MSLR/LNER Parker "D7" Class 4-4-0
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
12/1926 | Condemned | 5564 | COND | ||||
09/1928 | Condemned | 5561 | COND | ||||
10/1929 | Condemned | 5563 | COND | ||||
01/1930 | Condemned | 5710 | COND | ||||
02/1930 | Condemned | 5693 | COND | ||||
07/1930 | Condemned | 5685 | COND | ||||
04/1931 | Condemned | 5688 | COND | ||||
08/1931 | Condemned | 5566 | COND | ||||
09/1931 | Condemned | 5567 | COND | ||||
12/1931 | Condemned | 5682 | COND | ||||
03/1932 | Condemned | 5709 | COND | ||||
04/1933 | Condemned | 5565 | COND | ||||
05/1933 | Condemned | 5707 | COND | ||||
06/1933 | Condemned | 5711 | COND | ||||
07/1933 | Condemned | 5691 | COND | ||||
08/1933 | Condemned | 5686 | COND | ||||
08/1933 | Condemned | 5705 | COND | ||||
09/1933 | Condemned | 5702 | COND | ||||
05/1935 | Condemned | 5703 | COND | ||||
08/1935 | Condemned | 5562 | COND | ||||
08/1935 | Condemned | 5687 | COND | ||||
08/1935 | Condemned | 5706 | COND | ||||
11/1935 | Condemned | 5701 | COND | ||||
02/1936 | Condemned | 5689 | COND | ||||
05/1936 | Condemned | 5700 | COND | ||||
04/1937 | Condemned | 5683 | COND | ||||
04/1937 | Condemned | 5692 | COND | ||||
05/1937 | Condemned | 5708 | COND | ||||
05/1937 | Condemned | 5690 | COND | ||||
06/1939 | Condemned | 5684 | COND | ||||
12/1939 | Condemned | 5704 | COND | ||||
25/01/1948 | Reallocation | 5683 | 98W | SKN | Stockton | ||
25/01/1948 | Reallocation | 5687 | 98W | MID | Middlesbrough | ||
14/02/1948 | Reallocation | 5683 | SKN | Stockton | AUK | West Auckland | |
14/02/1948 | Reallocation | 5689 | 98W | SKN | Stockton | ||
19/06/1948 | Reallocation | 5686 | 98W | HTN | Heaton | ||
03/07/1948 | Reallocation | 5702 | 98W | DAR | Darlington | ||
17/09/1949 | Reallocation | 5705 | 98W | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
17/09/1949 | Reallocation | 5707 | 98W | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
14/01/1950 | Reallocation | 5686 | HTN | Heaton | BOR | Borough Gardens |