17/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4353 | 98W | TUX | Tuxford | ||
02/1948 | Condemned | 2122 | SL | South Lynn | COND | ||
03/1948 | Condemned | 2143 | LTH | Louth | COND | ||
03/04/1948 | Reallocation | 2139 | IMM | Immingham | LTH | Louth | |
08/1948 | Condemned | 2126 | CLK | Colwick | COND | ||
08/1948 | Condemned | 2144 | SL | South Lynn | COND | ||
10/1948 | Condemned | 2116 | CLK | Colwick | COND | ||
11/1948 | Condemned | 2124 | SL | South Lynn | COND | ||
01/1949 | Condemned | 62137 | SL | South Lynn | COND | ||
01/1949 | Condemned | 62145 | SL | South Lynn | COND | ||
14/05/1949 | Reallocation | 62148 | HITL | Hitchin (GNR) | CLK | Colwick | |
06/1949 | Condemned | 62139 | LTH | Louth | COND | ||
07/1949 | Reallocation | 62132 | IMM | Immingham | LTH | Louth | |
23/07/1949 | Reallocation | 62132 | LTH | Louth | LTH | Louth | |
08/1949 | Condemned | 62125 | CLK | Colwick | COND | ||
08/1949 | Condemned | 62133 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | COND | ||
10/09/1949 | Reallocation | 62148 | CLK | Colwick | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | |
24/09/1949 | Reallocation | 62148 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | CLK | Colwick | |
31/10/1949 | Condemned | 62131 | NWE | New England | COND | ||
12/1949 | Condemned | 62123 | CLK | Colwick | COND | ||
12/1949 | Condemned | 62128 | NWE | New England | COND | ||
06/02/1950 | Condemned | 62135 | CLK | Colwick | COND | ||
25/03/1950 | Reallocation | 62140 | CLK | Colwick | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | |
23/04/1950 | Reallocation | 62140 | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | 38A | Colwick | |
06/05/1950 | Reallocation | 62140 | 38A | Colwick | 38A | Colwick | |
06/1950 | Condemned | 62140 | 38A | Colwick | COND | ||
11/1950 | Condemned | 62148 | CLK | Colwick | COND | ||
25/11/1950 | Reallocation | 62132 | LTH | Louth | 40F | Boston | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 62132 | 40F | Boston | 40F | Boston | |
12/1950 | Condemned | 62132 | 40F | Boston | COND | ||
18/10/1951 | Condemned | 62000 | GRA | Grantham | COND |